New Mexico District Court
Case #: 2:23-cr-01173
Case Filed:Jul 27, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jul 30, 2023 1:55 AM MDT
Defendant
Jose Antonio Zamora-Carrillo (1)
Represented By
Gia A. McGillivray
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Interested Party
US Probation and Pretrial Services
Represented By
Rubisela Sedillo
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Matthew Ramirez
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/30/2023 2:49 AM MDT
Monday, May 08, 2023
Arrest of Jose Antonio Zamora-Carrillo (cfa) [2:23-mj-00808-JHR]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
Hearing as to Jose Antonio Zamora-Carrillo: Initial Appearance set for 5/10/2023 at 09:07 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) - Remote before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. (cfa) [2:23-mj-00808-JHR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
Attorney update in case as to Jose Antonio Zamora-Carrillo. Attorney Matthew Ramirez for USA added. (ac) [2:23-mj-00808-JHR]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jose Antonio Zamora-Carrillo. (ac) [2:23-mj-00808-JHR]
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Gia A. McGillivray for Jose Antonio Zamora-Carrillo by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter (ac) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:23-mj-00808-JHR]
Related: [-]
3 3 Clerk's Minutes of Initial Presentment hearing held before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter: Initial Appearance as to Jose Antonio Zamora-Carrillo held on 5/10/2023. Defendant advised of rights/penalties. Attorney to be appointed. Appearances: AUSA: Aaron Jordan; AFPD: Darren J. Robinson; FPD Standing In; Interpreter: Enith Valdes-Ortiz. Recorded: Liberty-Sierra Blanca. Rights: 9:59 AM - 10:09 AM. Time In Session: 9:59 AM - 10:09 AM. NOTICE OF HEARING: Preliminary/Detention Hearing is hereby set before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter for 5/15/2023, at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower), U.S. District Courthouse, 100 N. Church St., Las Cruces, New Mexico. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (ac) [2:23-mj-00808-JHR]
Related: [-]
4 4 Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and orders it to do so. Failing to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, or sanctions by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter (ac) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:23-mj-00808-JHR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
U.S. Probation and Pretrial Services added as interested party.(Sedillo, Rubisela) [2:23-mj-00808-JHR]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
6 6 WAIVER of Hearings by Jose Antonio Zamora-Carrillo (McGillivray, Gia) [2:23-mj-00808-JHR]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Jose Antonio Zamora-Carrillo by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. The Court having reviewed the waiver of preliminary hearing, waiver of personal presence at the preliminary hearing and request for tolling of Grand Jury presentment and waiver of detention, now finds that the ends of justice served by granting the request to toll the speedy indictment computation outweigh the interest of the defendant and the public in a speedy indictment. The Court expressly finds that the public's interest in a speedy indictment in this case is outweighed by: (I) the public's interest in a reasonably expeditious resolution of the case; (2) the public's interest in relieving the burden that would be placed on judicial, prosecutorial, defense, and law enforcement resources if the case proceeded to a preliminary examination and/or a speedy indictment; and (3) the potential benefit conferred upon the defendant in an expedited resolution of the case. IT IS THEREFORE. ORDERED, ADJUDGED. and DECREED that pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§3161(h)(7)(A), a period of time of 75 days from today's date is hereby tolled and excluded from the computation of speedy indictment. At the expiration of this 75-day period, the 30-day period pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§3161(b) for speedy indictment shall resume. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the preliminary and detention hearings are vacated. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ac) [2:23-mj-00808-JHR]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Jose Antonio Zamora-Carrillo by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea (ac) [2:23-mj-00808-JHR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
9 9 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Jose Antonio Zamora-Carrillo: Change of Plea Hearing set for 7/27/2023 at 09:10 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. [ Interpreter Needed ](rh) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:23-mj-00808-JHR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
10 10 INFORMATION as to Jose Antonio Zamora-Carrillo (1) count(s) 1. (ch)
Related: [-]
11 11 CONSENT TO PLEA BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Jose Antonio Zamora-Carrillo (ch)
Related: [-]
12 12 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Jose Antonio Zamora-Carrillo (ch)
Related: [-]
13 13 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter: Plea Hearing as to Jose Antonio Zamora-Carrillo held on 7/27/2023, Plea entered by Jose Antonio Zamora-Carrillo (1) Guilty Count 1. Related [+] (Interpreter: Armida Hernandez) (ch)
Related: [-] cording Info: LCR-Sierra Blanca