New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Frederic Block
Referred: Lara K Eshkenazi
Case #: 1:23-cv-05708
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Jul 28, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 24, 2024 3:45 AM EST
Defendant
Mina Tadrus
Represented By
Jorge Marquez
Scarinci Hollenbeck, LLC
contact info
Christopher D. Warren
Scarinci Hollenbeck
contact info
Defendant
Tadrus Capital LLC
Represented By
Jorge Marquez
Scarinci Hollenbeck, LLC
contact info
Christopher D. Warren
Scarinci Hollenbeck
contact info
Intervenor
United States of America
U.S. Attorney for Eastern District 271 Cadman Plaza East
Brooklyn, NY 11201
Represented By
John O'Donnell Enright
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By
Lindsay Senechal Moilanen
Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Tejal Deenesh Shah
Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
John Lehmann
Us Securities Exchange Commission
contact info
Abigail Elizabeth Rosen
Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info

GPO Nov 02 2023
MEMORANDUM and ORDER: While the Court empathizes with the situation of Tadruss family, there is no legal basis for unfreezing allegedly tainted assets, especially where the currently frozen assets cannot cover likely disgorgement liability. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants motion 22 to access frozen funds for living expenses and attorneys fees is DENIED. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 11/2/2023. (MI)

Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 31, 2025
order Status Report Order Mon 03/31 2:19 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's 12/10/2024 Order, Defendants' new attorney was directed to file a notice of appearance by 01/10/2025. To date, no new counsel has filed a notice of appearance. Defendants are directed to file a status letter by 04/11/2025 apprising the Court on whether they have retained new counsel. The Court warns that corporate defendants cannot proceed pro se and the failure to retain counsel could result in the entry of a default judgment. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi on 3/31/2025. (MED)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
42 42 service Certificate of Service Thu 12/12 2:59 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mina Tadrus, Tadrus Capital LLC re Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,, (in compliance with Dec. 10, 2024 Order) (Marquez, Jorge)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 12/10 4:31 PM
ORDER granting38 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants Mina Tadrus and Tadrus Capital, LLC. Defendants have until 01/10/2025 to retain new counsel and for them to make an appearance in this matter. The Court warns that corporate defendants cannot proceed without counsel and failure to attain new counsel may result in default judgment. Mr. Marquez and Mr. Warren are directed to serve a copy of this text order to Defendants and file proof of service on the docket. Counsels' withdrawal will be effective after proof of service is filed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi on 12/10/2024. (MED)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
41 41 misc Letter Mon 12/09 2:23 PM
Letter re: position on motion to withdraw by Securities and Exchange Commission (Rosen, Abigail)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 12/09 11:38 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to file their opposition to Defense Counsels' motion to withdraw, if any by 12/20/2024 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi on 12/9/2024. (MED)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
40 40 service Certificate of Service Thu 12/05 1:09 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mina Tadrus, Tadrus Capital LLC re38 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants Mina Tadrus and Tadrus Capital, LLC, (Marquez, Jorge)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
39 39 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Wed 12/04 1:27 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re38 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants Mina Tadrus and Tadrus Capital, LLC, filed by Mina Tadrus, Tadrus Capital LLC. (Marquez, Jorge)
Related: [-]
38 38 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 12/04 1:19 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants Mina Tadrus and Tadrus Capital, LLC, by Mina Tadrus, Tadrus Capital LLC. (Marquez, Jorge)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
37 37 misc Letter Thu 08/22 4:32 PM
Letter by Securities and Exchange Commission (Rosen, Abigail)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 06/25 1:15 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi. Magistrate Judge James R. Cho no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (ONF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 04/05 11:24 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice36 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jorge Marquez's motion to withdraw as counsel of record does not comply with Local Civil Rule 1.4, which requires "a showing by affidavit or otherwise of satisfactory reasons for withdrawal or displacement and the posture of the case, including its position, if any, on the calendar, and whether or not the attorney is asserting a retaining or charging lien." Mr. Marquez's application does not include an affidavit. Furthermore, Local Civil Rule 1.4 requires that "[a]ll applications to withdraw [] be served upon the client and (unless excused by the Court) upon all other parties." Mr. Marquez shall review Local Civil Rule 1.4, file the appropriate motion by 4/15/2024 and serve his clients directly with copies of the motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 4/5/2024. (JDP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
36 36 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 03/28 6:13 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Mina Tadrus, Tadrus Capital LLC. (Marquez, Jorge)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
35 35 misc Filing Fee Received Tue 12/19 4:05 PM
FILING FEE: $ 29,186.56, receipt number 100011554. (ENE)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
33 33 1 pgs misc Letter Fri 12/15 3:35 PM
Letter filed jointly by Securities and Exchange Commission (Rosen, Abigail)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
order Order(Other) Fri 12/15 4:19 PM
ORDER: TO ESTABLISH A COURTS REGISTRY INVESTMENT SYSTEM ACCOUNT TO HOLD FROZEN FUNDS. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 12/15/2023. (MI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
32 32 13 pgs order Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds Thu 11/02 3:29 PM
MEMORANDUM and ORDER: While the Court empathizes with the situation of Tadruss family, there is no legal basis for unfreezing allegedly tainted assets, especially where the currently frozen assets cannot cover likely disgorgement liability. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants motion22 to access frozen funds for living expenses and attorneys fees is DENIED. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 11/2/2023. (MI)
Related: [-]
31 31 16 pgs motion Intervene Thu 11/02 11:08 AM
MOTION to Intervene and to Stay Civil Proceedings with Supporting Memo of Law by United States of America. (Enright, John)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Intervene Thu 11/02 12:34 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Government's motion31 to intervene with the consent of the SEC and defendant is GRANTED. This case is stayed to allow the related criminal case to proceed. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 11/2/2023. (MI) Modified on 11/2/2023 (MI)
Related: [-]
order Order Staying Case Thu 11/02 3:54 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER STAYING CASE: To allow the related criminal case to proceed. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 11/2/2023. (MI)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Mon 10/16 9:38 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Defendant's letter application30 is GRANTED. The defendant may serve and file a reply brief in excess of the Court's page limit requirements. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 10/16/2023. (MI)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
30 30 motion File Excess Pages Fri 10/13 7:29 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages as to the Defendants' Reply (ECF 29) by Mina Tadrus, Tadrus Capital LLC. (Marquez, Jorge)
Related: [-]
29 29 13 pgs respoth Reply in Support Fri 10/13 7:26 PM
REPLY in Support re22 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Related [+] filed by Mina Tadrus, Tadrus Capital LLC. (Marquez, Jorge)
Related: [-] quest for living expenses and counsel fees (the Outstanding Issues) as referenced in the Consent Order Imposing Preliminary Injunction and Other Relief (ECF No. 11)
28 28 2 pgs respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 10/13 7:24 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re22 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Related [+] (Second Declaration of Mina Tadrus in Support of Motion) filed by Mina Tadrus, Tadrus Capital LLC. (Marquez, Jorge)
Related: [-] quest for living expenses and counsel fees (the Outstanding Issues) as referenced in the Consent Order Imposing Preliminary Injunction and Other Relief (ECF No. 11)
Att: 1 Exhibit C1 (Photo),
Att: 2 Exhibit C2 (Photo),
Att: 3 Exhibit C3 (Photo),
Att: 4 Exhibit C4 (Photo),
Att: 5 Exhibit C5 (Photo),
Att: 6 Exhibit C6 (Photo),
Att: 7 Exhibit C7 (Photo),
Att: 8 Exhibit C8 (Photo),
Att: 9 Exhibit C9 (Photo),
Att: 10 Exhibit D (Grievances to Building Management)
27 27 18 pgs respoth Memorandum in Opposition Fri 10/13 6:47 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re22 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Related [+] filed by Mina Tadrus, Tadrus Capital LLC. (Marquez, Jorge)
Related: [-] quest for living expenses and counsel fees (the Outstanding Issues) as referenced in the Consent Order Imposing Preliminary Injunction and Other Relief (ECF No. 11)
26 26 7 pgs respm Affidavit/Declaration in Opposition to Motion Fri 10/13 6:45 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re22 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Related [+] (Declaration of Abigail Rosen dated October 5, 2023) filed by Mina Tadrus, Tadrus Capital LLC. (Marquez, Jorge)
Related: [-] quest for living expenses and counsel fees (the Outstanding Issues) as referenced in the Consent Order Imposing Preliminary Injunction and Other Relief (ECF No. 11)
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit A (Investor E-mail)
25 25 21 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Fri 10/13 6:39 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re22 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Related [+] filed by Mina Tadrus, Tadrus Capital LLC. (Marquez, Jorge)
Related: [-] quest for living expenses and counsel fees (the Outstanding Issues) as referenced in the Consent Order Imposing Preliminary Injunction and Other Relief (ECF No. 11)
24 24 4 pgs respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 10/13 6:38 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re22 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Related [+] (First Declaration of Mina Tadrus in Support of Motion) filed by Mina Tadrus, Tadrus Capital LLC. (Marquez, Jorge)
Related: [-] quest for living expenses and counsel fees (the Outstanding Issues) as referenced in the Consent Order Imposing Preliminary Injunction and Other Relief (ECF No. 11)
23 23 3 pgs respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 10/13 6:36 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re22 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Related [+] filed by Mina Tadrus, Tadrus Capital LLC. (Marquez, Jorge)
Related: [-] quest for living expenses and counsel fees (the Outstanding Issues) as referenced in the Consent Order Imposing Preliminary Injunction and Other Relief (ECF No. 11)
Att: 1 Exhibit A (SEC June 5, 2023 Subpoena),
Att: 2 Exhibit B (Criminal Complaint (23-MJ-0792) (EDNY))
22 22 2 pgs motion Disbursement of Funds Fri 10/13 6:32 PM
MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Related [+] by Mina Tadrus, Tadrus Capital LLC. (Marquez, Jorge)
Related: [-] quest for living expenses and counsel fees (the Outstanding Issues) as referenced in the Consent Order Imposing Preliminary Injunction and Other Relief (ECF No. 11)
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 10/03 9:41 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Defendants Mina Tadrus and Tadrus Capital LLC letter application21 with the consent of the plaintiff is GRANTED. By November 16, 2023 defendants Mina Tadrus and Tadrus Capital LLC shall serve and file an answer to the complaint. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 10/3/2023. (MI)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
21 21 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 10/02 6:34 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint (from October 2, 2023, to November 16, 2023) by Mina Tadrus, Tadrus Capital LLC. (Marquez, Jorge)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
20 20 misc Letter Tue 09/26 3:53 PM
Letter (Cover letter regarding service of the Defendants Motion to Access Funds as Referenced in the Consent Order Imposing Preliminary Injunction and Other Relief on Plaintiff) by Mina Tadrus, Tadrus Capital LLC (Marquez, Jorge)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
19 19 misc Letter Fri 09/22 3:58 PM
Letter concerning updated briefing schedule on Outstanding Issues referenced at ECF No. 13 by Mina Tadrus, Tadrus Capital LLC (Marquez, Jorge)
Related: [-]
order Scheduling Order Fri 09/22 4:15 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's letter application19 with the consent of the plaintiff is GRANTED. The Court adopts the parties agreed upon modified briefing schedule. By September 26, 2023 the defendant shall serve and file their motion papers. By October 6, 2023 the plaintiff shall serve and file their response papers. By October 13, 2023 the defendant may serve and file a reply brief. Counsel may modify their agreed upon briefing schedule without court approval. Counsel shall file a letter notifying the Court of their modified agreed upon briefing schedule. Counsel shall follow J. Block's motion rules, specifically section 2(D) when filing their motions. The Court does not require a courtesy copy of the motion papers.Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 9/22/2023. (MI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
order Order(Other) Thu 09/14 10:18 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Defendant's letter application17 with the consent of the plaintiff is GRANTED. The Court adopts the parties agreed upon modified briefing schedule. By September 22, 2023 the defendant shall serve and file their motion papers. By October 6, 2023 the plaintiff shall serve and file their response papers. Counsel may modify their agreed upon briefing schedule without court approval. Counsel shall file a letter notifying the Court of their modified agreed upon briefing schedule. Counsel shall follow J. Block's motion rules, specifically section 2(D) when filing their motions. The Court does not require a courtesy copy of the motion papers.Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 9/14/2023. (MI)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
17 17 misc Letter Wed 09/13 7:23 PM
Letter concerning updated briefing schedule on Outstanding Issues referenced at ECF No. 13 by Mina Tadrus, Tadrus Capital LLC (Marquez, Jorge)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
16 16 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 09/11 2:55 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Mina Tadrus waiver sent on 8/1/2023, answer due 10/2/2023. (Rosen, Abigail)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 09/11 2:53 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Tadrus Capital LLC waiver sent on 8/1/2023, answer due 10/2/2023. (Rosen, Abigail)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/08 11:06 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D. Warren on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Warren, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 09/06 10:25 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Defendant's letter application13 with the consent of the plaintiff is GRANTED. The Court adopts the parties agreed upon modified briefing schedule. By September 15, 2023 the defendant shall serve and file their motion papers. By September 29, 2023 the plaintiff shall serve and file their response papers. Counsel may modify their agreed upon briefing schedule without court approval. Counsel shall file a letter notifying the Court of their modified agreed upon briefing schedule. Counsel shall follow J. Block's motion rules, specifically section 2(D) when filing their motions. The Court does not require a courtesy copy of the motion papers. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 9/6/2023. (MI)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 09/05 6:01 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions Relating to Outstanding Issues reflected in the Consent Order at ECF No. 11, including request for approval of updated briefing schedule by Mina Tadrus, Tadrus Capital LLC. (Marquez, Jorge)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
12 12 1 pgs misc Letter Tue 08/22 4:54 PM
Letter (joint letter requesting approval of proposed briefing schedule on Outstanding Issues referenced at ECF No. 11) by Mina Tadrus, Tadrus Capital LLC (Marquez, Jorge)
Related: [-]
11 11 9 pgs order Preliminary Injunction Tue 08/22 11:33 AM
PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: IT IS ORDERED that, pending a final disposition of this action, Defendants are permanently restrained and enjoined from violating Section l 7(a) of the Securities Act [15 U.S.C. § 77q(a)] in the offer or sale of any security by the use of any means or instruments of transportation or communication in interstate commerce or by use of the mails, directly or indirectly: (a)to employ any device, scheme, or artifice to defraud;(b) to obtain money or property by means of any untrue statement of a material fact or any omission of a material fact necessary in order to make the statements made, in light of the circumstances under which they were made, not misleading; or (c)to engage in any transaction, practice, or course of business which operates or would operate as a fraud or deceit upon the purchaser. By August 25, 2023 counsel shall submit a agreed upon briefing schedule as to the issue of whether the defendant can access investor funds to use for attorney's fees and living expense. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 8/22/2023. (MI)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Tue 08/22 11:28 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Granting the parties joint proposed motion9 for entry of a preliminary injunction. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 8/22/2023. (MI)
Related: [-]
order Scheduling Order Tue 08/22 5:42 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's letter application12 with the consent of the plaintiff is GRANTED. The Court adopts the parties agreed upon briefing schedule. By September 8, 2023 the defendant shall serve and file their motion papers. By September 15, 2023 the plaintiff shall serve and file their response papers. Counsel may modify their agreed upon briefing schedule without court approval. Counsel shall file a letter notifying the Court of their modified agreed upon briefing schedule. Counsel shall follow J. Block's motion rules, specifically section 2(D) when filing their motions. The Court does not require a courtesy copy of the motion papers. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 8/22/2023. (MI)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/16 8:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jorge Marquez on behalf of Mina Tadrus, Tadrus Capital LLC (aty to be noticed) (Marquez, Jorge)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs motion Preliminary Injunction Wed 08/16 4:37 PM
First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed on consent by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Rosen, Abigail)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 9 pgs Proposed Order Consent PI
Saturday, July 29, 2023
minutes Telephone Conference Mon 07/31 10:45 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frederic Block: Telephone Conference held on 7/29/2023: The parties attended an informal, off-the-record telephone conference at 10:00 am on Saturday, July 29 to discuss the SECs order to show cause and request for a temporary restraining order. Defense counsel represented to the Court that they have advised Defendant to keep his funds in place, that no funds from the bank accounts in question are being deployed, and that they have an accurate accounting of the relevant accounts. If Defendant does not abide by Counsels recommendation, the Court will contact the US Attorneys office to recommend potential criminal prosecution. The parties will confer and propose to the Court either a date for a preliminary injunction hearing or other matters for the Courts consideration. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (MI)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2023
8 8 misc Declaration Fri 07/28 4:26 PM
DECLARATION re3 Memorandum in Support,2 Unsigned Order to Show Cause to freeze assets and enjoin defendants by Securities and Exchange Commission (Rosen, Abigail)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 14 pgs Declaration Rodriguez Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex A part 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex A part 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex B part 1,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex B part 2,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex C,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex D,
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex E,
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex F,
Att: 10 Exhibit Ex G,
Att: 11 Exhibit Ex H,
Att: 12 Exhibit Ex I,
Att: 13 Exhibit Ex J
7 7 misc Declaration Fri 07/28 2:37 PM
DECLARATION Of Abigail E. Rosen by Securities and Exchange Commission (KD)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Declaration Fri 07/28 2:36 PM
DECLARATION Of Joshua Oldmixon by Securities and Exchange Commission (KD)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs misc Declaration Fri 07/28 2:34 PM
DECLARATION Of Russell Castillo by Securities and Exchange Commission (KD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 30 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 10 pgs Exhibit B
4 4 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 07/28 2:31 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD)
Related: [-]
3 3 26 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Fri 07/28 2:10 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re2 Unsigned Order to Show Cause filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (KD)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Unsigned Order to Show Cause Fri 07/28 2:08 PM
Unsigned Order to Show Cause and Temporary Restraining Order by Securities and Exchange Commission (KD)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 07/28 2:05 PM
COMPLAINT against Mina Tadrus, Tadrus Capital LLC, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (KD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet