Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Marcos E Lopez
Referred: Marcos E Lopez
Case #: 3:23-cv-01394
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Aug 03, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 30, 2024 4:35 AM AST
Defendant
Euramax Canada Inc.
Represented By
Victoria M. Rivera-Llorens
Mcconnell Valdes LLC
contact info
Henry O. Freese-Souffront
Mcconnell Valdes, LLC
contact info
Defendant
True Value Company, LLC
Represented By
Linette Figueroa-Torres
Toro, Colon, Mullet, Psc
contact info
Manuel Fernandez-Bared
Toro, Colon, Mullet, Psc
contact info
Defendant
Omnimax International
Represented By
Victoria M. Rivera-Llorens
Mcconnell Valdes LLC
contact info
Henry O. Freese-Souffront
Mcconnell Valdes, LLC
contact info
Defendant
True Value Hardware
Defendant
ACE Hardware International Holdings, LTD.
Represented By
Claudia Sofia Delbrey-Ortiz
contact info
Plaintiff
Hardware Plus Inc.
Represented By
Eric Perez-Ochoa
Adsuar Muniz Goyco Seda & Perez Ochoa Psc
contact info
Alexandra C. Casellas-Cabrera
Adsuar Muniz Goyco Seda & Perez-Ochoa, Psc
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Ace Hardware Corporation
Terminated: 12/06/2023
Represented By
Manuel A. Pietrantoni
Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
143 143 motion Protective Order Fri 04/25 9:04 AM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order) filed by Alexandra C. Casellas-Cabrera on behalf of Hardware Plus Inc.. Responses due by 5/9/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Casellas-Cabrera, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Confidentiality Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit A. Acknowledgment