New Jersey District Court
Case #: 3:23-mj-06017
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2023
Last checked: Friday Aug 04, 2023 3:39 AM EDT
Defendant
DANIEL NILLA (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
ASHLEY SUPER PITTS
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Aug 03 2023
ORDER OF DETENTION as to DANIEL NILLA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/3/2023. (eh, )
GPO Aug 07 2023
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to DANIEL NILLA Time excluded from 8/3/2023 until 10/3/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/3/2023. (eh, )
GPO Oct 03 2023
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to DANIEL NILLA Time excluded from 10/3/2023 until 12/4/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/3/2023. (eh, )
GPO Dec 07 2023
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to DANIEL NILLA Time excluded from 12/5/2023 until 2/4/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/5/2023. (eh, )
GPO Feb 02 2024
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to DANIEL NILLA Time excluded from 2/2/2024 until 4/4/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/2/2024. (eh, )

Docket last updated: 08/04/2023 4:10 AM EDT
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
1 1 11 pgs COMPLAINT as to DANIEL NILLA (1). (eh, )
Related: [-]
3 3 SEALING ORDER as to DANIEL NILLA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/2/2023. (eh, )
Related: [-]