California Central District Court
Judge:Otis D Wright, II
Referred: Rozella A Oliver
Case #: 2:23-cv-06166
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 31, 2023
Terminated:Oct 10, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jan 27, 2024 12:44 AM PST
Defendant
No Jumper, Inc.
Represented By
Carla M. Wirtschafter
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Viral DRM, LLC
Represented By
Jacqueline Mandel
Sanders Law Group
contact info
Craig B Sanders
Sanders Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
15 15 2 pgs misc Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121) Tue 10/10 10:53 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing). Mailed closing report to Copyright Office. (lc)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 10/10 10:47 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Pursuant to Plaintiffs Notice of Voluntary Dismissal13 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l(a)(l):IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The entire action and all claims asserted therein are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; and 2. All dates and deadlines in this action are VACATED and taken off calendar. The Clerk of the Court shall close this case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
13 13 2 pgs notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Wed 10/04 8:40 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Viral DRM, LLC. Dismissal is with Prejudice. (Mandel, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
12 12 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Thu 08/31 12:10 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to No Jumper, Inc. answer now due 10/5/2023, filed by Defendant No Jumper, Inc..(Attorney Carla M. Wirtschafter added to party No Jumper, Inc. (pty:dft))(Wirtschafter, Carla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 08/23 7:07 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Viral DRM, LLC, upon Defendant No Jumper, Inc. served on 8/14/2023, answer due 9/5/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Todd Donell, Attorney in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Mandel, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
10 10 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Wed 08/02 10:42 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. EFFECTIVE IMMEDIATELY No mandatory chambers copies required, EXCEPT FOR motions for summary judgment and any other evidence-heavy motions. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central District's website for additional information. The address is "http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov." (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
9 9 2 pgs service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 08/01 1:31 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant No Jumper, Inc. (car)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 08/01 1:23 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 08/01 1:23 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 08/01 1:22 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
5 5 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 07/31 10:11 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Viral DRM, LLC, identifying SANDERS LAW GROUP, Jacqueline Mandel, Craig B. Sanders, No Jumper, Inc.. (Mandel, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Mon 07/31 10:08 AM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Viral DRM, LLC. (Mandel, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Mon 07/31 10:07 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Viral DRM, LLC. (Mandel, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 07/31 10:05 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Viral DRM, LLC. (Mandel, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 07/31 10:04 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35764481 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Viral DRM, LLC. (Attorney Jacqueline Mandel added to party Viral DRM, LLC(pty:pla))(Mandel, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit Original Video,
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit Infringing Use of Video