New York Northern District Court
Case #: 5:23-mj-00430
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Aug 03, 2023 3:42 AM EDT
Defendant
Theodore Farnsworth (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jessica N. Carbone
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Northern District Of New York
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/03/2023 3:56 AM EDT
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
Rule 32.1 arrest of Theodore Farnsworth. (jdc )
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Theodore Farnsworth Initial Appearance set for 8/2/2023 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric, via Microsoft Teams Videoconferencing. The courtroom Deputy will send a teams link to the parties to participate. (jdc )
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs 32.1 Documents Received as to Theodore Farnsworth (jdc)
Related: [-]