Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:23-cr-01482
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2023
Last checked: Friday Aug 04, 2023 2:54 AM CDT
Defendant
Tyrone Ladarrell Malone, Jr. (1)
Represented By
Robert J. Perez
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Richard Douglas Watts
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/30/2024 11:04 AM CST
Sunday, July 09, 2023
Arrest of Tyrone Ladarrell Malone, Jr (lg1) [3:23-mj-02074-RFC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Tyrone Ladarrell Malone, Jr by Judge Leon Schydlower. (lg1) [3:23-mj-02074-RFC]
Related: [-]
2 2 3 pgs COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower as to Tyrone Ladarrell Malone, Jr. (lg1) [3:23-mj-02074-RFC]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Tyrone Ladarrell Malone, Jr. (lg1) [3:23-mj-02074-RFC]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (lg1) [3:23-mj-02074-RFC]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leon Schydlower:Initial Appearance as to Tyrone Ladarrell Malone, Jr held on 7/11/2023 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Tyrone Ladarrell Malone, Jr (Court Reporter ERO.) (lg1) [3:23-mj-02074-RFC]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER as to Tyrone Ladarrell Malone, Jr, ( Detention Hearing set for 7/14/2023 10:00 AM before Judge Robert F. Castaneda,, Preliminary Hearing set for 7/14/2023 10:00 AM before Judge Robert F. Castaneda,), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Tyrone Ladarrell Malone, Jr. Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (lg1) [3:23-mj-02074-RFC]
Related: [-]
7 7 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Tyrone Ladarrell Malone, Jr (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (lg1) [3:23-mj-02074-RFC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
1 1 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Richard Douglas Watts appearing for USA. . Attorney Richard Douglas Watts added to party USA(pty:pla) (Watts, Richard) [3:23-mj-02074-RFC]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert F. Castaneda:Preliminary Hearing as to Tyrone Ladarrell Malone, Jr held on 7/14/2023 PROBABLE CAUSE FOUND(Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Detention Hearing as to Tyrone Ladarrell Malone, Jr held on 7/14/2023 DETAINED WITHOUT BOND (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Due Process Protections Act Warning given in Open Court as to Tyrone Ladarrell Malone, Jr, Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Tyrone Ladarrell Malone, Jr (Court Reporter ERO.) (lg1) [3:23-mj-02074-RFC]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER GRANTING3 Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond. DETAINED WITHOUT BOND as to Tyrone Ladarrell Malone Jr. (1). Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (lg1) [3:23-mj-02074-RFC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Torres (bot1)
Related: [-]
10 10 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Tyrone Ladarrell Malone, Jr (1) count(s) 1-2. (bot1)
Related: [-] dacted Version
12 12 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Tyrone Ladarrell Malone, Jr (bot1)
Related: [-]