California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:23-cr-01499
Case Filed:Jul 27, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jul 30, 2023 12:44 AM PDT
Defendant
Emily Benitez (1)
Represented By
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Sara Marie Peloquin
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Defendant
Melanie Nicole Lopez Covarrubias (2)
Represented By
Patrick Q. Hall
Law Offices Of Patrick Q. Hall
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Eric Chiang
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info

GPO Apr 26 2024
JUDGMENT as to Melanie Nicole Lopez Covarrubias (2). Count 1: Custody of the BOP for a term of twelve months and one day. Supervised release for a term of three years. $100.00 special assessment imposed. Fine waived. Signed by District Judge James E. Simmons, Jr on 4/26/2024. (ekb)
GPO Aug 16 2024
JUDGMENT as to Emily Benitez (1). Count 1: Custody of the BOP for a term of thirteen months and one day. Supervised release for a term of three years. $100.00 special assessment imposed. Fine waived. Signed by District Judge James E. Simmons, Jr on Aug. 16, 2024. (ekb)

Docket last updated: 07/30/2023 1:07 AM PDT
Friday, July 07, 2023
Arrest of Emily Benitez, Melanie Nicole Lopez Covarrubias. (no document attached) (mef) [3:23-mj-02505-DEB]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Emily Benitez, Melanie Nicole Lopez Covarrubias.(mef) [3:23-mj-02505-DEB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Emily Benitez, Melanie Nicole Lopez Covarrubias: Initial Appearance set for 7/10/2023 before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. (no document attached) (mef) [3:23-mj-02505-DEB]
Related: [-]
3 3 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Melanie Nicole Lopez Covarrubias (rxc) (sjt). [3:23-mj-02505-DEB]
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher: Initial Appearance as to Emily Benitez, Melanie Nicole Lopez Covarrubias held on 7/10/2023. Federal Defenders appointed as counsel for Emily Benitez (1). Attorney Patrick Q. Hall (n/a) is appointed as counsel for Melanie Nicole Lopez Covarrubias (2). Bond set as to Emily Benitez (1) $15,000, secured by 1 FRRA. Bond set as to Melanie Nicole Lopez Covarrubias (2) $15,000, secured by 1 FRRA. Preliminary Hearing set for 7/20/2023 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. Arraignment set for 8/8/2023 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. (Interpreter Salvador Castellanos). (CD# 7/10/2023 DEB 23:2:19-2:55). (Plaintiff Attorney Brandon List, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Remy Bogna, FD; Julian Bugarin, FD). (yem) [3:23-mj-02505-DEB]
Related: [-]
7 7 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Emily Benitez, Melanie Nicole Lopez Covarrubias (no document attached) (yem) [3:23-mj-02505-DEB]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER as to Emily Benitez: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 7/10/2023. (yem) [3:23-mj-02505-DEB]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER as to Melanie Nicole Lopez Covarrubias: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 7/10/2023. (yem) [3:23-mj-02505-DEB]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Emily Benitez (1) $15,000 P/S, secured by 1 FRRA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 7/10/2023. (cxl) [3:23-mj-02505-DEB]
Related: [-]
11 11 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Emily Benitez (cxl) [3:23-mj-02505-DEB]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Melanie Nicole Lopez Covarrubias (2) 15,000 PS secured by the co-signature of 1 FRRA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 7/10/2023. (acc) [3:23-mj-02505-DEB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
4 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sara Marie Peloquin appearing for Emily Benitez (Peloquin, Sara)Attorney Sara Marie Peloquin added to party Emily Benitez(pty:dft) (rxc). [3:23-mj-02505-DEB]
Related: [-]
5 5 Notice of Assertion of Rights by Emily Benitez (Peloquin, Sara) (rxc). [3:23-mj-02505-DEB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
12 12 MINUTE ORDER resetting Arraignment for 7/27/2023 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. (no document attached) (acc) [3:23-mj-02505-DEB]
Related: [-]
13 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Eric Chiang appearing for USA. (Chiang, Eric)Attorney Eric Chiang added to party USA(pty:pla) (rxc). [3:23-mj-02505-DEB]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
15 15 P/S Bond Filed as to Melanie Nicole Lopez Covarrubias in amount of $15,000 secured by the co-signature of 1 FRRA, Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. (Document applicable to USA, Melanie Nicole Lopez Covarrubias.) (rxc) [3:23-mj-02505-DEB]
Related: [-]
16 16 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Melanie Nicole Lopez Covarrubias re15 Bond. (rxc) [3:23-mj-02505-DEB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
17 17 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing Rule 5.1 by Melanie Nicole Lopez Covarrubias (Hall, Patrick) (dim). [3:23-mj-02505-DEB]
Related: [-]
18 18 NOTICE of Vacated Hearing(s): 7/20/2023 Preliminary Hearing vacated re17 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing Rule 5.1 (no document attached) (acc) [3:23-mj-02505-DEB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
19 19 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING as to Defendants Emily Benitez, Melanie Nicole Lopez Covarrubias. On the Court's own motion, the Arraignment is reset for 7/27/2023 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. (yem) [3:23-mj-02505-DEB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
20 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher: Preliminary Hearing not held as to Emily Benitez. Defendant not appearing. Defense oral motion to continue hearing granted. Preliminary Hearing continued to 7/27/2023 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. (CD# 7/20/2023 DEB 23 1:38-1:39; 2:04-2:05). (Plaintiff Attorney Jacqueline Jimenez AUSA-S/A). (Defendant Attorney Carmen Rivera FD-S/A). (acc) [3:23-mj-02505-DEB]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
21 21 P/S, secured by 1 FRRA Bond Filed as to Emily Benitez in amount of $ 15,000, Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 7/18/2023. (Document applicable to USA, Emily Benitez.) (stn) [3:23-mj-02505-DEB]
Related: [-]
22 22 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Emily Benitez re21 Bond. (stn) [3:23-mj-02505-DEB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
23 23 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Chiang, Eric) (mjw). [3:23-mj-02505-DEB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
24 24 INFORMATION as to Emily Benitez (1) count(s) 1s, Melanie Nicole Lopez Covarrubias (2) count(s) 1s. (mtb)
Related: [-]
25 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Arraignment on Information as to Emily Benitez (1) Count 1 and Melanie Nicole Lopez Covarrubias (2) Count 1 held on 7/27/2023. Not Guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 9/1/2023 09:00 AM before District Judge James E. Simmons Jr. (CD# 7/27/2023 WVG23 9:32 - 9:35). (Plaintiff Attorney Parker Erickson-AUSA-S/A). (Defendant Attorney Sara Peloquin-FD; Patrick Hall-CJA). (mtb)
Related: [-]