New Mexico District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-01161
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2023
Last checked: Friday Jul 28, 2023 2:04 AM MDT
Defendant
Diego Sena (1)
Represented By
Hans P. Erickson
Hans P. Erickson, Esq.
contact info
Joel R. Meyers
contact info
Interested Party
US Probation and Pretrial Services
Represented By
Wade Miller
contact info
Anthony John Galaz
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph Michael Spindle
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Nov 09 2023
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing denying 27 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Diego Sena (1) (LF)
GPO Aug 06 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning as to Defendant Diego Sena denying Defendant's Motion to Suppress 38. (lr)

Docket last updated: 07/28/2023 2:30 AM MDT
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
Arrest of Diego Michael Sena. (eh) [1:23-mj-01124-KBM]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Diego Michael Sena (1). (eh) [1:23-mj-01124-KBM]
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Diego Michael Sena: Initial Appearance set for 7/12/2023 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 320 Rio Grande Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. (eh) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [1:23-mj-01124-KBM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
4 4 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen: Initial Appearance as to Diego Michael Sena held on 7/12/2023. Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 7/14/2023 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 320 Rio Grande Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Related [+] (nm) [1:23-mj-01124-KBM]
Related: [-] cording Info: Rio Grande
5 5 Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and orders it to do so. Failing to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, or sanctions by Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen (nm) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [1:23-mj-01124-KBM]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORAL ORDER of Temporary Detention as to Diego Michael Sena by Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen (nm) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [1:23-mj-01124-KBM]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Hans Peter Erickson for Diego Michael Sena by Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen (kd) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [1:23-mj-01124-KBM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2023
U.S. Probation and Pretrial Services added as interested party.(Galaz, Anthony) [1:23-mj-01124-KBM]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
9 9 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Diego Michael Sena (nm) [1:23-mj-01124-KBM]
Related: [-]
10 10 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing: Preliminary/Detention Hearing as to Diego Michael Sena held on 7/14/2023 Related [+] (nm) [1:23-mj-01124-KBM]
Related: [-] cording Info: Rio Grande
11 11 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Diego Michael Sena by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing (nm) [1:23-mj-01124-KBM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
13 13 REDACTED INDICTMENT as to Diego Sena. (nm)
Related: [-]