Washington Western District Court
Judge:Kymberly K Evanson
Case #: 3:23-cv-05694
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:623 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2023
Terminated:Sep 16, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 29, 2024 1:08 AM PST
Defendant
MKS Instruments Inc
Represented By
Sarah N Turner
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani Llp (seattle)
contact info
Callie A Lee
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani Llp (seattle)
contact info
Plaintiff
David Them
Represented By
Rebecca Elise Ary
Law Office Of Rebecca E Ary
contact info


Docket last updated: 82 minutes ago
Monday, September 16, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Terminate Case Mon 09/16 11:22 AM
ORDER granting Parties'18 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss. This action is dismissed with prejudice and without an award of attorneys' fees or costs to any party. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (SB)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
18 18 motion Stipulated Motion Fri 09/13 5:39 PM
Stipulated MOTION and Order to Dismiss , filed by Plaintiff David Them. Noting Date 9/16/2024, (Ary, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
17 17 order 1 - Order Mon 08/05 5:03 PM
ORDER Denying Stipulated Protective Order. The parties' motion (Dkt. No.16 ) is DENIED without prejudice, subject to re-filing in compliance with Local Civil Rule 26(c)(2). Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (KRA)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
16 16 misc Stipulation Fri 08/02 2:32 PM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER [Protective Order] by parties (Demmon, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
15 15 3 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 06/11 4:53 PM
ORDER granting Parties'14 Stipulated MOTION for Continuance of Trial Date and Related Dates. 8-day Jury Trial is set for 8/4/2025 before District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 2/3/2025, Discovery Motions due by 2/28/2025, Discovery completed by 3/24/2025, Dispositive motions due by 4/7/2025, Settlement Conference held no later than 5/26/2025, Motions in Limine due by 6/27/2025, Proposed Jury Instructions and Agreed Pretrial Order due by 7/14/2025, Trial briefs, proposed voir dire questions, and deposition designations due by 7/21/2025, Pretrial Conference set for 7/25/2025 at 10:00 AM. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (SB)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Stipulated Motion Tue 06/11 9:57 AM
Stipulated MOTION for Continuance of Trial Date and Related Dates , filed by Defendant MKS Instruments Inc. Noting Date 6/11/2024, (Turner, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Continuance of Trial Date and Related Dates
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Wed 01/24 8:28 AM
Attorney Callie A Lee added for MKS Instruments Inc, per the filing of Defendant's13 Notice of Association of Counsel. (SB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
13 13 notice Notice-Other Tue 01/23 10:51 PM
NOTICE of Association of Counsel ; filed by Defendant MKS Instruments Inc. (Turner, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
12 12 order KKE Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates (FORM) Tue 01/02 8:05 AM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *8 days*. Jury Trial is set for 1/27/2025 at 09:30 AM before District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. Joinder of Parties due by 1/30/2024, Amended Pleadings due by 2/27/2024, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 7/1/2024, Discovery Motions due by 7/31/2024, Discovery completed by 8/30/2024, Dispositive motions due by 9/30/2024, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 11/29/2024, Motions in Limine due by 12/23/2024, Proposed jury instructions due by 1/6/2025, Pretrial Order due by 1/6/2025, Trial briefs to be submitted by 1/13/2025, Proposed voir dire questions due by 1/13/2025, Deposition Designations due by 1/13/2025, Pretrial Conference set for 1/17/2025 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
11 11 misc Joint Status Report Fri 12/29 4:21 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 8. (Ary, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
10 10 order KKE Order Re Chambers Procedures CV (FORM) Mon 12/18 7:26 AM
ORDER REGARDING CHAMBERS PROCEDURES IN CIVIL CASES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
9 9 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 12/08 2:10 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by MKS Instruments Inc. (Turner, Sarah)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/08 2:08 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by MKS Instruments Inc.(Turner, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
7 7 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Fri 11/17 12:16 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/8/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/22/2023, Joint Status Report due by 12/29/2023. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/17 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah N Turner on behalf of Defendant MKS Instruments Inc. (Turner, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
5 5 service Waiver of Service Wed 10/11 4:53 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant MKS Instruments Inc mailed on 10/9/2023 (Ary, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
4 4 order KKE Standing Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM) Wed 09/27 9:19 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
3 3 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 09/07 11:38 AM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson for all further proceedings. U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo no longer assigned to case. Authorized by U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo. (MGC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 08/03 9:31 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) MKS Instruments Inc. (MW)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 08/03 9:21 AM
U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo added. (MW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/02 7:19 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) MKS Instruments Inc with JURY DEMAND Related [+] Attorney Rebecca Elise Ary added to party David Them(pty:pla) filed by David Them.(Ary, Rebecca)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8110315
Att: 1 Summons MKS Instruments, Inc.,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet