New Jersey District Court
Judge:Georgette Castner
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 3:23-cv-04062
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jul 28, 2023
Case in other court:MIDDLESEX COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, MID-L-98-00023
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 24, 2024 4:06 AM EST
Defendant
ABC COS 1-10
Defendant
BOARDWALK REGENCY, LLC
Represented By
DAMIAN S. JACKSON
Reilly, Mcdevitt & Henrich, P.C.
contact info
ANTHONY GIORDANO, JR.
Reilly, Mcdevitt & Henrich
contact info
Defendant
1-10 JOHN DOES
Plaintiff
MARCUS ERODICI
Represented By
SEAN MICHAEL MAHONEY
Stathis & Leonardis LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
CAESARS ATLANTIC CITY HOTEL & CASINO
Terminated: 12/05/2023
Defendant
CAESARS ATLANTIC CITY, LLC
Terminated: 12/05/2023
Defendant
CAESARS ENTERTAINMENT CORP.
Terminated: 12/05/2023
Defendant
CAESARS ENTERTAINMENT, INC.
Terminated: 12/05/2023
Defendant
CAESARS NEW JERSEY, INC.
Terminated: 12/05/2023
Defendant
VICI PROPERTIES
Terminated: 12/05/2023


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/01 10:11 AM
Set Deadlines as to45 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion set for 6/2/2025 before Judge Georgette Castner. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
45 45 motion Summary Judgment Wed 04/30 2:41 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by BOARDWALK REGENCY, LLC.(GIORDANO, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit K
Thursday, April 24, 2025
44 44 order Text Order Thu 04/24 10:18 PM
TEXT ORDER: The parties shall file any dispositive motion(s) by no later than May 9, 2025. The parties shall refer to the assigned District Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements, as applicable, for the filings. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 4/24/2025. (mm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
43 43 order Text Order Thu 03/20 10:46 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of counsel's letter dated March 19, 2025. (Doc. No.42 ). In light of the status of this matter, the parties need not file another joint letter by March 28, 2025 per the Text Order at Docket Entry Number 41 . The Court will reach out to the parties to discuss setting a date for a settlement conference or mediation. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 3/20/2025. (mm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
42 42 misc Letter Wed 03/19 1:11 PM
Letter from Sean Mahoney, Esq.. (MAHONEY, SEAN)
Related: [-]
41 41 order Text Order Wed 03/19 12:00 PM
TEXT ORDER: By no later than March 28, 2025, the parties shall file a joint letter regarding the status of expert discovery. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 3/19/2025. (mm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
40 40 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 02/25 10:43 AM
TEXT ORDER: A status conference via telephone is set for March 19, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. The Court shall circulate dial-in information for the telephone conference at a later date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 2/25/2025. (mm)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
39 39 misc Letter Mon 02/24 10:22 AM
Letter from Anthony Giordano, Esq.. (GIORDANO, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
38 38 1 pgs order Order Wed 11/13 11:23 AM
LETTER ORDER setting deadlines. Expert Discovery due 11/15/2024; Plaintiff's Reports due 1/20/2024; Defendants' reports due 3/20/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 11/13/2024. (jjc)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
37 37 misc Letter Fri 11/08 2:29 PM
Letter from Sean Mahoney, Esq.. (MAHONEY, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
36 36 order Text Order Thu 10/10 4:27 PM
TEXT ORDER: For good cause shown, the deadline to complete fact discovery is hereby extended to November 15, 2024. By no later than November 15, 2024, the parties shall file a proposed schedule for any expert discovery. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 10/10/2024. (ijf)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 10/15 11:43 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh: Telephone Conference held on 10/10/2024. (mm)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
35 35 misc Status Report Mon 10/07 12:34 PM
STATUS REPORT by MARCUS ERODICI. (MAHONEY, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
34 34 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 08/30 2:45 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' joint status letter dated August 28, 2024. For good cause shown, the deadline to complete fact discovery is hereby extended through October 15, 2024. A status conference via telephone is set for October 10, 2024 at 3:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call. Once all of the parties are on the line, counsel for Plaintiff shall conference in Judge Singh's Chambers at (609) 989-0502. No later than three (3) business days prior to the telephone status conference, the parties shall submit a joint status letter to the Court via CM/ECF not to exceed three (3) pages, setting forth the status of discovery and identifying any issues ripe for discussion with the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 8/30/2024. (mm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
33 33 misc Status Report Wed 08/28 11:12 AM
STATUS REPORT by MARCUS ERODICI. (MAHONEY, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
32 32 order Text Order Fri 08/16 3:17 PM
TEXT ORDER: The parties shall proceed as discussed during the telephone status conference with the Court and shall file a joint status letter by no later than August 30, 2024 as previously ordered (Doc. No. 26 ). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 8/16/2024. (mm)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Fri 08/16 3:16 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh: Telephone Conference held on 8/16/2024. (mm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
31 31 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 08/15 11:32 AM
TEXT ORDER: A telephone conference is set for 8/16/2024 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call. Once all of the parties are on the line, counsel for Plaintiff shall conference in Judge Singh's Chambers at (609) 989-0502. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 8/15/2024. (mm)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 08/15 11:28 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh: Telephone Conference held on 8/15/2024. (mm)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
30 30 misc Letter Mon 08/12 10:23 AM
Letter from Sean Mahoney, Esq.. (MAHONEY, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
29 29 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 08/09 3:07 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' respective letters dated August 8, 2024, regarding the IME scheduled for August 19, 2024. (Doc. Nos.27 ,28 ). The parties shall promptly meet and confer as to the dispute pursuant to Local Civil Rule 37.1. Considering the upcoming date for the IME, Plaintiff shall file a letter, setting forth his position as to the dispute by no later than August 13, 2024. A telephone conference to address the issue informally pursuant to Local Civil Rule 37.1(a) is scheduled for August 15, 2024 at 11:00 a.m. before the undersigned. Counsel for Defendant shall initiate the call. Once all parties are on the line, counsel for Defendant shall conference in Judge Singh's Chambers at (609) 989-0502. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 8/9/2024. (mm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
28 28 misc Letter Thu 08/08 12:25 PM
Letter from Sean Mahoney, Esq.. (MAHONEY, SEAN)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Letter Thu 08/08 11:36 AM
Letter from Anthony Giordano, Esq.. (GIORDANO, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
26 26 order Text Order Thu 06/27 11:19 AM
TEXT ORDER: For good cause shown, the deadline to complete fact discovery is hereby extended through 9/6/2024. The parties shall submit a joint status letter to the Court via CM/ECF by no later than 8/30/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 6/27/2024. (mm)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
25 25 misc Status Report Mon 06/24 11:29 AM
STATUS REPORT by MARCUS ERODICI. (MAHONEY, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
24 24 order Order Wed 04/03 9:42 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' joint status letter dated 3/28/2024. The parties shall submit a joint status letter to the Court via CM/ECF by no later than 6/28/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 4/3/2024. (mm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
23 23 misc Status Report Thu 03/28 4:37 PM
STATUS REPORT by MARCUS ERODICI. (MAHONEY, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
22 22 order Order Wed 02/14 11:26 AM
TEXT ORDER: The parties shall submit a joint status letter to the Court via CM/ECF by no later than 4/1/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 2/14/2024. (mm)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 02/14 11:24 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh: Telephone Conference held on 2/14/2024. (mm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
21 21 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 02/06 11:04 AM
TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 2/22/2024, is hereby RESCHEDULED to 2/14/2024 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call. Once all of the parties are on the line, counsel for Plaintiff shall conference in Judge Singh's Chambers at (609) 989-0502. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 2/6/2024. (mm)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
20 20 misc Letter Mon 02/05 9:41 AM
Letter from Anthony Giordano, Esq.. (GIORDANO, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
19 19 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 01/22 2:46 PM
TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 1/25/2024, is hereby RESCHEDULED to 2/22/2024 at 3:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call. Once all of the parties are on the line, counsel for Plaintiff shall conference in Judge Singh's Chambers at (609) 989-0502. No later than three (3) business days prior to the telephone status conference, the parties shall submit a joint status letter to the Court via CM/ECF not to exceed three (3) pages, setting forth the status of discovery and identifying any issues ripe for discussion with the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 1/22/2024. (mm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
18 18 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Tue 12/05 2:09 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal as to Defendants CAESARS ENTERTAINMENT, INC., CAESARS ENTERTAINMENT CORP., CAESARS NEW JERSEY, INC., VICI PROPERTIES, CAESARS ATLANTIC CITY HOTEL & CASINO and CAESARS ATLANTIC CITY, LLC without prejudice. Signed by Judge Georgette Castner on 12/5/2023. (mlh)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Tue 12/05 10:33 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice by CAESARS ATLANTIC CITY HOTEL & CASINO, CAESARS ATLANTIC CITY, LLC, CAESARS ENTERTAINMENT CORP., CAESARS ENTERTAINMENT, INC., CAESARS NEW JERSEY, INC., VICI PROPERTIES. (GIORDANO, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
