1
|
|
1
COMPLAINT as to Takeia Herder (1), Schneeka Parker (2). (fbn) [1:23-mj-03442-LFL]
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
Invocation of Right to Silence and Counsel by Takeia Herder (Dunham, Christian) [1:23-mj-03442-LFL]
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Christian Scott Dunham appearing for Takeia Herder . Attorney Christian Scott Dunham added to party Takeia Herder(pty:dft). (Dunham, Christian) [1:23-mj-03442-LFL]
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis: Initial Appearance as to Schneeka Parker held on 7/24/2023. Bond recommendation/set: Schneeka Parker (2) Government request Pretrial Detention; hearing set for 7/27/23. Date of Location Custody (Arrest or Surrender): 7/23/2023. Arraignment set for 8/7/2023 at 10:00 AM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Pretrial Detention Hearing set for 7/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 8/7/2023 at 10:00 AM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Attorney added: Simon Patrick Dray for Schneeka Parker for Criminal CJA representation. Date attorney was appointed CJA: 7/24/2023. (Digital 14:36:12) It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States obligation to disclose to the defendant all exculpatory evidence- that is, evidence that favors the defendant or casts doubt on the United States case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and ORDERS the United States to do so. The government has a duty to disclose any evidence that goes to negating the defendants guilt, the credibility of a witness, or that would reduce a potential sentence. The defendant is entitled to this information without a request. Failure to disclose exculpatory evidence in a timely manner may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, or sanctions by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 7/24/2023. (fbn) [1:23-mj-03442-LFL]
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis: Initial Appearance as to Takeia Herder held on 7/24/2023. Defendant advised of rights and charges. Bond recommendation/set: Takeia Herder (1) Govt recommends Pretrial Detention. Date of Location Custody (Arrest or Surrender): 7/23/2023. Pretrial Detention Hearing set for 7/27/2023 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Arraignment/Preliminary Examination set for 8/7/2023 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Defendant sworn; Attorney added: Noticing FPD-MIA for Takeia Herder (Digital 14:30:02) It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States obligation to disclose to the defendant all exculpatory evidence- that is, evidence that favors the defendant or casts doubt on the United States case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and ORDERS the United States to do so. The government has a duty to disclose any evidence that goes to negating the defendants guilt, the credibility of a witness, or that would reduce a potential sentence. The defendant is entitled to this information without a request. Failure to disclose exculpatory evidence in a timely manner may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, or sanctions by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 7/24/2023. (kan) [1:23-mj-03442-LFL]
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis: Status Conference Re: Pretrial Detention Hearing as to Takeia Herder held on 7/27/2023., Bond Recommendation/Set/Reset as to Takeia Herder (1) STIPULATED $150,000 Personal Surety Bond co-signed by her son, Keon Herder and Significant Other, Alton Roy- NO HEARING HELD; Court sets. ( Arraignment set for 8/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge., Preliminary Examination set for 8/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge.). (Digital 10:13:08) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 7/27/2023. (fbn) [1:23-mj-03442-LFL]
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis: Status Conference Re: Pretrial Detention Hearing as to Schneeka Parker held on 7/27/2023., Bond Recommendation/Set/Reset as to Schneeka Parker (2) STIPULATED $150,000 Personal Surety Bond co-signed by her 2 Sons, Da'Sean and Rashod Ward- NO HEARING HELD; Court sets. ( Arraignment set for 8/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge., Preliminary Examination set for 8/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge.). (Digital 10:19:21) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 7/27/2023. (fbn) [1:23-mj-03442-LFL]
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
$150,000 PSB Bond Entered as to Takeia Herder Approved by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis. Please see bond image for conditions of release. (at) (at). [1:23-mj-03442-LFL]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
(8/2/2023) Restricted Bond with 7th Page
|
9
|
|
9
$150,000 PSB Bond Entered as to Schneeka Parker Approved by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis. Please see bond image for conditions of release. (at) (at). [1:23-mj-03442-LFL]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
(8/2/2023) Restricted Bond with 7th Page
|
10
|
|
10
INDICTMENT and FORFEITURE as to Takeia Herder (1) count(s) 1, 2, Schneeka Parker (2) count(s) 1, 2. (fbn) (fbn).
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
(8/3/2023) Restricted Unredacted Indictment
|