California Northern District Court
Judge:James Donato
Case #: 3:23-cv-03943
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Aug 07, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Feb 03, 2024 12:27 AM PST
Defendant
Eli Lilly & Co
Represented By
Ryan Moorman
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Mark Charles Holscher
Kirkland And Ellis LLP
contact info
Christopher William Keegan
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Anna Terteryan
Kirkland And Ellis LLP
contact info
Gabor Balassa
Kirkland Ellis LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nektar Therapeutics
Represented By
Kyle Kenneth Batter
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Sullivan
contact info
Sarah Marianne Cork
Fish And Richardson P.C.
contact info
Brendan Carroll
contact info
Yury Kapgan
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
David Morad Elihu
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Sullivan LLP
contact info
Diane M. Doolittle
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
185 185 3 pgs motion Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Partys Material Should Be Sealed Fri 05/09 8:26 PM
Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed filed by Eli Lilly & Co.(Moorman, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit
184 184 43 pgs misc Statement Fri 05/09 8:21 PM
Statement to the Court Regarding Nektar's Preservation and Use of Microsoft Teams by Eli Lilly & Co. (Moorman, Ryan)
Related: [-]
183 183 5 pgs oth_sup Declaration in Support Fri 05/09 3:49 PM
Declaration of Jennifer Ruddock in Support of178 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed filed byNektar Therapeutics. Related [+] (Kapgan, Yury)
Related: [-] 178
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
182 182 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Tue 05/06 8:30 AM
NOTICE of Change in Counsel: Attorney Sarah Cork no longer representing Nektar Therapeutics in this case (Kapgan, Yury)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
181 181 2 pgs motion Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Partys Material Should Be Sealed Mon 05/05 5:10 PM
Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed filed by Nektar Therapeutics.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Reply Letter re Privilege Log (Under Seal)(Kapgan, Yury) (Filed on 5/5/2025
180 180 5 pgs motion Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Mon 05/05 4:59 PM
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Nektar's Letter and Exhibits [Dkt. 179] filed by Nektar Therapeutics.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Declaration of John M. McCauley,
Att: 2 3 pgs Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Reply Letter re Privilege Log (Under Seal)(Kapgan, Yury) (Filed on 5/5/2025
179 179 19 pgs misc Letter Mon 05/05 4:47 PM
Letter from Nektar Therapeutics Replying to Lilly's Privilege Log Letter (Dkt. 177) . (Kapgan, Yury)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
178 178 2 pgs motion Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Partys Material Should Be Sealed Fri 05/02 6:35 PM
Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed filed by Eli Lilly & Co.(Balassa, Gabor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit
177 177 16 pgs oth_sup Letter Brief Fri 05/02 6:30 PM
Letter Brief re 172 Order, Regarding Nektar's Privilege Log filed byEli Lilly & Co. Related [+] (Balassa, Gabor)
Related: [-] 172
176 176 5 pgs misc Letter Fri 05/02 11:19 AM
Letter from Nektar Therapeutics regarding Nektar's privilege log review . (McCauley, John)
Related: [-]