Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Patricia A Gaughan
Referred: James E Grimes Jr
Case #: 1:23-cv-01514
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Aug 03, 2023
Terminated:Apr 08, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 30, 2024 3:34 AM EST
Defendant
Agency Cluster, LLC
Represented By
John T. McLandrich
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Solon
contact info
David J. Sipusic
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Cleveland
contact info
Plaintiff
Tracy Culler
Represented By
Dominick Kocak
Friedmann Law - Hilliard
contact info
Rachel Sabo Friedmann
Friedmann Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Mackenzy Schaefer
Represented By
Dominick Kocak
Friedmann Law - Hilliard
contact info
Rachel Sabo Friedmann
Friedmann Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Holly Schultz
Represented By
Dominick Kocak
Friedmann Law - Hilliard
contact info
Rachel Sabo Friedmann
Friedmann Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, April 08, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 04/08 12:32 PM
Order : The parties Stipulation for Dismissal and Journal Entry is SO ORDERED. District Judge Patricia A Gaughan on 4/8/24. (LC,S)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
19 19 2 pgs notice Stipulation (atty event) Fri 04/05 2:08 PM
Proposed Stipulation for Dismissal and Journal Entry filed by Agency Cluster, LLC. (McLandrich, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
18 18 1 pgs minutes Mediation Conference ~Util - Terminate Referral Wed 02/21 9:31 AM
Minutes of proceedings before Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. Mediation Conference held on 2/20/2024. Present were Plaintiffs Holly Schultz, Tracy Culler, and Mackenzy Schaefer with counsel Rachel Sabo Friedmann and Dominick Kocak and Defendant Agency Cluster, LLC with representatives Kenny Urbania and Angelo Gallo, counsel John T. McLandrich, and Jordan Ziolkowski, counsel for Defendants insurer. The parties agreed to a settlement. The Plaintiffs will file notice of dismissal within 45 days, on or before April 5, 2024. As part of their agreement, the parties asked that the Court retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of their agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 02/21/2024. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
17 17 1 pgs minutes Telephone Conference MJ Fri 02/16 4:19 PM
Minutes of proceedings before Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. Telephone Conference held on 02/16/24 with counsel for Defendant in preparation for the mediation scheduled for February 20, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 02/16/2024. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs minutes Telephone Conference MJ Fri 02/16 4:14 PM
Minutes of proceedings before Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. Telephone Conference held on 02/16/24 with counsel for Plaintiff in preparation for the mediation scheduled for February 20, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 02/16/2024. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Service (atty event) Thu 02/08 2:43 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's Responses to Plaintiffs Schultz, Culler and Schaefer's First Set of Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents and Request for Admissions filed by Agency Cluster, LLC. (McLandrich, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
order Order on Motion to excuse appearance Wed 01/31 4:44 PM
Order [non-document] denying Defendant's14 Motion to excuse appearance. Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 01/31/24.(M,MT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
14 14 2 pgs motion Excuse Appearance Tue 01/30 2:10 PM
Motion to excuse appearance - In-Person Attendance of Claims Professional at Mediation and Allow Appearance by Phone filed by Defendant Agency Cluster, LLC. Related document(s)12 . (McLandrich, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
13 13 2 pgs motion Order Tue 12/12 10:10 AM
Joint Motion for New Mediation Date filed by Plaintiff Holly Schultz. (Kocak, Dominick)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for order Tue 12/12 1:14 PM
Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's13 Motion to Continue. Mediation conference to be held on 02/08/2024 is CONTINUED to 02/20/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11A before Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 12/12/23.(M,MT)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
12 12 5 pgs order Order Fri 12/08 10:36 AM
Mediation Scheduling Order setting mediation conference to be held on 02/08/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 12/08/23. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements prior to the mediation conference. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order of Referral to Judicial Officer for Mediation or Settlement Tue 12/05 3:00 PM
Order of Reference: This matter is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge James Grimes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636 and Local Rule 72.2 for the purpose of conducting a Mediation. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 12/5/23. (LC,S)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Service (atty event) Fri 11/17 3:04 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's Initial Disclosures filed by Agency Cluster, LLC. (Sipusic, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
9 9 2 pgs order Minute Order _ Case Management Conference Wed 11/08 10:11 AM
Case Management Order : Case Management Conference was held on 11/8/23. Case is assigned to the standard track. Case is not suitable for Mediation/Settlement Conference at this time. Non-expert discovery shall be completed on or before 4/15/24. Expert reports shall be exchanged on or before 2/23/24 for party with burden of proof & 4/26/24 for Rebuttal and Expert Discovery shall be completed on or before 6/28/24. Pleadings shall be amended without leave of Court and new parties shall be joined on or before 12/8/23. Dispositive Motions shall be filed on or before 5/31/24. Telephonic Status Conference is set for 3/14/24 at 9:15 a.m. The Court will initiate the call with attorneys only. However, the parties must be available for immediate contact. Counsel shall confer within three business days of any scheduled conference to discuss outstanding issues and respective positions as to settlement. Counsel shall provide to the Court three business days prior to the conference a joint Status Report or individual Status Reports describing the status of discovery, settlement positions, and issues to be addressed. The Status Report(s) need not be filed, but may be delivered via e-mail at Gaughan_Chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov. Individual Status Reports must be exchanged with opposing counsel. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 11/8/23. (LC,S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
8 8 7 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/01 9:33 AM
Answer to1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by The Agency Cluster LLC. (Sipusic, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
7 7 3 pgs notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Mon 10/30 3:09 PM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sabo Friedmann, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Thu 09/28 9:58 AM
Order [non-document]: Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time Within Which to Move or Plead to Complaint and to Reschedule Planning Meeting and Case Management Conference is granted. Defendant must respond to the Complaint by November 1, 2023. The Case Management Conference of October 5, 2023 is continued to November 8, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 9/28/23. (LC,S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
6 6 2 pgs motion Extension (answer complaint) Wed 09/27 2:50 PM
Motion for extension of time until November 1, 2023 to answer Plaintiffs' Complaint and to Reschedule Planning Meeting and Case Management Conference filed by Defendant The Agency Cluster LLC. (Sipusic, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Wed 09/27 2:48 PM
Attorney Appearance and Substitution of Counsel by David J. Sipusic and John T. McLandrich filed by on behalf of The Agency Cluster LLC. (Sipusic, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
4 4 5 pgs order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Tue 09/05 4:12 PM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 10/5/2023 at 09:00 AM to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 9/05/23. (D,Ma)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
3 3 1 pgs service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 08/22 10:24 AM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Holly Schultz. The Agency Cluster LLC waiver sent on 8/3/2023, answer due 10/2/2023 filed on behalf of Holly Schultz (Kocak, Dominick)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
2 2 2 pgs oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Fri 08/04 8:23 AM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided and was not issued. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judge Fri 08/04 8:21 AM
Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Fri 08/04 8:22 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2023
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 08/03 5:21 PM
Complaint with jury demand Holly Schultz, Tracy Culler, and Mackenzy Schaefer against The Agency Cluster LLC. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-12117568.. Filed by Holly Schultz, Mackenzy Schaefer, Tracy Culler. (Kocak, Dominick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 4 2 pgs Exhibit