Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Anthony J Trenga
Referred: Ivan D Davis
Case #: 1:23-cv-01029
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Aug 03, 2023
Terminated:Aug 28, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 30, 2024 3:54 AM EST
Defendant
Dyck-O'Neal, Inc.
Represented By
David Neal Anthony
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders Llp (richmond)
contact info
Noah DiPasquale
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Sangeeta Phillips Spengler
Martin Golden Lyons Watts Morgan Pllc (na)
contact info
Plaintiff
Fredis Antonio Hernandez
Represented By
Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Kelly Guzzo PLC
contact info
Matthew G Rosendahl
Kelly Guzzo PLC
contact info
James Patrick McNichol
Kelly Guzzo PLC
contact info
Casey Shannon Nash
Kelly Guzzo PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 42 minutes ago
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
77 77 5 pgs order Order Wed 08/28 3:36 PM
FINAL APPROVAL ORDER - Ordered that the Settlement Agreement submitted by the Parties for the Settlement Class is finally approved pursuant to Rule 23(e) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as fair, reasonable, and adequate and in the best interests of the Settlement Class. The Settlement Agreement shall therefore be deemed incorporated herein and the proposed settlement is finally approved and shall be consummated in accordance with the terms and provisions thereof, except as amended or clarified by any subsequent order issued by this Court. This action is hereby dismissed on the merits, with prejudice and without costs (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 8/28/2024. (dzir)
Related: [-]
76 76 minutes Motion Hearing Wed 08/28 2:32 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga: Motion Hearing held on 8/28/2024 re72 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Settlement and for Service Award and Attorneys' Fees filed by Fredis Antonio Hernandez. Counsel appeared for Plaintiff and Defendant. The Court finds that the settlement is fair, reasonable, and adequate, and the motion is granted. Order to follow. (Court Reporter R. Montgomery)(dzir)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 08/28 9:08 AM
Reset Deadlines as to72 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Settlement and for Service Award and Attorneys' Fees . Motion Hearing reset for 8/28/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. (dzir)
Related: [-]