California Northern District Court
Judge:Jon S Tigar
Case #: 3:23-cv-03931
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Aug 04, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 31, 2024 12:34 AM PST
Defendant
County of Marin
Represented By
Cara Masako Porter
Marin County Counsel'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Lori Frugoli
Represented By
Cara Masako Porter
Marin County Counsel'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Otis Bruce
Represented By
Adam Cabral Bonner
Law Offices Of Bonner & Bonner
contact info
Charles A. Bonner
Law Offices Of Bonner & Bonner
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Tue 11/21 4:09 PM
NOTICE by Lori Frugoli re22 MOTION to Dismiss Lori Frugoli for Lack of Effective and Timely Service of Process; Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Porter, Cara)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Dismiss Tue 11/21 4:04 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Lori Frugoli for Lack of Effective and Timely Service of Process; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Lori Frugoli. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 1/11/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. Responses due by 12/5/2023. Replies due by 12/12/2023.(Porter, Cara) Modified on 11/21/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Of Lori E.Frugoli in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Declaration Of Cara M. Porter in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 4 Certificate/Proof of Service
21 21 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 11/21 9:09 AM
Order Granting 20 Stipulation for Leave for Plaintiff to Further Amend Complaint and Setting Deadline for the County's Responsive Pleading. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/15/2024. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/22/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on November 21, 2023. (amolc1, COURTSTAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
20 20 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Mon 11/20 12:52 PM
STIPULATION for Leave for Plaintiff to Further Amend Complaint and the Deadline for the County's Responsive Pleading filed by County of Marin, Otis Bruce. (Porter, Cara) Modified on 11/20/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
19 19 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 11/09 3:20 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Otis Bruce. Lori Frugoli served on 11/1/2023, answer due 11/22/2023. (Bonner, Charles)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
18 18 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial Wed 11/08 10:55 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/8/2023. Plaintiff's counsel to file motion to relate by 11/20/2023. Parties advised to abide by local rules and read notices posted on the docket. Total Time in Court: 11 minutes. Court Reporter: Recorded via Zoom. Plaintiff Attorney: Adam Cabral Bonner. Defendant Attorney: Renee Giacomini Brewer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/8/2023)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 11/03 9:35 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Otis Bruce. County of Marin served on 10/31/2023, answer due 11/21/2023. (Bonner, Charles)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
16 16 order Order Thu 11/02 6:33 PM
Order re letter requesting continuance 14 . The Court is in receipt of a letter seeking to continue the case management conference currently set for November 8, 2023. The letter is improper and will not be considered by the Court. A request to change time must be brought in compliance with Civil Local Rule 6, which allows for the filing of a stipulated request, see Civil L.R. 6-2, or a motion, see Civil L.R. 6-3. While the defendants have not appeared in this action, Plaintiff indicated in his case management statement that at least one defendant has been served. Accordingly, if Plaintiff is unable to obtain a stipulation, any motion to change time must comply with the requirements set forth in Civil Local Rule 6-3, including the requirement that the motion contain a statement that describes the efforts Plaintiff made to obtain a stipulation. The Court also notes that as to the defendant that Plaintiff claims to have served, Plaintiff has filed no proof of service of the summons and complaint or of service of supplementary material as required by Civil Local Rule 4-2. Plaintiff must file the missing certificate of service by November 6, 2023. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on November 2, 2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amolc1, COURTSTAFF)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order Thu 11/02 6:30 PM
Order re Plaintiff's case management conference statement 12 . Plaintiff is advised that the case management conference statement filed November 1, 2023 is improper. While individual case management conference statements are permitted when a party is pro se, they are not permitted when parties are represented by counsel. See Civil L.R. 16-9; see also Standing Order for Civil Cases at 2. The statement is also improper because rather than seeking a continuance sufficiently in advance of the deadline to file the statement, Plaintiff has filed an individual statement, apparently without attempting to meet and confer with the party who has been recently served. Plaintiff is on notice that such a lack of diligence will not be tolerated by the Court in this litigation. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on November 2, 2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amolc1, COURTSTAFF)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Letter Thu 11/02 9:59 AM
Letter from Charles A. Bonner TO REQUEST CONTINUANCE . (Bonner, Charles)
Related: [-]
13 13 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Thu 11/02 9:08 AM
Clerk's Notice re Court Appearances for Case Management Conference. Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at amocrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than November 6, 2023 at 12:00 PM PST. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
12 12 misc Case Management Statement Wed 11/01 3:59 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT for Plaintiff filed by Otis Bruce. (Bonner, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 10/31 10:12 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against All Defendants. Filed by Otis Bruce. (Bonner, Charles) Modified on 10/31/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Tue 10/17 1:29 PM
Clerk's Notice Rescheduling Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2023. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 11/8/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF) Modified on 10/17/2023 (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 10/17 1:39 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2023. (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Mon 08/21 2:43 PM
Clerk's Notice Setting Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 11/2/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 08/18 11:03 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 8/18/2023.(bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Fri 08/18 9:52 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Fri 08/04 5:10 PM
Proposed Summons. (Bonner, Charles)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/04 5:07 PM
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against Otis Bruce ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18516766.). Filed byOtis Bruce.(Bonner, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet