Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Anne C Conway
Referred: Leslie Hoffman Price
Case #: 6:23-cv-01442
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jul 28, 2023
Terminated:Apr 17, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 24, 2024 3:50 AM EST
Defendant
Trilogy Home Healthcare
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Goodz
Chubb & Son Staff Counsel
contact info
Mediator
Carlos Burruezo
Represented By
Carlos J. Burruezo
Burruezo & Burruezo, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nandi Marshall-Regis
Represented By
Brendan Chao
Attorney & Counsellor At Law
contact info
Caroline H. Miller
Derek Smith Law Group PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Humana, Inc.
Terminated: 09/14/2023
Represented By
West Allan Holden
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
35 35 order Order Wed 05/29 10:45 AM
ORDER : This case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 5/29/2024. (Conway, Anne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
34 34 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 05/28 2:50 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Nandi Marshall-Regis. (Chao, Brendan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
33 33 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 04/17 2:25 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ELM)
Related: [-]
32 32 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 04/17 11:52 AM
ORDER DISMISSING case without prejudice and subject to the right of the parties, within sixty (60) days of the date of this order, to submit a stipulated form of final order or judgment should they so choose or for any party to move to reopen the action, upon good cause shown. After that 60-day period, however, dismissal shall be with prejudice. Any pending motions are denied as moot and the Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 4/16/2024. (KLD)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
31 31 adr Mediation report Mon 04/15 5:04 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on 04/15/2024. Hearing outcome: Settled.. (Wright, Denise)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
30 30 notice Notice (Other) Wed 02/14 5:10 PM
NOTICE by Trilogy Home Healthcare re29 Order directing compliance Parties' Notice of Mediation Outcome (Goodz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
29 29 2 pgs order Order directing compliance Mon 02/05 3:32 PM
ORDER directing compliance to counsel to notify the court of the outcome of the mediation conference held on October 25, 2023 within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 2/5/2024. (KLD)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
28 28 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 10/02 4:10 PM
ORDER granting 26 Parties Joint Motion to Conduct Mediation by Zoom. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 10/2/2023. (MKH)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
27 27 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Fri 09/29 2:09 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on October 25, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. before Carlos Burruezo.(Goodz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 09/29 2:07 PM
Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Conduct Mediation by Zoom by Trilogy Home Healthcare. (Goodz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
25 25 2 pgs order Order Fri 09/29 9:31 AM
STANDING ORDER on Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 2/7/2022. (SFC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
24 24 utility Case Referred to Mediation Thu 09/28 4:49 PM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Lead Counsel is directed to reach out to opposing counsel, contact mediator, select a mediation date and file a notice with the court within 14 days from the date of this order advising the court of the scheduled mediation date. Mediation to be conducted in person or the parties shall file a motion seeking permission to conduct the mediation by Zoom. Any such motion shall include a statement that the Mediator consents to mediation by Zoom. (KLD)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Case Management Scheduling Order Thu 09/28 4:42 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/3/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 11/3/2023. Discovery due by 7/1/2024. Dispositive motions due by 7/15/2024. Pretrial statement due by 11/22/2024. All other motions due by 8/16/2024. Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 5/1/2024. Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 6/3/2024. Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 1/2/2025 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 6 A before Judge Anne C. Conway. Conduct in-person mediation hearing by 7/10/2024. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 9/28/2023. (KLD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
22 22 misc Case Management Report Wed 09/20 3:45 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Goodz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
21 21 order Order Thu 09/14 1:07 PM
ORDER : Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Humana, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 9/14/2023. (Conway, Anne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
20 20 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 09/06 4:28 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal OF HUMANA, INC. by Humana, Inc.. (Holden, West)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
19 19 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 09/05 12:23 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Trilogy Home Healthcare identifying Corporate Parent M-SAC, Inc., Corporate Parent Vitality Home Care, Inc., Corporate Parent Vitality HHS Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent CenterWell Health Services (USA), LLC, Corporate Parent CenterWell Health Services Holding Corp., Corporate Parent CenterWell Health Services, Inc., Corporate Parent Kentucky Homecare Holdings, inc., Corporate Parent Kentucky Homecare Parent Inc. for Trilogy Home Healthcare. (Goodz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of a Related Action Tue 09/05 12:09 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Trilogy Home Healthcare. Related case(s): Yes (Goodz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of appearance Tue 09/05 12:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Goodz on behalf of Trilogy Home Healthcare (Goodz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/05 12:04 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by Trilogy Home Healthcare.(Goodz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
15 15 service Summons returned executed Thu 08/17 4:09 PM
RETURN of service executed on 08/16/2023 by Nandi Marshall-Regis as to Humana, Inc.. (Chao, Brendan)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons returned executed Thu 08/17 4:08 PM
RETURN of service executed on 08/15/2023 by Nandi Marshall-Regis as to Trilogy Home Healthcare. (Chao, Brendan)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
13 13 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 08/14 5:01 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Nandi Marshall-Regis. (Chao, Brendan)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of a Related Action Mon 08/14 4:58 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Nandi Marshall-Regis. Related case(s): No (Chao, Brendan)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Fri 08/11 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Brendan Chao on behalf of Nandi Marshall-Regis. Lead Counsel: Brendan Chao. (Chao, Brendan)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 08/11 10:26 AM
NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/10 2:02 PM
ORDER granting 2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 8/10/2023. (MKH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
8 8 service Summons issued Wed 08/02 8:24 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Humana, Inc., Trilogy Home Healthcare. (BGR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
7 7 service Proposed summons Tue 08/01 1:40 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Nandi Marshall-Regis. (Miller, Caroline)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Proposed summons Tue 08/01 1:39 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Nandi Marshall-Regis. (Miller, Caroline)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 08/01 10:57 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Brendan Chao of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JDR)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
4 4 order Interested Persons Order Mon 07/31 1:07 PM
INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Parties have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/31/2023. (KLD)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 07/31 10:02 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:23-cv-1442-ACC-LHP. (ARC)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2023
2 2 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 07/28 3:14 PM
MOTION for Brendan Chao to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21092120 for $150 by Nandi Marshall-Regis. (Miller, Caroline)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 07/28 3:09 PM
COMPLAINT against Humana, Inc., Trilogy Home Healthcare with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-21092044) filed by Nandi Marshall-Regis.(Miller, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons