New York Southern District Court
Judge:Paul G Gardephe
Case #: 1:23-cv-06762
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332jd Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2023
Terminated:Dec 06, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jan 29, 2024 3:42 AM EST
Defendant
Earl Neal
Defendant
J&E Core Corp.
Defendant
D.P. Group General Contractors/Developers
Represented By
Luis Sabillon
Cullen And Dykman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Parkside Terrace Partnership Housing Development Fund Company Inc.
Represented By
Kristin Vonderhorst Gallagher
Kennedys
contact info
Defendant
Ro-Sal Plumbing & Heating, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher M. Otton
Law Offices Of Kevin P. Westerman
contact info
Plaintiff
Northfield Insurance Company
Represented By
Tung Sing Wong
Usery & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
38 38 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 03/05 12:15 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) J&E Core Corp., D.P. Group General Contractors/Developers, Earl Neal, Parkside Terrace Partnership Housing Development Fund Company Inc., Ro-Sal Plumbing & Heating, Inc. and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Northfield Insurance Company. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Wong, Tung Sing)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
37 37 order Order of Dismissal Wed 12/06 4:58 PM
ORDER: The Court having been advised that all claims asserted herein have been settled, it is ordered that the above-entitled action be, and hereby is, dismissed with prejudice but without costs; provided, however, that if the settlement is not consummated within ninety days of this order, any party may apply by letter within the ninety-day period for restoration of the action to the calendar of the undersigned, in which event the action will be restored. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. Any pending dates and deadlines are adjourned sine die, and any pending motions are moot. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/06/2023) (ama)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Letter Wed 12/06 9:40 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Tung Sing Wong dated December 6, 2023 re: 90-Day Order. Document filed by Northfield Insurance Company..(Wong, Tung Sing)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
35 35 misc Letter Thu 11/30 3:54 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Tung Sing Wong dated November 30, 2023 re: Settlement. Document filed by Northfield Insurance Company..(Wong, Tung Sing)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
34 34 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 11/01 1:28 PM
STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME TOANSWER, Motions terminated:33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint,, . filed by Parkside Terrace Partnership Housing Development Fund Company Inc.., IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned attorneys that the time for Defendant, PARKSIDE TERRACE PARTNERSHIP HOUSING DEVELOPMENT FUND COMPANY, INC.'s time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint in the above-captioned matter has been extended to November 9, 2023. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that electronic signatures shall be deemed originals and that this Stipulation may be filed with the Court without further notice. The parties hereby consent to electronic service of all documents per Rule 5(b)(2)(E) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/1/2023) Parkside Terrace Partnership Housing Development Fund Company Inc. answer due 11/9/2023. (ks)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
33 33 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 10/27 11:43 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint,, . Document filed by Parkside Terrace Partnership Housing Development Fund Company Inc...(Gallagher, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
32 32 order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Wed 10/25 11:56 AM
ORDER granting31 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conference on November 2, 2023, is rescheduled to December 7, 2023, at 11:00 a.m. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/25/2023) Initial Conference set for 12/7/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (ks)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
31 31 motion Adjourn Conference Tue 10/24 4:34 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Tung Sing Wong - request to adjourn initial conference. Document filed by Northfield Insurance Company..(Wong, Tung Sing)
Related: [-]
30 30 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Tue 10/24 11:01 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. J&E Core Corp. served on 10/17/2023, answer due 11/7/2023. Document filed by Northfield Insurance Company..(Wong, Tung Sing)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
29 29 discov Interrogatories Wed 10/18 2:56 PM
FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES to Plaintiff.Document filed by D.P. Group General Contractors/Developers..(Sabillon, Luis)
Related: [-]
28 28 discov Request for Production of Documents Wed 10/18 2:55 PM
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS.Document filed by D.P. Group General Contractors/Developers..(Sabillon, Luis)
Related: [-]
27 27 discov Notice to Take Deposition Wed 10/18 2:50 PM
NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION of Plaintiff on December 29, 2023 at 10 am.Document filed by D.P. Group General Contractors/Developers..(Sabillon, Luis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
26 26 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Thu 10/12 10:59 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Parkside Terrace Partnership Housing Development Fund Company Inc. served on 10/4/2023, answer due 10/25/2023. Document filed by Northfield Insurance Company..(Wong, Tung Sing)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
25 25 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 10/11 4:26 PM
ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by D.P. Group General Contractors/Developers..(Sabillon, Luis)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 10/11 4:23 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by D.P. Group General Contractors/Developers..(Sabillon, Luis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
23 23 discov Interrogatories Thu 09/28 11:19 AM
FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES to Northfield Insurance Company.Document filed by Ro-Sal Plumbing & Heating, Inc...(Otton, Christopher)
Related: [-]
22 22 discov Request for Production of Documents Thu 09/28 11:15 AM
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS.Document filed by Ro-Sal Plumbing & Heating, Inc...(Otton, Christopher)
Related: [-]
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 09/28 11:07 AM
ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Ro-Sal Plumbing & Heating, Inc...(Otton, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
20 20 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 09/14 12:30 PM
ORDER granting19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re19 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by October 11, 2023 addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Luis Sabillon dated September 13, 2023.The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. D.P. Group General Contractors/Developers answer due 10/11/2023 (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/14/2023) (jca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 09/13 12:09 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by October 11, 2023 addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Luis Sabillon dated September 13, 2023. Document filed by D.P. Group General Contractors/Developers..(Sabillon, Luis)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 08/25 11:39 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,, served. D.P. Group General Contractors/Developers served on 8/15/2023, answer due 9/5/2023. Service was accepted by Tsachai Simpson, Project Manager. Document filed by Northfield Insurance Company..(Wong, Tung Sing)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 08/25 11:37 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,, served. Ro-Sal Plumbing & Heating, Inc. served on 8/14/2023, answer due 9/5/2023. Service was accepted by Denise Doe. Document filed by Northfield Insurance Company..(Wong, Tung Sing)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
16 16 service Summons Issued Tue 08/08 3:02 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to D.P. Group General Contractors/Developers..(pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
15 15 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 08/07 9:29 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to D.P. Group General Contractors/Developers, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Northfield Insurance Company..(Wong, Tung Sing)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
14 14 service Summons Issued Fri 08/04 2:20 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to J&E Core Corp...(pc)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Issued Fri 08/04 2:20 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ro-Sal Plumbing & Heating, Inc...(pc)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Issued Fri 08/04 2:19 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Parkside Terrace Partnership Housing Development Fund Company Inc...(pc)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued Fri 08/04 2:19 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Earl Neal..(pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 08/04 2:20 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Tung Sing Wong to RE-FILE Document No. 6 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): docket entry does not match the parties being listed on the summons form (D.P. Group General Contractors/Developers). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2023
10 10 order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Thu 08/03 12:22 PM
NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/2/2023 at 11:45 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (And as further set forth herein) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/3/2023) (jca)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 08/03 11:59 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Earl Neal, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Northfield Insurance Company..(Wong, Tung Sing)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 08/03 11:58 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ro-Sal Plumbing & Heating, Inc., re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Northfield Insurance Company..(Wong, Tung Sing)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 08/03 11:56 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Parkside Terrace Partnership Housing Development Fund Company, Inc., re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Northfield Insurance Company..(Wong, Tung Sing)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 08/03 11:53 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to D.P. Group, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Northfield Insurance Company..(Wong, Tung Sing)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 08/03 11:52 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to J&E Core Corp., re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Northfield Insurance Company..(Wong, Tung Sing)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Thu 08/03 10:46 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Tung Sing Wong. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: D.P. Group General Contractors/Developers Inc., J&E CORE CORP., O-SAL PLUMBING & HEATING, INC, PARKSIDE TERRACE PARTNERSHIP HOUSING DEVELOPMENT FUND COMPANY, INC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party name entered incorrectly. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Thu 08/03 10:48 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Tung Sing Wong. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 08/03 10:49 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 08/03 10:50 AM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 08/03 10:50 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 08/03 10:54 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Tung Sing Wong to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Each Summons Request is filed as its own individual ECF Event. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
4 4 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 08/02 2:16 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Northland Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Northfield Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for Northfield Insurance Company. Document filed by Northfield Insurance Company..(Wong, Tung Sing)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 08/02 2:11 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wong, Tung Sing)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 08/02 2:10 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to J&E CORE CORP., D.P. GROUP GENERAL CONTRACTORS/DEVELOPERS, PARKSIDE TERRACE PARTNERSHIP HOUSING DEVELOPMENT FUND COMPANY, INC., RO-SAL PLUMBING & HEATING, INC, and EARL NEAL, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Northfield Insurance Company..(Wong, Tung Sing)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 08/02 2:00 PM
COMPLAINT against D.P. Group General Contractors/Developers Inc., J&E CORE CORP., Earl Neal, O-SAL PLUMBING & HEATING, INC, PARKSIDE TERRACE PARTNERSHIP HOUSING DEVELOPMENT FUND COMPANY, INC.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28091745)Document filed by Northfield Insurance Company..(Wong, Tung Sing)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A (1) - Northfield policy,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A (2) - Northfield policy,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B - J & E Sub Agreement Parkside,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C - S&C Underlying,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D - 7.27.18 tender response,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit E - 2.18.20 tender response,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit F - 6.30.20 tender denial