Vermont District Court
Judge:Christina Reiss
Case #: 2:23-cv-00271
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Case Filed:Aug 04, 2023
Terminated:Nov 16, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 31, 2024 3:52 AM EST
Defendant
Round Real Estate, LLC
Represented By
David E. Bond, Esq.
Strouse & Bond PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Henry Company, LLC
Represented By
Victoria E.K. Taravella, Esq.
Boyle Shaughnessy
contact info
Thomas J. Fay, Esq.
Boyle, Shaughnessy & Campo, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, November 16, 2023
16 16 misc Docket Annotation Thu 11/16 3:45 PM
CASE CONSOLIDATED. ALL DOCKET ENTRIES SHOULD BE ENTERED IN THE LEAD CASE, DOCKET NO. 2:21-cv-00239 ONLY. (law)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
15 15 misc Transcript Wed 11/15 3:09 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Motion to Amend Complaint hearing held on November 2, 2023, before Judge Christina C. Reiss. Court Reporter/Transcriber Johanna Masse, telephone number (802) 951-8102. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/11/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/21/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2024. (law)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
14 14 minutes Motion Hearing ~Util - Ruling on Motions Thu 11/02 3:18 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Christina Reiss: Motion Hearing held on 11/2/2023 re5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,7 MOTION to Amend Complaint. Thomas Fay, Esq., and Victoria Taravella, Esq., present for pltf. David Bond, Esq., present for Dft. Court makes inquiries. Statements by counsel. ORDERED: court consolidates this case with case 2:22cv239 ECI v. Construction Contracting & Maintenance LLC . Court grants Motion to Amend7 and denies without prejudice Motion to Dismiss5 . (Court Reporter: Johanna Masse) (jbr) Text clarified on 11/2/2023 (law)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
13 13 misc Proposed Order Tue 10/31 10:29 AM
PROPOSED Discovery Schedule/Order by Henry Company, LLC. (Fay, Thomas) Text clarified on 10/31/2023 (law)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
12 12 misc Stipulated Discovery Letter Sent Thu 10/12 8:34 AM
STIPULATED DISCOVERY LETTER SENT re: no stipulated discovery schedule filed; case will be set for a scheduling conference unless stipulated schedule is filed. (law)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Fri 10/06 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Hearing re:5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,7 MOTION to Amend Complaint . Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2023 at 02:30 PM in Burlington Courtroom 510 before Judge Christina Reiss.(jbr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
10 10 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 09/21 12:12 PM
REPLY to Response to5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Round Real Estate, LLC.(Bond, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Thursday, September 07, 2023
9 9 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 09/07 4:27 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Henry Company, LLC.(Fay, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D
8 8 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 09/07 9:33 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re7 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Round Real Estate, LLC.(Bond, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
7 7 motion Amend/Correct Wed 09/06 1:23 PM
MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Henry Company, LLC.(Fay, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Thursday, August 24, 2023
6 6 utility Notice of Docket Entry Correction Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 08/24 8:38 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re:3 Waiver of Service filed by Round Real Estate, LLC. Docket text and the dates have been corrected to indicate Round Real Estate, LLC waiver sent on 7/27/2023, answer due 9/25/2023 . (law)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
5 5 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 08/23 12:43 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Round Real Estate, LLC(Bond, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/23 12:40 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David E. Bond, Esq on behalf of Round Real Estate, LLC.(Bond, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Acknowledgment/Acceptance of Service (Summons and Complaint) Wed 08/23 12:39 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT/ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE. Round Real Estate, LLC served on 8/7/2023, answer due 8/28/2023.(Bond, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
2 2 order Order Reassigning Case Tue 08/08 11:27 AM
NOTICE of Case Reassignment - Case was incorrectly randomly assigned and should have been administratively assigned to judge assigned to related case. Case reassigned to Judge Christina Reiss for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford no longer assigned to case. (jlh)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 08/07 9:39 AM
COMPLAINT against Round Real Estate, LLC filed by Henry Company, LLC. (sjl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet