Delaware District Court
Judge:Joseph F Bataillon
Referred: Christopher J Burke
Case #: 1:23-cv-00819
Nature of Suit835 Property Rights - Patent – Abbreviated New Drug Application
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 28, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 6:44 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Lupin Ltd.
Represented By
Andrea L. Cheek
contact info
John C. Phillips, Jr.
Phillips, Mclaughlin & Hall, P.A.
contact info
Carol M. Pitzel Cruz
contact info
William R. Zimmerman
contact info
Counter Claimant
Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By
John C. Phillips, Jr.
Phillips, Mclaughlin & Hall, P.A.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd.
Represented By
Simon D. Roberts
contact info
Vincent Li
contact info
Daniel M. Silver
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Alexandra M. Joyce
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Jayita Guhaniyogi
contact info
Counter Defendant
Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc.
Represented By
Simon D. Roberts
contact info
Vincent Li
contact info
Daniel M. Silver
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Alexandra M. Joyce
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Jayita Guhaniyogi
contact info
Counter Defendant
Astellas Pharma Inc.
Represented By
Simon D. Roberts
contact info
Vincent Li
contact info
Daniel M. Silver
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Alexandra M. Joyce
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Jayita Guhaniyogi
contact info
Defendant
Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.
Represented By
Leah M. Brackensick
contact info
Michael J. Gaertner
contact info
Alexis Stombaugh
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Emily L. Savas
contact info
Carolyn A. Blessing
contact info
Pilar Gabrielle Kraman
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
David B. Abramowitz
contact info
Jonathan B. Turpin
contact info
Defendant
Zydus Lifesciences Limited
Represented By
Leah M. Brackensick
contact info
Michael J. Gaertner
contact info
Alexis Stombaugh
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Emily L. Savas
contact info
Carolyn A. Blessing
contact info
Pilar Gabrielle Kraman
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
David B. Abramowitz
contact info
Jonathan B. Turpin
contact info
Defendant
Lupin Ltd.
Represented By
Megan C. Haney
Phillips, Mclaughlin & Hall, P.A.
contact info
Andrea L. Cheek
contact info
John C. Phillips, Jr.
Phillips, Mclaughlin & Hall, P.A.
contact info
Carol M. Pitzel Cruz
contact info
William R. Zimmerman
contact info
Defendant
Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By
Megan C. Haney
Phillips, Mclaughlin & Hall, P.A.
contact info
John C. Phillips, Jr.
Phillips, Mclaughlin & Hall, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Astellas Pharma Inc.
Represented By
Simon D. Roberts
contact info
Vincent Li
contact info
Daniel M. Silver
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Alexandra M. Joyce
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Jayita Guhaniyogi
contact info
Plaintiff
Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc.
Represented By
Simon D. Roberts
contact info
Vincent Li
contact info
Daniel M. Silver
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Alexandra M. Joyce
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Jayita Guhaniyogi
contact info
Plaintiff
Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd.
Represented By
Simon D. Roberts
contact info
Vincent Li
contact info
Daniel M. Silver
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Alexandra M. Joyce
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Jayita Guhaniyogi
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Counter Claimant
Sandoz Inc.
Terminated: 12/26/2023
Represented By
Rachel P. Waldron
contact info
Dominick T. Gattuso
Heyman Enerio Gattuso & Hirzel LLP
contact info
Steven J. Birkos
contact info
Kevin P. Burke
contact info
Defendant
Sandoz Inc.
Terminated: 12/26/2023
Represented By
William A. Rakoczy
contact info
Rachel P. Waldron
contact info
Dominick T. Gattuso
Heyman Enerio Gattuso & Hirzel LLP
contact info
Elizabeth A. DeFelice
Heyman Enerio Gattuso & Hirzel LLP
contact info
Steven J. Birkos
contact info
Kevin P. Burke
contact info
Greg L. Goldblatt
contact info

GPO Apr 24 2024
ORDER: The Court adopts the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation in full, D.I. 200, and accordingly denies Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction D.I. 98. The Court denies Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, D.I. 203. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 4/24/2024. (apk)
GPO Apr 24 2024
ORDER: The Court adopts the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation in full, D.I. 200, and accordingly denies Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction D.I. 98. The Court denies Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, D.I. 203. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 4/24/2024. (apk)
GPO Oct 30 2024
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The Parties Motions for Claim Construction (D.I. 110 and D.I. 111) are GRANTED. (See Order for further details.) Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 10/30/2024. (vfm)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
minutes Markman Hearing Fri 05/16 11:39 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph F. Bataillon - Markman Hearing held on 5/16/2025. Counsel for Plaintiff: Daniel M. Silver, Bryan S. Hales, and Tera Stone. Counsel for Defendants: Pilar Gabrielle Kraman, Alexis Stombaugh, Michael J. Gaertner, David B. Abramowitz, John C. Phillips, Jr., William R. Zimmerman, Andrea L. Cheek, Cortlan Hitch, and Sri Sankaran. (Court Reporter Stacy Ingram.) Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01589-JFB-EGT et al.(mpb)
Related: [-]