Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Hilary L Barnes
Case #: 2:23-bk-13129
Case Filed:Jul 28, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Sep 27, 2023
Claims Deadline:Jan 18, 2024
Discharge Objection Deadline:Oct 31, 2023

Debtor
CATHERINE CHAU LE
2828 Shining Sun Way
Henderson, NV 89052-4906
Represented By
PATRICK R. DRISCOLL
The Law Offices Of Patrick Driscoll, LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
ROBERT E. ATKINSON
376 E WARM SPRINGS RD STE 130
LAS VEGAS, NV 89119
Trustee
SHELLEY D KROHN
PO Box 34690
LAS VEGAS, NV 89133
Represented By
HOUMAND LAW FIRM, LTD.
contact info
BRADLEY G SIMS
Houmand Law Firm, Ltd.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 7
300 LAS VEGAS BOULEVARD, SO. SUITE 4300
LAS VEGAS, NV 89101


Docket last updated: 10/30/2023 5:27 PM PDT
Friday, July 28, 2023
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition 7([LINK 23-13129 ) [misc,volp7pb] ( 338.00). Receipt number A21234387, fee amount $ 338.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 12 pgs Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $338. Filed by PATRICK R. DRISCOLL on behalf of CATHERINE CHAU LE (DRISCOLL, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement of Social Security Number(s). This document contains sensitive information and cannot be viewed by the public. Filed by PATRICK R. DRISCOLL on behalf of CATHERINE CHAU LE (DRISCOLL, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs Meeting of Creditors and Notice of Appointment of Trustee ATKINSON, ROBERT E.. 341 meeting to be held on 9/1/2023 at 02:00 PM at Remote. Deadline to Object to Debtors Discharge or to Challenge Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 10/31/2023.
Related: [-]
4 4 Set Deficient Filing Deadlines. Incomplete Filings due by 8/11/2023. Verification of Creditor Matrix due by 8/11/2023. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due by 8/11/2023. Schedules A/B-J due by 8/11/2023. Declaration Re: Schedules due by 8/11/2023. Statement of Financial Affairs due by 8/11/2023. Statement of Intent due by 8/28/2023. Atty Disclosure Statement due by 8/11/2023. Declaration Re: E-Filing due by 8/11/2023. Statement of Current Monthly Income and Means Test Form 122A-1 Due: 8/11/2023. (mag)
Related: [-]