Member Case
Lead case is: 1:23-bk-00623

Iowa Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thad J Collins
Case #: 1:23-bk-00622
Case Filed:Aug 07, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Mercy Iowa City ACO, LLC
500 E. Market Street
Iowa City, IA 52245
Represented By
Roy Ryan Leaf
Nyemaster Goode, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
United States Federal Courthouse 111 7th Avenue SE, Box 17
Cedar Rapids, IA 52401


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 12:01 PM CDT
Sunday, July 28, 2024
39 39 misc Certificate of Service Sun 07/28 12:30 PM
Certificate of Service re: Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report Filed by Other Prof. Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Related [+]. (Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-] 38 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
38 38 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report Tue 07/23 4:02 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-00622 for the Month Ending: 06/30/2024 Filed by Debtor Mercy Iowa City ACO, LLC. (Leaf, Roy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
37 37 misc Certificate of Service Tue 06/25 8:33 AM
Certificate of Service re: Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report Filed by Other Prof. Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Related [+]. (Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-] 36 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report
Friday, June 21, 2024
36 36 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report Fri 06/21 1:05 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-00622 for the Month Ending: 05/31/2024 Filed by Debtor Mercy Iowa City ACO, LLC. (Leaf, Roy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
35 35 misc Certificate of Service Wed 05/29 7:29 PM
Certificate of Service re: Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report Filed by Other Prof. Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Related [+]. (Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-] 34 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
34 34 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report Tue 05/21 2:07 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-00622 for the Month Ending: 04/30/2024 Filed by Debtor Mercy Iowa City ACO, LLC. (Leaf, Roy)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
33 33 misc Certificate of Service Mon 04/29 6:17 PM
Certificate of Service re: Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report Filed by Other Prof. Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Related [+]. (Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-] 32 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
32 32 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report Tue 04/23 11:20 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-00622 for the Month Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Debtor Mercy Iowa City ACO, LLC. (Leaf, Roy)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
31 31 misc Certificate of Service Fri 03/29 12:36 PM
Certificate of Service re: Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report Filed by Other Prof. Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Related [+]. (Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-] 30 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report
Friday, March 22, 2024
30 30 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report Fri 03/22 11:50 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-00622 for the Month Ending: 02/29/2024 Filed by Debtor Mercy Iowa City ACO, LLC. (Leaf, Roy)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 25, 2024
29 29 misc Certificate of Service Sun 02/25 2:24 PM
Certificate of Service re: Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report Filed by Other Prof. Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Related [+]. (Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-] 28 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
28 28 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report Wed 02/21 11:53 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-00622 for the Month Ending: 01/31/2024 Filed by Debtor Mercy Iowa City ACO, LLC. (Leaf, Roy)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
27 27 misc Certificate of Service Fri 02/02 1:36 PM
Certificate of Service re: Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report Filed by Other Prof. Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Related [+]. (Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-] 26 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
26 26 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report Wed 01/24 11:04 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-00622 for the Month Ending: 12/31/2023 Filed by Debtor Mercy Iowa City ACO, LLC. (Leaf, Roy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
25 25 misc Certificate of Service Thu 12/28 9:58 AM
Certificate of Service re: Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report Filed by Other Prof. Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Related [+]. (Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-] 24 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report
Thursday, December 21, 2023
24 24 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report Thu 12/21 12:29 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 11/30/2023 Filed by Debtor Mercy Iowa City ACO, LLC. (Leaf, Roy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
23 23 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/29 12:05 PM
Certificate of Service re: Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report Filed by Other Prof. Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Related [+]. (Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-] 22 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
22 22 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report Tue 11/21 11:52 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-00623 for the Month Ending: 10/31/2023 Filed by Debtor Mercy Iowa City ACO, LLC. (Leaf, Roy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
21 21 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/08 7:55 PM
Certificate of Service re: Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report Filed by Other Prof. Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Related [+]. (Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-] 20 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report
Friday, October 20, 2023
20 20 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report Fri 10/20 5:14 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-623 for the Month Ending: 09/30/2023 Filed by Debtor Mercy Iowa City ACO, LLC. (Leaf, Roy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/12 12:31 PM
Certificate of Service re: Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report Filed by Other Prof. Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Related [+]. (Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-] 18 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report
Thursday, September 21, 2023
18 18 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report Thu 09/21 9:02 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-00623 for the Month Ending: 08/31/2023 Filed by Debtor Mercy Iowa City ACO, LLC. (Leaf, Roy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
17 17 misc Appearance and Request for Notice (2002) Wed 09/13 11:09 AM
**Filed in Incorrect Case - Will file in correct case 23-623** Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (2002) by Paula L. Roby Filed by Interested Party Carol Ebinger, et al.. (Roby, Paula) Modified on 9/13/2023 (tsta)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
16 16 misc Statement of Financial Affairs Mon 08/21 6:58 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed by Debtor Mercy Iowa City ACO, LLC. (Leaf, Roy)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Schedule(s) Mon 08/21 6:56 PM
Original Schedule(s) A/B, D, E/F, G, H for Non-Individual Filed by Debtor Mercy Iowa City ACO, LLC. (Leaf, Roy)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 08/11 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 08/11/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Notice And Order re Incomplete Filing
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 08/11 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 08/11/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 08/11 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 08/11/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Notice And Order re Incomplete Filing
11 11 misc Disclosure of Compensation Fri 08/11 3:19 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Debtor Mercy Iowa City ACO, LLC Related [+]. (Leaf, Roy)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11),9 Notice And Order re Incomplete Filing
10 10 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Fri 08/11 3:13 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Debtor Mercy Iowa City ACO, LLC Related [+]. (Leaf, Roy)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
9 9 court Notice And Order re Incomplete Filing Wed 08/09 3:01 PM
Notice and Order re Incomplete Filing Related [+] Incomplete Schedules/Statements: Statement of Financial Affairs, Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Schedules A/B, D, E/F, G, and H, Declaration Concerning Schedules due by 8/21/2023. Attorney or Bankruptcy Petition Preparer Disclosure Statement due 8/21/2023. (sgre)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
8 8 order Appear pro hac vice Wed 08/09 12:16 PM
Order Granting Motion to Appear pro hac vice (David E. Gordon) Related [+] Ordered on 8/9/2023. (sgre)
Related: [-] 6
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
7 7 order Joint Administration Tue 08/08 4:47 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration on Lead Case 1:23-bk-623 with Member Case 1:23-bk-622 Related [+] Ordered on 8/8/2023. (nbec)
Related: [-] 2
Monday, August 07, 2023
6 6 motion Appear pro hac vice Mon 08/07 1:52 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice by David E. Gordon Filed by State University of Iowa (Browning, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate
5 5 misc Appearance and Request for Notice (2002) Mon 08/07 1:45 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (2002) by Lindsey L. Browning Filed by Interested Party State University of Iowa. (Browning, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Setting/Continuing Hearing - bk Mon 08/07 1:08 PM
Order Granting Debtor's Motion to (I) Schedule Expedited Hearing on First-Day Motions and (II) Approving the Form and Manner of Limited Notice Thereof Ordered on 8/7/2023. Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 8/8/2023 at 11:00 AM at Cedar Rapids Court Room. (sgre)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11),2 Motion for Joint Administration
3 3 misc Appearance and Request for Notice (2002) Mon 08/07 11:06 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (2002) by Peter Chalik Filed by Preston Hollow Community Capital, Inc., as Bondholder Representative, Computershare Trust Company, N.A., as Trustee. (Chalik, Peter)
Related: [-]
2 2 7 pgs motion Joint Administration Mon 08/07 8:44 AM
Motion for Joint Administration of Their Related Chapter 11 Cases and Granting Related Relief Filed by Mercy Iowa City ACO, LLC (Leaf, Roy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Exhibit A
1 1 31 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 08/07 7:35 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals with Incomplete Schedules. Fee Amount $1738. Debtor(s) Mercy Iowa City ACO, LLC. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 08/28/2023 (Leaf, Roy)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Mon 08/07 7:39 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 23-00622 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A3432719. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1