Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Cristal C Brisco
Referred: Scott J Frankel
Case #: 3:23-cv-00719
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Jan 25, 2024 4:13 AM EST
Defendant
LaPorte County Government
Represented By
Shaw R Friedman
Friedman & Associates PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Soljourna Atwater
Represented By
Amber K Boyd
Amber K Boyd Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
29 29 respm Statement Wed 04/23 11:56 AM
STATEMENT of Facts re28 Memorandum in Support, filed by LaPorte County Government. (Friedman, Shaw)
Related: [-]
28 28 8 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Wed 04/23 11:51 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LaPorte County Government.(Friedman, Shaw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Designation of Evidence in Support of MSJ,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit H
27 27 motion Summary Judgment Wed 04/23 11:42 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant LaPorte County Government. (Friedman, Shaw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
26 26 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 03/04 3:14 PM
ORDER GRANTING25 Unopposed Motion to Extend Discovery and Dispositive motion Deadlines, albeit by extending upcoming case management deadlines so that they remain consistent with the Court's Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order. The Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order is hereby EXTENDED as follows: Discovery-related nondispositive motions must be filed by 5/29/2025; and Discovery must be completed by 6/26/2025. The Court now also sua sponte sets the deadline for dispositive motions for 7/28/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel on 3/4/2025. (mrm)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
25 25 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 02/28 3:39 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines Unopposed by Plaintiff Soljourna Atwater. (Boyd, Amber)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
24 24 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 10/22 12:07 PM
ORDER granting23 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines. Deadline for Completion of Discovery is 3/28/2025. Mediation to be completed by 4/15/2025. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2025. Text entry order by Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel on 10/22/2024. (ers)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
23 23 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 10/21 9:36 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Extension of Case Management Deadlines by Plaintiff Soljourna Atwater. (Boyd, Amber)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
22 22 discov Response to Discovery Request Fri 10/18 12:33 PM
RESPONSE to Discovery Request from La Porte County Government by LaPorte County Government.(Friedman, Shaw)
Related: [-]
21 21 discov Response to Discovery Request Fri 10/18 12:31 PM
RESPONSE to Discovery Request from La Porte County Government by LaPorte County Government.(Friedman, Shaw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
20 20 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 08/13 10:05 PM
Pursuant to General Order 2024-22 and the retirement of Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr., this case is now reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel. (ksc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
19 19 notice Notice - Other Fri 03/29 6:03 PM
NOTICE by LaPorte County Government Parties' Joint Notice of Agreement on Mediator (Friedman, Shaw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
utility Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Wed 03/27 2:15 PM
***Deadlines/Hearings terminated. Terming PAST deadlines only. (nac)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Mon 03/25 11:24 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Cristal C Brisco for all further proceedings. Judge Philip P Simon no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Holly A Brady on 3/25/2024. (lns)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Failure to Return Consent Form (Standard) Thu 02/08 2:53 PM
NOTICE: Counsel for Soljourna Atwater was directed to return the Consent to or Declination of the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge attached at Docket Entry #9 regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Clerk's Office has not received the form. Counsel for Soljourna Atwater shall return the form within 10 days of the date of this entry. If, after the expiration of the 10-day extension set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Counsel also advised of 10-day consent deadline by correspondence. (kmt)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 15, 2024
15 15 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Mon 01/15 7:48 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Boyd, Amber)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
16 16 order Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Tue 01/16 1:11 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Any motion or amended complaint regarding Plaintiff's ADEA claim shall be filed on or before 01/29/2024. The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 03/29/2024. The last date to amend the pleadings without leave of court as to plaintiff(s) is 01/29/2024; as to defendant(s) is 02/28/2024. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from plaintiff(s) by April 29, 2024; and from defendant(s) by 05/29/2024. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) is due every six weeks until trial. The last date for the completion of ALL DISCOVERY is 11/29/2024. The deadline to file any discovery-related nondispositive motion is 11/01/2024. The parties shall name a mediator no later than 03/29/2024. The deadline for the parties to engage in mediation is 12/16/2024. The Court hereby VACATES the Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for January 24, 2024, at 12:00 p.m. EST. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 01/12/2024. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
14 14 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Tue 01/09 5:08 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Boyd, Amber)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
13 13 respm Response to Order to Show Cause Mon 01/08 3:25 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by LaPorte County Government filed by LaPorte County Government.(Friedman, Shaw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
12 12 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Order to Show Cause Mon 01/08 2:15 PM
ORDER: The parties are ORDERED to show cause on or before 01/16/2024, for their failure to comply with this Court's scheduling order. The parties are also ORDERED to comply with the Court's scheduling order and submit a Rule 26(f) Report of Parties' Planning on or before 01/16/2024. Failure to respond to this order may result in a dismissal of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 01/08/2024. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
11 11 order Order on Motion to Reset Thu 12/21 12:51 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Reset hearing. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference reset for 1/24/2024 11:00 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 12/21/23. (slm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
10 10 motion Reset Tue 11/28 12:44 PM
First MOTION to reset Status Conference by Defendant LaPorte County Government. (Friedman, Shaw)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Tue 11/28 10:19 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 11/28 10:19 AM
ORDER, Joint Proposed Discovery due by 1/3/2024. Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/17/2024 11:15 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 11/28/23. (slm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 10/18 10:20 AM
Defendant's ANSWER to1 Complaint by LaPorte County Government.(Friedman, Shaw)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 10/06 11:13 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: LaPorte County Government answer due 10/19/2023. (mlc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 10/06 11:12 AM
ORDER GRANTING5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs complaint is EXTENDED until October 19, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 10/5/23. (mlc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 09/19 3:09 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint by Defendant LaPorte County Government. (Friedman, Shaw)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/19 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shaw R Friedman on behalf of LaPorte County Government (Friedman, Shaw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
3 3 2 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 09/07 10:58 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Philip P Simon for all further proceedings. Judge Robert L Miller, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Holly A Brady on 9/6/23. (ksc)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 07/31 7:37 AM
Summons Issued as to LaPorte County Government. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jld)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 07/31 7:37 AM
Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (jld)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 29, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Sat 07/29 3:48 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against LAPORTE COUNTY GOVERNMENT( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5313724.), filed by SOLJOURNA ATWATER.(Boyd, Amber)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons