Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Robert J Jonker
Referred: Sally J Berens
Case #: 1:23-cv-00826
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Aug 03, 2023
Terminated:Feb 13, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 30, 2024 3:20 AM EST
case evaluator
Case Evaluator
Represented By
Douglas A. Dozeman
Warner Norcross & Judd Llp (grand Rapids)
contact info
Christopher D. Morris
Lewis Reed & Allen PC
contact info
case evaluator chair
Case Evaluator, Chair
Represented By
Sandra J. Franklin
contact info
defendant
Shawn Knash
an individual
2508 Hemlock, MI 49024
Represented By
Bradley L. Smith
Endurance Law Group
contact info
plaintiff
Fit Body Boot Camp, Inc.
Represented By
Courtney E. S. Fisk
Kreis Enderle Hudgins & Borsos Pc (grand Rapids)
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
37 37 misc Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark Tue 02/13 11:23 AM
REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office on the determination of a TRADEMARK ACTION (ns)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
36 36 order Judgment Mon 02/12 11:48 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff against Defendant; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
35 35 misc Offer of Judgment Fri 02/09 4:38 PM
OFFER OF JUDGMENT ACCEPTANCE by plaintiff Fit Body Boot Camp, Inc. (Fisk, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 04, 2024
34 34 notice Notice Cancelling Motion Hearing Sun 02/04 9:13 AM
NOTICE cancelling motion hearing set for February 9, 2024 (Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
33 33 misc Offer of Judgment Mon 01/29 6:01 PM
OFFER OF JUDGMENT by defendant Shawn Knash (Smith, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
32 32 respm Response in Opposition Tue 12/19 11:08 AM
RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to compel Arbitration and Consolidated in response to Order 24 26 CORRECTED filed by Fit Body Boot Camp, Inc. (Fisk, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, December 18, 2023
31 31 notice Notice of Motion Hearing Mon 12/18 1:50 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING regarding document number26 : motion hearing is set for 2/9/2024 at 02:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Robert J. Jonker; (Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Notify Attorney Notice Mon 12/18 11:50 AM
NOTICE to attorney Courtney E. S. Fisk regarding recent filing29 (eod)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 16, 2023
29 29 respm Response to Motion Sat 12/16 2:48 PM
RESPONSE TO MOTION to compel Arbitration and Consolidated in response to Order 24 26 filed by Fit Body Boot Camp, Inc. (Fisk, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Tue 12/12 2:21 PM
ORDER denying27 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
27 27 motion Appear Mon 12/11 4:25 PM
FIRST MOTION for leave to appear Pro Hac Vice - Christopher Alexander by plaintiff Fit Body Boot Camp, Inc.; (Fisk, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Christopher Alexander,
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Friday, November 17, 2023
26 26 motion Compel Fri 11/17 1:16 PM
MOTION to compel Arbitration and Consolidated RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (ECF 24) by defendant Shawn Knash; (Smith, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Franchise Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit Knash Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit Smith - Alexander Correspondence
Thursday, November 16, 2023
25 25 service Proof of Service Thu 11/16 3:53 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Fit Body Boot Camp, Inc. for Rule 26(a) disclosures (Fisk, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
24 24 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause (Deadline) Thu 11/09 12:55 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendant to show cause by 12/8/2023; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
23 23 adr Case Evaluation - Notice of Selection of Panel (Standard Track) Tue 10/24 2:20 PM
NOTICE of selection of standard track case evaluation panel consisting of Sandra J. Franklin, Douglas A. Dozeman, and Christopher D. Morris; panel chairperson to host the hearing no later than May 31, 2024 (kmd)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
22 22 order Case Management Order Mon 10/23 4:52 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 5/31/2024; dispositive motions due by 7/15/2024; settlement conference set for 10/29/2024 at 09:15 AM at by video before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; final pretrial conference set for 11/25/2024 at 03:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Robert J. Jonker; bench trial set for 12/10/2024 at 08:30 AM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Robert J. Jonker; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
Related: [-]
21 21 3 pgs order Order Referring Case to Case Evaluation Mon 10/23 4:49 PM
ORDER referring case to STANDARD TRACK CASE EVALUATION; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
Related: [-]
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 10/23 4:46 PM
ORDER denying17 motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
Related: [-]
19 19 minutes Scheduling Conference - Rule 16 Mon 10/23 11:46 AM
MINUTES of Rule 16 scheduling conference held before Judge Robert J. Jonker (Court Reporter: Paul Brandell) (Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
18 18 misc Joint Status Report (Rule 16) Mon 10/16 1:20 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT (Fisk, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
17 17 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 10/02 1:15 PM
MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction with prejudice and request for attorney fees by defendant Shawn Knash; (Smith, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Knash declaration
Monday, September 11, 2023
16 16 5 pgs order Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Mon 09/11 8:11 PM
ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 10/23/2023 at 11:00 AM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 10/16/2023; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 09/11 8:09 PM
ORDER granting12 motion for extension of time; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Proposed Order Mon 09/11 2:22 PM
PROPOSED ORDER regarding stipulated second extension of time to answer complaint by defendant Shawn Knash (Smith, Bradley)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Proposed Order Mon 09/11 1:48 PM
PROPOSED ORDER regarding second extension of time to answer complaint by defendant Shawn Knash (Smith, Bradley)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extension of Time Mon 09/11 1:42 PM
MOTION for extension of time to answer complaint or otherwise plead by defendant Shawn Knash; (Smith, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
notice Attorney Appearance Fri 09/08 4:59 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Bradley L. Smith on behalf of defendant Shawn Knash (Smith, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
11 11 service Proof of Service Wed 08/30 10:10 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Fit Body Boot Camp, Inc. re Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order10 upon Defendant, Shawn Knash (Fisk, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 08/29 10:24 AM
ORDER granting STIPULATION9 ; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
9 9 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Mon 08/28 4:32 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by plaintiff Fit Body Boot Camp, Inc. (Fisk, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
8 8 misc Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark Tue 08/08 3:12 PM
CORRECTED REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office on the filing of a TRADEMARK ACTION (jjm)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/08 2:12 PM
SUMMONS returned executed; Shawn Knash served on 8/7/2023, answer due 8/28/2023 (Fisk, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 08/03 12:56 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Shawn Knash (jjm)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark Thu 08/03 12:53 PM
REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office on the filing of a TRADEMARK ACTION (jjm)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Thu 08/03 12:51 PM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Robert J. Jonker (jjm)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 08/03 11:25 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fit Body Boot Camp, Inc. (Fisk, Courtney) Modified text on 8/3/2023 (jjm)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Proposed Summons (to be issued) Thu 08/03 11:22 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (Fisk, Courtney)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/03 11:09 AM
COMPLAINT against Shawn Knash filed by Fit Body Boot Camp, Inc. (Fisk, Courtney) Modified text on 8/3/2023 (jjm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Fit Body Boot Camp, Inc. in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-7126832 (Fisk, Courtney) Modified text on 8/3/2023 (jjm).
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Thu 08/03 11:12 AM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Fit Body Boot Camp, Inc. in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-7126832 (Fisk, Courtney) Modified text on 8/3/2023 (jjm)
Related: [-]