Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:23-cv-03729
Nature of Suit245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability
Cause28:1442 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Aug 01, 2023
Case in other court:Pennsylvania Middle, 1:23-cv-01151
Last checked: Monday Jan 29, 2024 4:17 AM EST
Defendant
3M Company
Defendant
UTC Fire and Security Americas Corp., Inc.
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Represented By
Jason A. Levine
Hangley Aronchick Segal Pudlin & Schiller
contact info
Mark A. Aronchick
Hangley Aronchick Segal & Pudlin
contact info
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
Defendant
The Chemours Company
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corp
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Defendant
Kidde Plc. Inc.
Defendant
EIDP Inc
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Dow Inc.
2211 H.H. Dow Way
Midland, MI 48674
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-100
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
Clariant Corp
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Represented By
Jason A. Levine
Hangley Aronchick Segal Pudlin & Schiller
contact info
Mark A. Aronchick
Hangley Aronchick Segal & Pudlin
contact info
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Carrier Global Corp.
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086
Defendant
BASF Corp
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
Archoma US, Inc.
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc.
Plaintiff
York County, Pennsylvania
Represented By
Jason H Wilson
Grant And Eisenhofer PA
contact info
Jay W Eisenhofer
Grant And Eisenhofer
contact info
Viola Vetter
Grant & Eisenhofer PA
contact info
Kyle J McGee
Grant And Eisenhofer PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
11 11 service Certificate of Service Tue 11/07 3:34 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by York County, Pennsylvania re10 Summons Issued,1 Notice of Removal, (Complaint)(Vetter, Viola)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Monday, November 06, 2023
10 10 service Summons Issued Mon 11/06 2:56 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
9 9 misc MDL Member Case Opened Tue 08/01 4:34 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Pennsylvania Middle (associated as of 8/1/2023), 1:23-cv-01151, York County, Pennsylvania v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-03729-RMG (sshe, )
Related: [-]
7 7 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Tue 08/01 4:32 PM
Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 1:23-cv-01151. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
6 6 3 pgs order Order Tue 08/01 9:55 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE DISTRICT OF SOUTH CAROLINA (MDL No. 2873) PER CERTIFIED CTO-145. (mw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
5 5 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Defendants to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before August 21, 2023, the parties shall file on the docket a joint letter regarding the status of this case in relation to the Multidistrict Litigation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 7/20/23. (rw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/1/2023.]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
4 4 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Defendants to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Levine, Jason) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/1/2023.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
3 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Aronchick on behalf of Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP (Aronchick, Mark) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/1/2023.]
Related: [-]
2 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Levine, Jason) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/1/2023.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard, Inc. from York County, Court Of Common Pleas, case number 2023-SU-01469. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAMDC-6338601.), filed by Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard, Inc..(ll) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/1/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) A-Complaint
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Email sent to attorneys for plaintiff to apply for pro hac vice or general admission. (ll) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/1/2023.]
Related: [-]