State of Tennessee et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-03632 |
Nature of Suit | 240 Real Property - Torts to Land |
Cause | 28:1442 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 27, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Tennessee Middle, 3:23-cv-00676 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 23, 2024 4:09 AM EST |
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
EIDP Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clamant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Fire & Security Americas Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckey Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
ABC Corporations 1-10
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan Skrmetti
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Tennessee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, November 27, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
![]() CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of Tennessee re24 Amended Complaint,,25 Summons Issued (Shah, Lauren) |
|
Wednesday, October 23, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Tuesday, October 22, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT [First] against 3M Company, ABC Corporations 1-10, AGC Chemicals Americas Inc, Archroma US Inc, Arkema Inc, BASF Corporation, Buckey Fire Equipment Company, Carrier Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Carrier Global Corporation, ChemDesign Products Inc, Chemguard Inc, Clamant Corporation, Corteva Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc, Dynax Corporation, EIDP Inc, Kidde PLC Inc, National Foam Inc, The Chemours Company, Tyco Fire Products LP, Carrier Fire & Security Corporation, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., United Technology Corporation, filed by State of Tennessee. Service due by 1/21/2025 (Shah, Lauren) |
|
Monday, October 21, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
![]() ORDER This Order Relates to Case No. 2:23-cv-03632-RMG. The motion to amend (Dkt. No. 6239 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (22) in case 2:23-cv-03632-RMG) is GRANTED and Plaintiff is directed to promptly file the amended complaint. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/21/2024.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03632-RMG(sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, October 09, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
![]() MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by State of Tennessee. Response to Motion due by 10/23/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03632-RMG(Shah, Lauren) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by State of Tennessee as to Defendant Amerex Corporation [Without Prejudice] Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03632-RMG(Shah, Lauren) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren H. Shah on behalf of State of Tennessee, State of Oregon Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03632-RMG, 2:23-cv-03633-RMG(Shah, Lauren) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 07/28 3:46 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Tennessee Middle (associated as of 7/27/2023), 3:23-cv-00676, State of Tennessee et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-03632-RMG NOTICE TO NEW COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) is open as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. All counsel of record are directed to take the steps necessary to be registered as electronic filers in the District of South Carolina ( See CMO No. 3 pg. 17 Electronic Filing at 22. footnote 5 (ECF Multidistrict Litigation Attorney Registration Form - available at link at the end of this NOTICE). CMO Nos. 1 - 26, (including any supplemental CMO Nos. i.e., 2.A, etc.) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed in the Lead case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re new Case Management Orders and other new documents posted in the lead case. Please also read CLERKS NOTICE / NOTICE (s) and QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE (s) TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 filed in the Lead case. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Monthly Status Conference TBD. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at[LINK:MDL-2873] (sshe, ) (Entered: 07/28/2023) |
|
16 | 16
![]() Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Middle; Case Number 3:23-cv-00676. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2023 | ||
15 | 15 TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-144) of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL No. 2879, this case is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina for coordinated or consolidated proceedings. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case and electronically transmit the record to the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 07/27/2023. (lh) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 7/28/2023.] | |
14 | 14
![]() |
|
13 | 13
![]() |
|
***Civil Case Terminated. (af) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 7/28/2023.] | ||
Wednesday, July 19, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() |
|
11 | 11
![]() |
|
Friday, July 14, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() |
|
TN State Bar status verified as active for Jin Yoshikawa admitted to this court . (af) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 7/28/2023.] | ||
Wednesday, July 12, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
TN State Bar status verified as active for Sohnia W. Hong admitted to this court . (af) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 7/28/2023.] | ||
TN State Bar status verified as active for Amy Marie Pepke admitted to this court . (af) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 7/28/2023.] | ||
TN State Bar status verified as active for Amanda E. Callihan admitted to this court . (af) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 7/28/2023.] | ||
TN State Bar status verified as active for Thomas J. Cullen, Jr admitted to this court . (af) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 7/28/2023.] | ||
Friday, July 07, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |