Washington Western District Court
Judge:Lauren King
Case #: 2:23-cv-01128
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Jul 28, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 24, 2024 1:15 AM PST
Counter Claimant
Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By
Gabriel Baker
Jensen Morse Baker PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Pamela Archer
Represented By
Jeremy Lyle Bordelon
Evergreen Disability Law
contact info
Defendant
Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By
Gabriel Baker
Jensen Morse Baker PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Pamela Archer
Represented By
Jeremy Lyle Bordelon
Evergreen Disability Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, June 28, 2024
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 06/28 7:26 AM
REPLY, filed by Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America, TO RESPONSE to17 CROSS MOTION AND RESPONSE re16 MOTION for Judgment on the Record (Baker, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
19 19 order LK Standing Order for All Civil Cases (FORM) Tue 06/18 2:30 PM
UPDATED STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Standing Order
Friday, June 14, 2024
18 18 respm Response to Motion Fri 06/14 8:23 AM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Pamela Archer, to17 CROSS MOTION AND RESPONSE re16 MOTION for Judgment on the Record . (Bordelon, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
17 17 motion Cross Motion Tue 05/28 2:24 PM
CROSS MOTION AND RESPONSE re16 MOTION for Judgment on the Record , filed by Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America. Noting Date 7/1/2024, (Baker, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 26, 2024
16 16 motion Judgment Fri 04/26 12:23 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Record , filed by Plaintiff Pamela Archer. Noting Date 7/1/2024, (Bordelon, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Similarly Situated Appeal Approved,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Defendant's Discovery Responses
Monday, April 01, 2024
15 15 sealdoc Sealed Administrative Record - Non Social Security Mon 04/01 10:05 AM
SEALED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by All Defendants. LTD Part 1(Baker, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LTD Part 2,
Att: 2 LTD Part 3,
Att: 3 LTD Policy
Thursday, March 28, 2024
14 14 order 2 - Minute Order Thu 03/28 1:36 PM
MINUTE ORDER (text only) granting13 Stipulated Motion to File Administrative Record Under Seal. The parties are DIRECTED to file the administrative record no later than 4/1/2024. Authorized by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Stipulation Thu 03/28 11:40 AM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to File Administrative Record Under Seal by parties (Baker, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Change of Address/Change of Name Thu 02/01 2:30 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Gabriel Baker. Filed by All Defendants. (Baker, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
11 11 order LK Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates (FORM) Thu 11/16 1:27 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Lauren King. Motions to conduct limited discovery due by 3/1/2024, Administrative record filed by 4/1/2024, Plaintiff's dispositive motions due by 4/26/2024, Defendant's combined opposition and dispositive cross-motions due by 5/27/2024, Plaintiff's combined reply and opposition due by 6/14/2024, Defendant's reply due by 6/28/2024. (NAW)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
10 10 misc Joint Status Report Mon 11/13 4:28 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 0.5. (Bordelon, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2023
9 9 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 10/09 10:48 AM
ANSWER to6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Pamela Archer.(Bordelon, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
8 8 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 09/29 2:14 PM
CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Vanguard Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Unum Group, a Delaware corporation, Corporate Parent BlackRock, Inc. for Unum Life Insurance Company of America. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Baker, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
7 7 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Mon 09/18 3:38 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/16/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/30/2023, Joint Status Report due by 11/13/2023. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 09/18 3:15 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, Attorney Gabriel Baker added to party Unum Life Insurance Company of America(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Pamela Archer by Unum Life Insurance Company of America.(Baker, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 09/11 12:26 PM
SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America on 8/7/2023 (Bordelon, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
4 4 order LK Standing Order for All Civil Cases (FORM) Tue 08/01 9:12 AM
STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
Related: [-]
3 3 order LK Standing Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM) Tue 08/01 9:11 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 07/31 1:15 PM
Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (RE)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 07/31 12:54 PM
Judge Lauren King added. (RE)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2023
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 07/28 12:31 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Unum Life Insurance Company of America Related [+] Attorney Jeremy Lyle Bordelon added to party Pamela Archer(pty:pla) filed by Pamela Archer.(Bordelon, Jeremy)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8104813
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons