Mississippi Northern District Court
Judge:Debra M Brown
Referred: David A Sanders
Case #: 4:23-cv-00148
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Aug 03, 2023
Terminated:Jul 08, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 30, 2024 2:37 AM CST
Defendant
Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Joseph Walter Gill
Currie, Johnson, Griffin, Gaines & Myers
contact info
Plaintiff
New Life Christian Fellowship Church, Inc.
Represented By
Lindsey A. Topp
Hair Shunnarah Trial Attorneys
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, July 08, 2024
29 29 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 07/08 11:42 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice . (Gill, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
28 28 minutes Settlement Conference Tue 06/04 2:23 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders: Settlement Conference held on 6/3/2024. Parties settled; counsel to file a Stipulation of Dismissal. (jf)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
27 27 notice Notice of Service Fri 05/31 2:34 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosure of Expert Witnesses by Joseph Walter Gill on behalf of Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company to Plaintiff, New Life Christian Fellowship Church, Inc.. (Gill, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
26 26 notice Notice of Conference Fri 05/10 3:05 PM
NOTICE Resetting Conference: Telephonic Settlement Conference reset for 6/3/2024 at 10:30 AM from Amory Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. (jf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
25 25 8 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Wed 05/01 12:03 PM
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 5/1/24. (cs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
24 24 motion Protective Order Tue 04/30 8:22 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company. (Gill, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Service Fri 04/26 4:11 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures by Lindsey A. Topp on behalf of New Life Christian Fellowship Church, Inc. to Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company. (Topp, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Service Mon 03/18 5:01 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Lindsey A. Topp on behalf of New Life Christian Fellowship Church, Inc. to Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company. (Topp, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Service Fri 02/16 1:51 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by Joseph Walter Gill on behalf of Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company to New Life Christian Fellowship Church, Inc.. (Gill, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Service Thu 02/08 9:36 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to First Set of Discovery by Joseph Walter Gill on behalf of Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company to Plaintiff, New Life Christian Fellowship Church, Inc.. (Gill, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
19 19 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 01/16 12:38 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting18 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Written Discovery. Defendant's responses due 2/7/24. No further order will issue from this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 1/16/24. (No document attached.) (cs)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 15, 2024
18 18 motion Extension of Time Mon 01/15 9:34 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Written Discovery by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company. (Gill, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
17 17 notice Notice of Service Mon 12/18 12:25 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admission by Lindsey A. Topp on behalf of New Life Christian Fellowship Church, Inc. to Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company. (Topp, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
16 16 notice Notice of Conference Mon 12/11 7:24 AM
NOTICE Resetting Conference: Telephonic Settlement Conference reset for 5/20/2024 at 10:00 AM from Amory Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Updated Confidential Settlement Memos due by 5/13/2023. (jf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Trial Tue 12/05 4:57 PM
NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 11/12/2024 09:45 AM in Greenville Courtroom 1 before District Judge Debra M. Brown. (lld)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Case Management Order Tue 12/05 4:06 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2024 at 1:30 PM in Judge Sanders Chambers before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Discovery due by 6/28/2024. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 2/29/2024. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 4/26/2024. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 5/31/2024. Motions due by 7/12/2024. Telephonic Settlement Conference set for 5/10/2024 at 10:00 AM from Amory Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 12/5/2023. (jf)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
13 13 minutes Case Management Conference Mon 12/04 10:42 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 12/1/2023. Case Management Order to be entered. (jf)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Service Mon 11/27 2:29 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Pre-Discovery Disclosures of Core Information by Joseph Walter Gill on behalf of Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company to Plaintiff, New Life Christian Fellowship Church, Inc.. (Gill, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Service Thu 11/16 8:54 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Lindsey A. Topp on behalf of New Life Christian Fellowship Church, Inc. to Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company. (Topp, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
notice Notice of Conference Thu 11/02 10:25 AM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE RESETTING Conference: Telephonic Case Management Conference reset for 12/1/2023 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. No further written notice will issue. No document attached. (cs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
10 10 order Initial Order - Rule 16.1 Thu 10/26 11:07 AM
INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/27/2023 at 9:30 AM from Amory Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Proposed Case Management Order and Confidential Settlement Memos due no later than 11/20/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/26/2023. (jf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 09/28 3:55 PM
DEFENSES AND ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company. (Gill, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
8 8 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 08/29 3:37 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company answer due 9/28/2023. No further order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 8/29/23. (No document attached.) (cs)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 08/29 2:14 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company. (Gill, Joseph)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement Tue 08/29 2:09 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company . (Gill, Joseph)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 08/29 2:05 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (Gill, Joseph) Modified on 8/29/2023 (jwr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 08/10 2:55 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lindsey A. Topp on behalf of New Life Christian Fellowship Church, Inc. Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company served on 8/8/2023. (Topp, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2023
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement Thu 08/03 11:48 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by New Life Christian Fellowship Church, Inc. . (Topp, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 08/03 9:32 AM
Summons Issued as to Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company. Counsel is instructed to download and print for service. (jla)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/03 9:32 AM
COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-2275740, filed by New Life Christian Fellowship Church, Inc.. (jla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Assignment Thu 08/03 9:33 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Correction Thu 08/03 9:33 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE : F.R.C.P. 7.1(a)(2) requires all parties in a diversity action to file a disclosure statement at the time of the initial appearance and/or pleading. The disclosure statement must name and disclose the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party. Please use the civil event Disclosure Statement to file the required disclosure statement. (jla)
Related: [-]