New York Western District Court
Judge:Elizabeth A Wolford
Referred: Mark W Pedersen
Case #: 6:23-cv-06441
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Aug 04, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 31, 2024 3:50 AM EST
Defendant
Michelle Marini
Represented By
Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Lippes Mathias LLP
contact info
Karl Jay Sleight
Lippes Mathias, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kirk Morris
Represented By
Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Lippes Mathias LLP
contact info
Karl Jay Sleight
Lippes Mathias, LLP
contact info
Defendant
William D. Reilich
Represented By
Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Lippes Mathias LLP
contact info
Karl Jay Sleight
Lippes Mathias, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Keith Suhr
Represented By
Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Lippes Mathias LLP
contact info
Karl Jay Sleight
Lippes Mathias, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Town of Greece
1 Vince Tofany Blvd.
Greece, NY 14612
Represented By
Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Lippes Mathias LLP
contact info
Karl Jay Sleight
Lippes Mathias, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Johnson
2280 East Ave First Floor
Rochester, NY 14610
Represented By
Maureen T. Bass
Abrams Fensterman, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
70 70 order Text Order Tue 05/20 10:21 AM
TEXT ORDER re68 Objections to67 Report and Recommendations. Responses shall be filed on or before June 9, 2025. Replies shall be filed on or before June 16, 2025. Upon review of the papers, the Court will determine if oral argument is necessary and, if so, will inform the parties of the date and time. Otherwise, the matter will be deemed submitted and decided on the papers. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 05/20/2025. (JKS)
Related: [-]
utility E-Filing Notification Wrong Event Used Tue 05/20 12:45 PM
E-Filing Notification: Incorrect event used to electronically file document. For future reference, use OBJECTIONS to REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS event. No action required re69 AFFIDAVIT re67 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS.(TF)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 19, 2025
69 69 misc Affidavit Mon 05/19 11:40 PM
AFFIDAVIT re67 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; Objections due fourteen days from receipt Objections to Report and Recommendations by Robert Johnson.(Bass, Maureen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Maureen T. Bass,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Defendants' Press Release,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Murphy Facebook Post
68 68 misc Objections -- non-motion Mon 05/19 10:08 PM
OBJECTIONS to REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; Objections due fourteen days from receipt67 Report and Recommendations filed by Defendants Town of Greece, William D. Reilich, Michelle Marini, Keith Suhr, Kirk Morris..(Sleight, Karl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - William Murphy Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Facebook Posts