Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert W Schroeder, III
Referred: Roy S Payne
Case #: 2:23-cv-00351
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Jul 28, 2023
Terminated:Apr 30, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 24, 2024 2:51 AM CST
Defendant
CHRISTUS HEALTH, a Texas Nonprofit Corporation d/b/a TLRA DEBT RECOVERY
2707 North Loop West, Suite 400
Houston, TX 77008
Represented By
Marc Brian Collier
Fulbright & Jaworski
contact info
Kelly Potter
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Peter Mifflin Hillegas
Norton Rose Fulbright Us Llp - Austin
contact info
Jeff Wurzburg
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Mediator
Earl Glenn Thames
glennthames@potterminton.com 102 North College Ste 900
Tyler, TX 75702
Plaintiff
QUAVION DESHUN HOLLINS
Represented By
Valerie Christian
The Bourassa Law Group
contact info
Jason Dwain Mazingo
The Mazingo Firm, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
34 34 1 pgs order Order Order Dismissing Case Wed 05/01 8:49 AM
ORDER granting33 Stipulation of Dismissal.Court ACCEPTS AND ACKNOWLEDGES thatall claims and causes of action asserted between Plaintiff and Defendant in the above-captionedcase are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/30/2024. (CH)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
33 33 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 04/26 5:31 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by QUAVION DESHUN HOLLINS.(Christian, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 25, 2024
notice Notice of Hearing Thu 04/25 10:58 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection set for 4/21/2025 at 09:00AM before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Pretrial Conference set for 4/2/2025 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
32 32 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Wed 04/24 3:54 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Rodney Gilstrap recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/24/2024. (CH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
31 31 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw Thu 04/18 4:56 PM
ORDER granting30 Motion to Withdraw30 CORRECTED MOTION to Withdraw27 SEALED MOTION to Enforce Settlement . Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/18/2024. (KLC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
30 30 motion Withdraw Tue 04/16 3:18 PM
CORRECTED MOTION to Withdraw27 SEALED MOTION to Enforce Settlement by QUAVION DESHUN HOLLINS. (Christian, Valerie)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Withdraw Tue 04/16 1:47 PM
MOTION to Withdraw27 SEALED MOTION to Enforce Settlement by QUAVION DESHUN HOLLINS. (Christian, Valerie)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Deficiency Tue 04/16 2:41 PM
Clerk's LR CV-10(d) Notice of Deficiency as to 29 Motion to Withdraw - LR CV-7(i) or LR CR-47(a)(3) requires this document to include a certificate of conference that complies with the rule. Recommended cure: Within one day, Filer must refile with the word Corrected in the title of the document. The filer should use the same ECF event and when offered the docket text enhancement dropdown, select CORRECTED so it will also appear in the docket text. (CH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
28 28 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Document Wed 04/03 8:56 AM
ORDER granting26 MOTION to Seal Document Motion to Enforce Settlement ,27 SEALED MOTION to Enforce Settlement is sealed. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/2/2024. (CH)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
27 27 motion Sealed Motion Mon 04/01 5:13 PM
SEALED MOTION to Enforce Settlement by QUAVION DESHUN HOLLINS.(Christian, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion
26 26 motion Seal Document Mon 04/01 5:09 PM
MOTION to Seal Document Motion to Enforce Settlement by QUAVION DESHUN HOLLINS.(Christian, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
25 25 order Scheduling Order/Docket Control Order Wed 12/13 10:29 AM
DOCKET CONTROL ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 3/3/2025 at 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Jury Selection set for 3/17/2025 at 09:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/13/2023. (ch, )
Related: [-]
24 24 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediator Wed 12/13 10:27 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator E. Glenn Thames, Jr, 102 North College, Suite 900, Tyler, Texas75702, telephone number 903-597-8311 is hereby appointed as mediator. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/13/2023. (ch, )
Related: [-]
23 23 8 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 12/13 9:09 AM
DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/13/2023. (ch, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 12/11 12:47 PM
ORDER granting20 AGREED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Agreed Mediator. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/11/2023. (ch, )
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Designation of Mediator Mon 12/11 8:07 AM
AGREED NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, E. Glenn Thames, Jr., filed by QUAVION DESHUN HOLLINS. (Mazingo, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Fri 12/08 5:08 PM
AGREED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Agreed Mediator by QUAVION DESHUN HOLLINS.(Mazingo, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
19 19 6 pgs order Order Fri 12/08 3:57 PM
AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/8/2023. (klc, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
18 18 motion Protective Order Wed 12/06 2:43 PM
CORRECTED MOTION for Protective Order by CHRISTUS HEALTH, a Texas Nonprofit Corporation d/b/a TLRA DEBT RECOVERY.(Collier, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Amended Protective Order
17 17 motion Protective Order Wed 12/06 1:02 PM
AGREED MOTION for Protective Order by CHRISTUS HEALTH, a Texas Nonprofit Corporation d/b/a TLRA DEBT RECOVERY.(Collier, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Amended Protective Order
misc Notice of Deficiency Wed 12/06 1:24 PM
Clerk's LR CV-10(d) Notice of Deficiency as to 17 AGREED MOTION for Protective Order - LR CV-7(i) or LR CR-47(a)(3) requires this document to include a certificate of conference that complies with the rule. Recommended cure: Within one day, Filer must refile with the word Corrected in the title of the document. The filer should use the same ECF event and when offered the docket text enhancement dropdown, select CORRECTED so it will also appear in the docket text. (ch, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
minutes Scheduling Conference/Case Management Conference Fri 12/08 1:30 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference/Case Management Conference held on 12/4/2023. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked by the Court if any modifications needed to be made to the Discovery Order and/or Docket Control Order and whether there was a need for the entry of a Protective Order. Counsel to notify the Court within three business days of the name of an agreed upon mediator. If no agreement is reached, the Court will appoint a mediator. Docket Control Order: No requested changes at this time. Discovery Order: No requested changes at this time. Parties to submit a proposed joint Protective Order for the Court's consideration. (Court Reporter Shawn McRoberts) (aeb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
16 16 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/08 5:06 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Valerie Gray on behalf of QUAVION DESHUN HOLLINS. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9807123. (Gray, Valerie)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 11/08 9:00 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Mifflin Hillegas on behalf of CHRISTUS HEALTH, a Texas Nonprofit Corporation d/b/a TLRA DEBT RECOVERY (Hillegas, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
14 14 18 pgs order Order Scheduling Order/Docket Control Order Tue 11/07 7:53 AM
NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, PROPOSED DEADLINES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND DISCOVERY ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER Scheduling/Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2023 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/6/2023. (ch, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
13 13 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 10/27 2:57 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint filed by CHRISTUS HEALTH, a Texas Nonprofit Corporation d/b/a TLRA DEBT RECOVERY . (Wurzburg, Jeff)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
12 12 23 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 10/20 4:03 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint filed by QUAVION DESHUN HOLLINS . (Mazingo, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 09/28 4:21 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss. ORDERED that Plaintiffs deadline to file his response in opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. 9) is extended up to and including October 20, 2023. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/28/2023. (ch, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Wed 09/27 3:12 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss by QUAVION DESHUN HOLLINS.(Mazingo, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, September 22, 2023
9 9 motion Dismiss Fri 09/22 12:42 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint by CHRISTUS HEALTH, a Texas Nonprofit Corporation d/b/a TLRA DEBT RECOVERY.(Collier, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/22 12:18 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeff Wurzburg on behalf of CHRISTUS HEALTH, a Texas Nonprofit Corporation d/b/a TLRA DEBT RECOVERY. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9718681. (Wurzburg, Jeff)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/22 11:14 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kelly Potter on behalf of CHRISTUS HEALTH, a Texas Nonprofit Corporation d/b/a TLRA DEBT RECOVERY. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9718481. (Potter, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
6 6 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Wed 08/23 2:47 PM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CHRISTUS HEALTH, a Texas Nonprofit Corporation d/b/a TLRA DEBT RECOVERY.( Collier, Marc)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 08/23 11:52 AM
FILED IN ERROR Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by CHRISTUS HEALTH, a Texas Nonprofit Corporation d/b/a TLRA DEBT RECOVERY. (Collier, Marc) Modified on 8/23/2023 (nkl, )
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 08/23 11:50 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc Brian Collier on behalf of CHRISTUS HEALTH, a Texas Nonprofit Corporation d/b/a TLRA DEBT RECOVERY (Collier, Marc)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Docket Correction Wed 08/23 4:12 PM
***FILED IN ERROR - was filed using the wrong docket event. Document # 5, Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
Related: [-]
text Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Wed 08/23 4:31 PM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for CHRISTUS HEALTH, a Texas Nonprofit Corporation d/b/a TLRA DEBT RECOVERY to 9/22/2023. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 07/28 4:54 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to CHRISTUS HEALTH, a Texas Nonprofit Corporation d/b/a TLRA DEBT RECOVERY. (ch, )
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Fri 07/28 4:12 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by QUAVION DESHUN HOLLINS (Mazingo, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/28 4:07 PM
COMPLAINT against CHRISTUS HEALTH, a Texas Nonprofit Corporation d/b/a TLRA DEBT RECOVERY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9623549.), filed by QUAVION DESHUN HOLLINS.(Mazingo, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 07/28 4:46 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Fri 07/28 4:46 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (ch, )
Related: [-]