North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:James C Dever, III
Referred: Brian S Meyers
Case #: 7:23-cv-01189
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
CauseCamp Lejeune Justice Act of 2022
Case Filed:Jul 28, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 24, 2024 4:12 AM EST
Defendant
United States of America
United States Attorney Eastern District of North Carolina 310 New Bern Avenue Suite 800
Raleigh, NC 27601
Represented By
Daniel Charles Eagles
Doj-Civ
contact info
Interested Party
Torts Branch USDOJ
Plaintiff
John Everett Cathcart
Represented By
Joel R. Rhine
Rhine Martin Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Mark P. Doby
Wallace And Graham, P.A.
contact info
John S. Hughes
Wallace And Graham, P.A.
contact info
Whitney Wallace Williams
Wallace And Graham, P.A.
contact info
Mona Lisa Wallace
Wallace And Graham, P.A.
contact info
William M. Graham
Wallace & Graham, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 11/07 4:33 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (Short Form Complaint) against United States of America, filed by John Everett Cathcart. (Wallace, Mona)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/01 2:49 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Joel R. Rhine on behalf of John Everett Cathcart. (Rhine, Joel)
Related: [-]
order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 09/01 11:39 AM
TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS an extension of time for the defendant to answer or otherwise plead in response to plaintiff's complaint in all CLJA cases assigned to me through and including October 2, 2023. Entered by District Judge James C. Dever III on 8/31/2023. (Herrmann, L.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/31 10:58 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by William M. Graham on behalf of John Everett Cathcart. (Graham, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/30 5:22 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Mark P. Doby on behalf of John Everett Cathcart. (Doby, Mark)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/30 5:21 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Whitney Wallace Williams on behalf of John Everett Cathcart. (Williams, Whitney)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/30 5:01 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by John S. Hughes on behalf of John Everett Cathcart. (Hughes, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/04 2:24 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Daniel Charles Eagles on behalf of United States of America. (Eagles, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
service Notice of Camp Lejeune Justice Act Case Mon 07/31 9:48 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE. This action is governed by Standing Order 23-SO-1. Pursuant to that Order, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing System, notifying the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of North Carolina and the Civil Division, Torts Branch, Environmental Torts Litigation Office, United States Department of Justice of the case. Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. No summons will issue. Service of the Complaint and any attachments thereto will be completed by a regenerated Notice of Electronic Filing to follow immediately. (Herrmann, L.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel Mon 07/31 9:49 AM
Notice to Counsel - All counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Herrmann, L.)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/28 6:04 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Mona Lisa Wallace on behalf of John Everett Cathcart. (Wallace, Mona)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Fri 07/28 6:04 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by John Everett Cathcart (Wallace, Mona)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/28 6:03 PM
COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-7202137.), filed by John Everett Cathcart. (Wallace, Mona)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet