South Carolina District Court
Judge:Joseph F Anderson, Jr
Case #: 5:23-cv-03653
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jul 28, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 24, 2024 4:15 AM EST
Defendant
Cato Corporation, The
Plaintiff
Gaetane Garnett
Represented By
Michael C Tanner
Michael C Tanner Law Office
contact info
Emre Ersoy
Michael C Tanner Law Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Cato Corporation
Terminated: 12/01/2023
Represented By
Daniel Richard Fuerst
Moore And Van Allen (chas)
contact info
Thomas Augustine Barrow
Hall Booth Smith (mt Pl)
contact info
Joseph D Thompson, III
Hall Booth Smith (chas)
contact info
Defendant
Cato Fashions
Terminated: 12/01/2023
Represented By
Daniel Richard Fuerst
Moore And Van Allen (chas)
contact info
Thomas Augustine Barrow
Hall Booth Smith (mt Pl)
contact info
Joseph D Thompson, III
Hall Booth Smith (chas)
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
33 33 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 01/07 2:05 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Gaetane Garnett, Cato Corporation, Cato Corporation, The, Cato Fashions. (Barrow, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
31 31 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 12/02 4:16 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 30 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Daniel Furst. Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 12/2/2024.(jpet, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
30 30 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 11/26 1:36 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Cato Corporation, Cato Corporation, The, Cato Fashions. Response to Motion due by 12/10/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Fuerst, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
29 29 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 08/05 1:06 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER AND SPECIAL NOTICE TO COUNSEL WITH CASES BEFORE JUDGE JOSEPH F. ANDERSON, JR. (Discovery due by 11/30/2024, Motions due by 1/15/2025, Jury Selection Deadline May/June 2025 term of court) Motion granted: 28 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 21 Scheduling Order. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 8/5/2024. (jpet, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
28 28 motion Amend/Correct Fri 08/02 2:41 PM
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct21 Scheduling Order, by Cato Corporation, Cato Corporation, The, Cato Fashions. Response to Motion due by 8/16/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Barrow, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Client Consent to Extend Scheduling Order and Deadlines (signed by Def),
Att: 3 Client Consent to Extend Scheduling Order and Deadlines (signed by Pl)
Friday, July 19, 2024
27 27 misc Entry Deletion Fri 07/19 3:41 PM
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 27 Reason: Clerk filed in incorrect case. (agaz, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
24 24 service Summons Issued Tue 12/05 9:18 AM
Summons Issued as to Cato Corporation, The. (jpet, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
23 23 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 12/01 12:19 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cato Corporation, The, filed by Gaetane Garnett. Service due by 2/29/2024. Re-filed to correct parties and replace with corrected document on 12/5/2023.(jpet, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Monday, November 27, 2023
21 21 order Scheduling Order Mon 11/27 4:34 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER AND SPECIAL NOTICE TO COUNSEL WITH CASES BEFORE JUDGE JOSEPH F. ANDERSON, JR. Correction of Caption due by 12/1/2023, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/11/2024, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/23/2024, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/22/2024, Discovery due by 7/1/2024, Motions due by 7/22/2024, Jury Selection Deadline November/December 2024 term of court, Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 11/27/2023. (jpet, )
Related: [-]
20 20 minutes Pretrial Conference Mon 11/27 4:27 PM
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr: Rule 16 Conference held on 11/27/2023. Court to issue scheduling order. Court Reporter N/A. (jpet, )
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Rescheduled Hearing Mon 11/27 8:42 AM
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING **CHANGE IN TIME ONLY** Rule 16 Conference set for 11/27/2023 at 10:00am cancelled and rescheduled to: Rule 16 Conference set for 11/27/2023 02:00 PM before Honorable Joseph F Anderson Jr. The Court will conduct the conference via telephone. Counsel shall initiate the call and once everyone is on the line please call Judge Anderson at 803-765-5136. Alternatively, the parties may supply a conference call-in number to chambers.(jpet, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
18 18 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 11/09 1:58 PM
ORDER RESCHEDULING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Conference set for 11/21/2023 02:00 PM before Honorable Joseph F Anderson Jr. The Court will conduct the conference via telephone. Counsel shall initiate the call and once everyone is on the line please call Judge Anderson at 803-765-5136. Alternatively, the parties may supply a conference call-in number to chambers. Matters to be taken up during the conference will include all those items identified in Rule 16(a) and (c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The attorneys of record shall conduct a conference pursuant to Rule 26(f) no later than 14 days prior to the date of the Rule 16 Conference. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 11/9/2023. (jpet, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
17 17 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 10/31 3:35 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Conference set for 11/21/2023 02:00 PM before Honorable Joseph F Anderson Jr. The Court will conduct the conference via telephone. Counsel shall initiate the call and once everyone is on the line please call Judge Anderson at 803-765-5136. Alternatively, the parties may supply a conference call-in number to chambers. Matters to be taken up during the conference will include all those items identified in Rule 16(a) and (c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The attorneys of record shall conduct a conference pursuant to Rule 26(f) no later than 14 days prior to the date of the Rule 16 Conference. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 10/31/2023. (jpet, )
Related: [-]
16 16 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 10/31 11:00 AM
ANSWER to14 Amended Complaint by Cato Corporation, Cato Fashions.(Barrow, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
15 15 service Summons Issued Thu 10/19 4:01 PM
Summons Issued as to Cato Corporation, Cato Fashions. (jpet, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 10/18 11:32 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gaetane Garnett. Service due by 1/16/2024 (Tanner, Michael) (Attachment 1 replaced with corrected document provided by filing user on 10/19/2023) (jpet, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
13 13 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 10/04 11:52 AM
ORDER granting 9 Motion for More Definite Statement, denying 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Amended complaint due by 10/18/2023.) Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 10/4/2023. (jpet, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
12 12 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 09/12 4:48 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT Response filed by Gaetane Garnett.Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/19/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Ersoy, Emre)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/12 4:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Emre Ersoy on behalf of Gaetane Garnett (Ersoy, Emre)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
9 9 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 08/29 6:14 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT by Cato Corporation, Cato Fashions. Response to Motion due by 9/12/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Fuerst, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo in Support
Thursday, August 24, 2023
8 8 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 08/24 2:45 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Gaetane Garnett.(Tanner, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
7 7 notice Notice and Acknowledgment of Removal Tue 08/01 2:19 PM
NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Orangeburg County.(Fuerst, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Acknowledgment of Removal
Monday, July 31, 2023
4 4 notice Notice Other Mon 07/31 12:16 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff is reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed no later than 14 days after service of the notice of removal. Please file these answers to interrogatories no later than August 11, 2023 re1 Notice of Removal (mflo, )
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2023
2 2 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Mon 07/31 12:13 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Cato Corporation, Cato Fashions.(mflo, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 07/31 12:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orangeburg County Court of Common Pleaws, case number 2023-CP 38-00600 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-11234285), filed by Cato Fashions, Cato Corporation.(mflo, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Documents