Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Barry W Ashe
Referred: Karen Wells Roby
Case #: 2:23-cv-03169
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2023
Terminated:May 28, 2024
Last checked: Friday Feb 02, 2024 3:03 AM CST
Defendant
State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By
Michele Trowbridge Barreca
Porteous, Hainkel & Johnson (new Orleans)
contact info
Matthew Edward Simmons
Porteous, Hainkel & Johnson (new Orleans)
contact info
Interested Party
Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By
Francis Joseph Lobrano
Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicholas M. Bartolo
Represented By
William Parker Logan
Hair Shunnarah Trial Attorneys
contact info
Galen M. Hair
Hair Shunnarah Trial Attorneys, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephanie D. Bartolo
Represented By
William Parker Logan
Hair Shunnarah Trial Attorneys
contact info
Galen M. Hair
Hair Shunnarah Trial Attorneys, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, January 10, 2025
15 15 21 pgs order Order Fri 01/10 10:55 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS: ORDER Regarding Settlement of Former MMA Cases. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/19/2024.(lag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Case Tue 05/28 4:49 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Dismiss Case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 5/28/2024. (clc)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
13 13 motion Dismiss Case Fri 05/24 1:16 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case by Nicholas M. Bartolo & Stephanie D. Bartolo & by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company.(Barreca, Michele)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 15, 2023
12 12 30+ pgs order Order Fri 12/15 9:30 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Fourth Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/12/2023.(lag)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
11 11 misc ADI event Fri 10/06 11:40 AM
Amended Exhibit A to Hurricane Ida Case Management Order. (lag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
10 10 30+ pgs order Order Thu 09/28 12:03 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Third Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/14/2023.(lag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
9 9 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Thu 09/21 12:00 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire & Casualty Company (Barreca, Michele)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 09/21 11:58 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company.(Barreca, Michele)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
7 7 30+ pgs order Order Tue 09/19 9:38 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Second Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/12/2023.(lag)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 08/23 9:42 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Company; answer due 9/21/2023. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 8/22/2023. (clc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
5 5 motion Extension of Time to Answer Tue 08/22 10:37 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.Attorney Michele Trowbridge Barreca added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft).(Barreca, Michele)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
4 4 30+ pgs order Order Tue 08/08 12:06 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENTORDER NO. 1 with Addendum. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette JolivetteBrown on 10/25/2022.(am)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 08/08 12:05 PM
Summons Issued as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (am)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Mon 08/07 10:15 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (kls)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 06, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Sun 08/06 5:26 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10067130) filed by Nicholas M. Bartolo, Stephanie D. Bartolo.Attorney William Parker Logan added to party Nicholas M. Bartolo(pty:pla), Attorney William Parker Logan added to party Stephanie D. Bartolo(pty:pla).(Logan, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons