Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 4:23-mj-01543
Case Filed:Aug 03, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Aug 05, 2023 2:22 AM CDT
Defendant
Deanna Maria Gerads (1)
Represented By
Ike Okorafor
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 08/05/2023 3:23 AM CDT
Thursday, August 03, 2023
Arrest (Rule 40) of Deanna Maria Gerads, filed. (GeorgeKelner, 4)
Related: [-]
***Set/Reset Hearings as to Deanna Maria Gerads: Initial Appearance - Rule 40 set for 8/3/2023 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 700 before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon (GeorgeKelner, 4)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon: INITIAL APPEARANCE IN RULE 5(c)(3) PROCEEDINGS as to Deanna Maria Gerads held on 8/3/2023. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Financial Affidavit executed. Order appointing Federal Public Defender for limited purposes to be entered. Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing. Defendant waives Identity hearing on the record but reserves the right to have a detention hearing in North Dakota. Defendant ordered removed to originating District of North Dakota. Appearance entered by Ike Okorafor for Deanna Maria Gerads on behalf of defendant. Appearances:AUSA: James Hu; Ike Okorafor for deft. (ERO: Yes) Deft remanded to Custody of U.S. Marshal, filed. (RachelWillborg, 4)
Related: [-]
1 1 26 pgs Superseding Indictment from District of North Dakota as to Deanna Maria Gerads, filed.(GeorgeKelner, 4)
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant issued 6/16/2022; Returned Executed on 8/3/2023 as to Deanna Maria Gerads.. Document restricted from PACER under privacy policy., filed. (GeorgeKelner, 4)
Related: [-]