New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Alan S Trust
Case #: 8:23-bk-72834
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2023
Plan Confirmed:Mar 01, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Aberdeen Enterpises, Inc.
376 Gin Lane
Southampton, NY 11968
Represented By
J Ted Donovan
Goldberg Weprin Finkel Goldstein LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Long Island Federal Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza - Room 560
Central Islip, NY 11722


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 6:06 PM EDT
Monday, April 07, 2025
403 403 misc Letter Wed 04/23 3:48 PM
Letter Filed by Louise Blouin Related [+] Filed Via Electronic Drop Box (alh)
Related: [-] 401 Generic Order
Att: 1 Order
Friday, April 04, 2025
405 405 misc Letter Thu 04/24 11:39 AM
Letter Filed by Louise Blouin Related [+] Filed Via Electronic Drop Box (alh)
Related: [-] 404 Motion to Authorize/Direct filed by Interested Party Louise Blouin
404 404 motion Authorize/Direct Thu 04/24 11:37 AM
Simplified Motion to Readdress early January 2024 Disputed Claims, Fraudulent Actions, and Request for Court Relief Filed by Louise Blouin. Filed Via Electronic Drop Box (alh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
402 402 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Thu 04/03 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 04/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
401 401 order Generic Order Mon 03/31 12:49 PM
Order concerning Luise Blouin filings. The Motion to Reconsider is denied; and the Motion to Compel is denied. Ms. Blouin is enjoined and prohibited from filing any further pleadings in Debtors cases, other than timely filed appeals from any orders which have been entered, including this Order Related [+]. Signed on 3/31/2025 (dnb)
Related: [-] 390 Motion to Authorize/Direct filed by Interested Party Louise Blouin