Washington Western District Court
Judge:Tiffany M Cartwright
Case #: 3:23-cv-05705
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Aug 04, 2023
Terminated:May 30, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 31, 2024 1:06 AM PST
Defendant
Colin Patrick Dudley
Defendant
Robert Cantrell
Plaintiff
State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By
Jennifer P Dinning
Soha & Lang Ps
contact info
Nathaniel J.R. Smith
Soha & Lang Ps
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 30, 2024
31 31 order 2 - Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Case Thu 05/30 10:52 AM
MINUTE ORDER: pursuant to30 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, any pending deadlines/hearings are terminated, and this case is closed. Entered at the direction of District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. (MET)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
30 30 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (case) Fri 05/24 11:53 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Smith, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
utility Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Terminate Motions (Public) Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings Wed 04/10 11:15 AM
The Court was notified this case has settled. All deadlines are terminated. Dismissal/Settlement papers due by 5/10/2024. (MET)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 02/27 3:59 PM
Pursuant to the request and agreement of the parties, the following deadlines are reset: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 3/29/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/3/2024, Joint Status Report due by 4/10/2024. (MET)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Tue 02/20 11:41 AM
Attorney Paul L Schneiderman added for Robert Cantrell; per29 Notice of Appearance. (AMD)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 19, 2024
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/19 4:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kirk C Davis on behalf of Defendant Robert Cantrell. (Davis, Kirk)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
28 28 order Clerks Entry of Default Fri 01/26 11:20 AM
ORDER Granting Motion for Default26 against Defendant Colin Patrick Dudley. By deputy clerk on behalf of Clerk Ravi Subramanian. (MET)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
27 27 respm Declaration Thu 01/25 8:31 AM
DECLARATION of Nathaniel J. R. Smith filed by Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company re26 MOTION for Default against Colin Dudley, (Smith, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Default Thu 01/25 8:30 AM
MOTION for Default against Colin Dudley,, filed by Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Noting Date 1/25/2024, (Smith, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 19, 2024
utility Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Terminate Motions (Private, Court Users only) Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 01/19 9:14 AM
Pursuant to plaintiff's filing of amended complaint, the following deadlines are reset: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/27/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/5/2024, Joint Status Report due by 3/12/2024. (MET) Removed sealed access, regenerated to plaintiff (MET)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
25 25 service Acknowledgment/Acceptance of Service of Summons & Complaint Fri 01/12 8:57 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT/ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by Paul L. Schneiderman, on behalf of Robert Cantrell as Administrator (aka as personal representative) of the Estate of Kassandra Cantrell, on 1/11/2024. (Smith, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
24 24 service Summons Issued Wed 01/10 10:21 AM
Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Robert Cantrell. (AMD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
23 23 misc Praecipe for a Summons Tue 01/09 4:32 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(Smith, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
22 22 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/03 2:18 PM
SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Colin Patrick Dudley on 12/28/2023 (Smith, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
21 21 service Summons Issued Fri 12/22 1:09 PM
Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Colin Patrick Dudley. (AMD)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Praecipe for a Summons Fri 12/22 11:16 AM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS on Dudley by Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(Smith, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
19 19 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 12/22 11:15 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Smith, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Policy,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Information,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Determination,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Stmt of Plea of Guilty
Monday, December 11, 2023
18 18 8 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 12/11 11:25 AM
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Dkt.16 ). The Court ORDERS State Farm to file an amended complaint within 21 days of the entry of this order to add the Cantrell estate as a defendant. Signed by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright.(AMD)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Set/Reset Motion Noting Date (Public) Mon 11/27 3:31 PM
Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, the following deadlines are reset: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/21/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/28/2023, Joint Status Report due by 1/5/2024. (MET)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
17 17 respm Declaration Fri 10/20 4:49 PM
DECLARATION of Nathaniel J. R. Smith filed by Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company re16 MOTION for Default Judgment (Smith, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Default Judgment Fri 10/20 4:49 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment , filed by Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Noting Date 10/20/2023, (Smith, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
15 15 order Clerks Entry of Default Fri 10/20 2:40 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Colin Patrick Dudley (TC)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Amended Document Fri 10/20 12:39 PM
AMENDMENT to6 Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement, by Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Smith, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
utility Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines Fri 10/20 9:44 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Based on review of the record, Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement (Dkt.6 ) fails to comply with Western District of Washington Local Civil Rule 7.1(b). No later than Tuesday, October 24, Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a new Corporate Disclosure Statement that lists the state(s) of which its parent corporation is a citizen. Authorized by U.S. District Judge Tiffany M Cartwright. (MW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
13 13 respm Declaration Thu 10/19 11:30 AM
DECLARATION of Nathaniel J. R. Smith filed by Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company re12 MOTION for Default against Colin Dudley, (Smith, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Default Thu 10/19 11:29 AM
MOTION for Default against Colin Dudley,, filed by Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Noting Date 10/19/2023, (Smith, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/27 2:30 PM
SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Colin Patrick Dudley on 9/27/2023 (Smith, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
10 10 service Summons Issued Tue 09/26 2:54 PM
Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Colin Patrick Dudley. (AMD)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Praecipe for a Summons Tue 09/26 11:49 AM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(Smith, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
8 8 order TMC - Discovery, Depositions, and JSR Order (FORM) Wed 09/06 9:50 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/21/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/28/2023, Joint Status Report due by 12/5/2023. (TC)
Related: [-]
motion Motion Calendar Wed 09/06 9:51 AM
JSR due NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 12/5/2023. (TC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
7 7 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 08/30 2:48 PM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright for all further proceedings. U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo no longer assigned to case. Authorized by U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo. (MGC)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
6 6 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Mon 08/14 12:59 PM
CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Smith, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
5 5 misc Redacted Document Fri 08/04 2:56 PM
REDACTION to1 Complaint,, Exhibit E by Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Smith, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Redacted Document Fri 08/04 2:55 PM
REDACTION to1 Complaint,, Exhibit D by Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Smith, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Redacted Document Fri 08/04 2:55 PM
REDACTION to1 Complaint,, Exhibit C by Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Smith, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Fri 08/04 12:56 PM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Redaction. See attached letter for more information and instructions. (AMD)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/04 11:43 AM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Colin Dudley Related [+] filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company.(Smith, Nathaniel) Modified on 8/4/2023 to seal attachments due to unredacted info (AMD)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8113169
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Policy,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Complaint,
Att: 4 SEALED Exhibit C - Information,
Att: 5 SEALED Exhibit D - Determination,
Att: 6 SEALED Exhibit E - Stmt of Plea of Guilty
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 08/04 12:54 PM
U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo added. (AMD)
Related: [-]
utility Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines Fri 08/04 1:02 PM
NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Plaintiff must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/11/2023. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(AMD)
Related: [-]