New Jersey District Court
Judge:Christine P O'Hearn
Referred: Sharon A King
Case #: 1:23-cv-04070
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jul 30, 2023
Last checked: Friday Jan 26, 2024 4:31 AM EST
Defendant
EGG HARBOR TOWNSHIP POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By
KYLE DAVID WEINBERG
Blaney, Donohue & Weinberg, P.C.
contact info
WILLIAM G. BLANEY, JR.
Blaney, Donohue & Weinberg, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
XYZ STATE ENTITIES
Defendant
ABC CORPORATIONS
Defendant
MICHAEL HUGHES
Represented By
KYLE DAVID WEINBERG
Blaney, Donohue & Weinberg, P.C.
contact info
WILLIAM G. BLANEY, JR.
Blaney, Donohue & Weinberg, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10
Defendant
JEFFERY LANCASTER
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER ALAN GRAY
Sciarra & Catrambone, LLC
contact info
JEFFREY D. CATRAMBONE
Sciarra & Catrambrone, LLC
contact info
MARGARET RUTH MCGUIRE SPITZER
Dilworth Paxon LLP
contact info
Defendant
REYNOLD THERIAULT
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER ALAN GRAY
Sciarra & Catrambone, LLC
contact info
JEFFREY D. CATRAMBONE
Sciarra & Catrambrone, LLC
contact info
MARGARET RUTH MCGUIRE SPITZER
Dilworth Paxon LLP
contact info
Defendant
MAINLAND LOCAL PBA #77
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER ALAN GRAY
Sciarra & Catrambone, LLC
contact info
JEFFREY D. CATRAMBONE
Sciarra & Catrambrone, LLC
contact info
MARGARET RUTH MCGUIRE SPITZER
Dilworth Paxon LLP
contact info
Defendant
DONNA L. MARKULIC
Represented By
KYLE DAVID WEINBERG
Blaney, Donohue & Weinberg, P.C.
contact info
WILLIAM G. BLANEY, JR.
Blaney, Donohue & Weinberg, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
WILLIAM NALLY
Represented By
ELIZABETH ANN BUTLER
Kaufman Borgeest & Ryan LLP
contact info
VITO A. GAGLIARDI, JR.
Porzio, Bromberg & Newman, PC
contact info
DAVID LAWRENCE DISLER
Porzio, Bromberg & Newman, P.C.
contact info
DIANA-MARIE LAVENTURE
Kaufman, Borgeest & Ryan
contact info
Defendant
NEW JERSEY STATE ASSOCIATION OF CHIEFS OF POLICE
Represented By
ELIZABETH ANN BUTLER
Kaufman Borgeest & Ryan LLP
contact info
VITO A. GAGLIARDI, JR.
Porzio, Bromberg & Newman, PC
contact info
DAVID LAWRENCE DISLER
Porzio, Bromberg & Newman, P.C.
contact info
DIANA-MARIE LAVENTURE
Kaufman, Borgeest & Ryan
contact info
Defendant
STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Defendant
THE TOWNSHIP OF EGG HARBOR
Represented By
KYLE DAVID WEINBERG
Blaney, Donohue & Weinberg, P.C.
contact info
WILLIAM G. BLANEY, JR.
Blaney, Donohue & Weinberg, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER LEARY
Represented By
PHYLLIS WIDMAN
Widman Law Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 51 minutes ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
120 120 order Order Mon 05/19 1:58 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the letter from Defendants Egg Harbor Township Police Department, The Township of Egg Harbor, Michael Hughes, and Donna L. Markulic, requesting a stay of the timelines for Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Motion, (ECF No. 118), or in the alternative, requesting an extension of time to file a response to June 2, 2025, (ECF No. 119). Defendants' request for a stay is DENIED. The request for an extension of time to file a response is GRANTED. As the Court previously noted, the motions will be decided in the order in which they were filed. So Ordered by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 5/19/25. (hem, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
119 119 2 pgs misc Letter Thu 05/15 2:57 PM
Letter from Kyle D. Weinberg, Esquire re118 First MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff-refiled per Court . (WEINBERG, KYLE)
Related: [-]