Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:David M Lawson
Referred: David R Grand
Case #: 2:23-cv-11847
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 31, 2023
Terminated:Jan 22, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jan 27, 2024 4:03 AM EST
Defendant
M&P and D&A Inc
Represented By
Mark S. Mackley
Johnston Sztykiel Hunt Fraser Gold & Barron
contact info
Bill C. Panagos
Panagos Kennedy
contact info
Linda Kennedy
Panagos Kennedy PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Prepared Food Photos, Inc.
Represented By
Charles E. Murphy
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Daniel DeSouza
Desouza Law, PA
contact info
Magy Shenouda
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Clarkston Royal Diner, Inc.
Terminated: 12/05/2023
Represented By
Mark S. Mackley
Johnston Sztykiel Hunt Fraser Gold & Barron
contact info
Bill C. Panagos
Panagos Kennedy
contact info
Linda Kennedy
Panagos Kennedy PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 22, 2024
31 31 misc Patent/Copyright/Trademark Report Mon 04/22 1:03 PM
Copyright Report Sent To Washington (SSch)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
30 30 order Dismissing Case Mon 01/22 10:39 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
29 29 notice Notice - Other Fri 01/19 11:00 AM
NOTICE by Prepared Food Photos, Inc. Joint Notice of Settlement (DeSouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 01/04 1:30 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Interim Status Conference reset for 1/24/2024 at 9:00 AM before District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Wed 01/03 11:03 AM
ORDER Denying27 Motion to Appear Telephonically or Via Zoom. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
27 27 motion For Order Thu 12/28 2:54 PM
MOTION for Order Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Telephonically or Via Zoom at the January 18, 2024, Status Conference by Prepared Food Photos, Inc.. (DeSouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
26 26 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Tue 12/05 3:24 PM
ORDER of Partial Dismissal., Clarkston Royal Diner, Inc. terminated. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (NAhm)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
25 25 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 12/01 12:21 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Defendant Royal Diner of Clarkston, Inc. ONLY by All Defendants (Mackley, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Dismissal of Defendant
Thursday, November 16, 2023
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 11/17 3:35 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
23 23 motion Withdrawal of Attorney Wed 11/15 10:23 AM
MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Bill C. Panagos & Linda D. Kennedy by All Defendants. (Kennedy, Linda)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Appearance Wed 11/15 9:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark S. Mackley on behalf of All Defendants. (Mackley, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
21 21 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Thu 10/26 10:17 AM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by M&P and D&A Inc (Kennedy, Linda)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Appearance Thu 10/26 10:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Kennedy on behalf of M&P and D&A Inc. (Kennedy, Linda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
19 19 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 10/25 3:09 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Panagos, Bill)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Wed 10/25 10:00 AM
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to M&P and D&A Inc . (DeSouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
17 17 service Summons Issued* Wed 10/11 12:59 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *M&P and D&A Inc* (KBro)
Related: [-]
16 16 cmp Civil Case - Complaint, Amended Wed 10/11 9:53 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Prepared Food Photos, Inc. against M&P and D&A Inc. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (DeSouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B
service Request for Additional Summons Wed 10/11 9:54 AM
REQUEST for SUMMONS for M&P and D&A Inc. (DeSouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
15 15 order Scheduling Order Wed 10/04 2:31 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Complaint due 10/19/2023; Interim Status Conference set for 1/18/2024 at 4:00 PM; Discovery due by 3/29/2024; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 4/19/2024; Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/2/2025 at 3:00 PM; Jury Trial set for 1/14/2025 at 8:30 AM before District Judge David M. Lawson. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. Related [+] (SPin)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 10/04 1:46 PM
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge David M. Lawson: Scheduling Conference held on 10/4/2023. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (SPin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
14 14 misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Wed 09/27 9:37 AM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (DeSouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 09/27 3:05 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference reset for 10/4/2023 at 1:30 PM (TIME CHANGE ONLY) before District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
13 13 notice Appear* Fri 09/15 10:49 AM
NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: Scheduling Conference set for 10/4/2023 at 1:00 PM before District Judge David M. Lawson. (See image for document deadline.) (SPin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
12 12 misc Attorney Appearance Tue 09/12 10:06 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Magy Shenouda appearing on behalf of Prepared Food Photos, Inc. (Shenouda, Magy)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Attorney Appearance Tue 09/12 10:04 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Charles E. Murphy appearing on behalf of Prepared Food Photos, Inc. (Murphy, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
10 10 notice Appearance Tue 09/05 11:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Kennedy on behalf of Clarkston Royal Diner, Inc.. (Kennedy, Linda)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Tue 09/05 11:10 AM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Defendants (Panagos, Bill)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/05 11:06 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Panagos, Bill)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
7 7 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 08/16 10:07 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Clarkston Royal Diner, Inc. served on 8/12/2023, answer due 9/5/2023. (DeSouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Fri 08/11 9:47 AM
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Clarkston Royal Diner, Inc. . (DeSouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
5 5 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Mon 07/31 1:04 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Prepared Food Photos, Inc. (DeSouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Patent/Copyright/Trademark Report Mon 07/31 1:01 PM
Copyright Report Sent To Washington (DeSouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued* Mon 07/31 12:56 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Clarkston Royal Diner, Inc.* (DPer)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Patent/Copyright/Trademark Report Mon 07/31 12:55 PM
[FILING ERROR: DOCUMENT NOT FLATTENED] Copyright Report Sent To Washington (DeSouza, Daniel) Modified on 7/31/2023 (DPer)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Mon 07/31 12:53 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Prepared Food Photos, Inc. against Clarkston Royal Diner, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9436079 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (DeSouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Mon 07/31 12:55 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (DPer)
Related: [-]
notice Error Mon 07/31 12:58 PM
NOTICE of error directed to Daniel DeSouza re2 Patent/Copyright/Trademark Report. Document is not flattened and contains fillable fields. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (DPer)
Related: [-]