16 16 1 pgs order Order Thu 11/30 4:34 PM
LETTER ORDER Directing parties to submit a stipulation of dismissal by December 15, 2023. Signed by Judge Georgette Castner on 11/30/2023. (amv)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Status Report Thu 11/30 2:06 PM
STATUS REPORT by MARCUS ERODICI. (MAHONEY, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
14 14 order Order Wed 11/29 4:42 PM
TEXT ORDER: This matter comes before the Court following its November 7, 2023 telephonic conference with the parties and subsequent text order that directed them to meet and confer and to provide a status update to the Court by November 17, 2023, "as to whether a motion to remand is still requested as well as whether the parties will stipulate to the dismissal of any of the defendants from the case." (ECF Nos.12 & 13 .) Having received no update, the Court orders the parties to file an update on the docket by December 4, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Georgette Castner on 11/29/23. (adi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
13 13 order Order Tue 11/07 2:34 PM
TEXT ORDER: This matter comes before the Court following a telephonic conference held with counsel for the parties on November 7, 2023. Based on the discussion with the parties, and for good cause shown, the Court directs the parties to meet and confer and to submit a status update by November 17, 2023, as to whether a motion to remand is still requested as well as whether the parties will stipulate to the dismissal of any of the defendants from the case. So Ordered by Judge Georgette Castner on 11/7/23. (adi)
Related: [-]
12 12 minutes Telephone Conference Tue 11/07 10:55 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Georgette Castner: Telephone Conference held on 11/7/2023. Ordered that the parties are to provide a joint status report within ten days. At that time, parties are also to advise the Court whether they intend to stipulate to dismiss certain entities. Order to issue. (Court Reporter, Carol Farrell (856-318-6100)) (adi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
11 11 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 11/02 10:12 AM
TEXT ORDER: A Telephone Conference re:9 Letter from Plaintiff's counsel is hereby set for 11/7/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Georgette Castner. The dial in information will be provided to the parties prior to the call. So Ordered by Judge Georgette Castner on 11/2/23. (adi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
10 10 misc Letter Wed 11/01 9:24 AM
Letter from Anthony Giordano, Esq.. (GIORDANO, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
9 9 misc Letter Thu 10/26 3:18 PM
Letter from Sean Mahoney, Esq.. (MAHONEY, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
8 8 order Scheduling Order Thu 10/12 11:18 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 1/25/2024 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Any motion to amend the pleadings or join new parties must be with leave of Court and filed by no later than 1/16/2024. Fact discovery shall be completed by no later than 4/8/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 10/12/2023. (kht)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 10/10 4:56 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/10/2023. (mm)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
7 7 discov Joint Discovery Plan Fri 10/06 3:59 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by MARCUS ERODICI.(MAHONEY, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Wed 08/23 3:43 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Ceasars Entertainment Corp. on 08/23/2023, filed by MARCUS ERODICI. (MAHONEY, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
5 5 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 08/18 12:19 PM
TEXT ORDER: Rule 16 Conference set for 9/12/2023, is hereby RESCHEDULED to 10/10/2023 at 3:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. All previously conditions set in the order at docket entry3 remain in full effect. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 8/18/2023. (mm)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
4 4 discov Joint Discovery Plan Mon 08/14 3:30 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by All Plaintiffs.(MAHONEY, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
3 3 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 08/02 9:54 AM
ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/12/2023 at 3:30 PM in person before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 8/1/2023. (mlh)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 07/31 4:41 PM
Judge Georgette Castner and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (mg, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Mon 07/31 4:43 PM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (mg)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2023
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 07/28 3:19 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by BOARDWALK REGENCY, LLC. (GIORDANO, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 07/28 3:14 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BOARDWALK REGENCY, LLC from MIDDLESEX COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, case number MID-L-3698-23. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14490523), filed by BOARDWALK REGENCY, LLC.(GIORDANO, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Certification of Counsel,
Att: 2 7 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Certificate of Service,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet