1304
|
|
1304
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Mon 04/29 5:57 PM
Final Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Rucki Fee Review, LLC for the period December 15, 2023 to March 13, 2024 Filed by Rucki Fee Review, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 6/12/2024 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/20/2024. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit
|
1303
|
|
1303
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Mon 04/29 5:51 PM
Final Application for Compensation of Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC for the period August 7, 2023 to March 13, 2024 Filed by Prodigy Investments Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 6/12/2024 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/20/2024. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit
|
1302
|
|
1302
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Mon 04/29 5:22 PM
Final Application for Compensation of Slaughter and May for the period (Monthly) February 1, 2024 - March 13, 2024 to (Final) October 20, 2023 - March 13, 2024 Filed by Prodigy Investments Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 6/12/2024 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/20/2024. (Borovinskaya, Shella)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit
|
1301
|
|
1301
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Mon 04/29 5:17 PM
Final Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Moelis & Company LLC for the period August 7, 2023 to March 13, 2024 Filed by Prodigy Investments Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 6/12/2024 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/20/2024. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit
|
1300
|
|
1300
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Mon 04/29 5:11 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Omnibus Order Approving Second Interim Applications of the Committee Professionals Related [+] Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Monzo, Eric)
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 1
|
1299
|
|
1299
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Mon 04/29 5:08 PM
Final Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of KPMG LLP for the period August 7, 2023 to March 13, 2024 Filed by Prodigy Investments Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 6/12/2024 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/20/2024. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice
|
1298
|
|
1298
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Mon 04/29 5:03 PM
Final Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP for the period (Monthly) March 1, 2024 - March 13, 2024 to (Final) August 7, 2023 - March 13, 2024 Filed by Prodigy Investments Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 6/12/2024 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/20/2024. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit
|
1297
|
|
1297
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Mon 04/29 4:58 PM
Final Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP for the period (Monthly) March 1, 2024 - March 13, 2024 to (Final) August 7, 2023 - March 13, 2024 Filed by Prodigy Investments Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 6/12/2024 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/20/2024. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit
|
1296
|
|
1296
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Mon 04/29 4:47 PM
Final Application for Compensation -- Combined Fifth Monthly and Final Fee Application of Miller Buckfire for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the period August 29, 2023 to March 13, 2024 Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Hearing scheduled for 6/12/2024 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/20/2024. (Monzo, Eric)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit A
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit B
|
| |
Att: 4
Verification
|
| |
Att: 5
Certificate of Service
|
1295
|
|
1295
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Mon 04/29 4:34 PM
Final Application for Compensation -- Combined Fifth Monthly and Final Application of Berkeley Research Group, LLC for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred as Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period August 29, 2023 to March 13, 2024 Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Hearing scheduled for 6/12/2024 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/20/2024. (Monzo, Eric)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit A
|
| |
Att: 3
Certificate of Service
|
1294
|
|
1294
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Mon 04/29 4:25 PM
Final Application for Compensation -- Final Application of Morris James LLP, as Delaware Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period August 26, 2023 to March 13, 2024 Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Hearing scheduled for 6/12/2024 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/20/2024. (Monzo, Eric)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit A
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit B
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit C
|
| |
Att: 5
Declaration
|
| |
Att: 6
Certificate of Service
|
1293
|
|
1293
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Mon 04/29 4:13 PM
Final Application for Compensation -- Final Application of Lowenstein Sandler LLP as Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the period August 26, 2023 to March 13, 2024 Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Hearing scheduled for 6/12/2024 at 10:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/20/2024. (Monzo, Eric)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibits A-G
|
| |
Att: 3
Certificate of Service
|
1292
|
|
1292
court
Omnibus Hearing Dates
Mon 04/29 10:06 AM
Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearings. Omnibus Hearings scheduled for 6/12/2024 at 11:00 AM (Final Fee Hearing), 6/27/2024 at 10:00 AM, 7/31/2024 at 10:00 AM US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Signed on 4/29/2024. (JMW)
Related: [-]
|
1291
|
|
1291
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/26 4:07 PM
Omnibus Order Approving Second Interim Fee Applications of the Debtors' Professionals Related [+] Order Signed on 4/26/2024. (JMW)
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit
|
1290
|
|
1290
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Fri 04/26 2:40 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Omnibus Order Approving Second Interim Fee Applications of the Debtors' Professionals Related [+] Filed by Prodigy Investments Holdings, Inc.. (Borovinskaya, Shella)
|
1289
|
|
1289
misc
Examiner's Report
Fri 04/26 11:12 AM
Examiner's Report - Regarding Second Quarterly Fee Application of Lowenstein Sandler LLP Related [+] Filed by Rucki Fee Review, LLC. (Borovinskaya, Shella)
|
1288
|
|
1288
misc
Examiner's Report
Fri 04/26 11:08 AM
Examiner's Report - Final Report Regarding Second Quarterly Fee Application of Morris James LLP Related [+] Filed by Rucki Fee Review, LLC. (Borovinskaya, Shella)
|
1287
|
|
1287
misc
Examiner's Report
Fri 04/26 11:07 AM
Examiner's Report - Final Report Regarding First Quarterly Fee Application of Slaughter and May Related [+] Filed by Rucki Fee Review, LLC. (Borovinskaya, Shella)
|
1286
|
|
1286
misc
Examiner's Report
Fri 04/26 11:05 AM
Examiner's Report - Final Report Regarding Second Quarterly Fee Application of KPMG LLP Related [+] Filed by Rucki Fee Review, LLC. (Borovinskaya, Shella)
|
1285
|
|
1285
misc
Examiner's Report
Fri 04/26 11:03 AM
Examiner's Report - Final Report Regarding Second Quarterly Fee Application of Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC Related [+] Filed by Rucki Fee Review, LLC. (Borovinskaya, Shella)
|
1284
|
|
1284
misc
Examiner's Report
Fri 04/26 11:01 AM
Examiner's Report - Final Report Regarding Second Quarterly Fee Application of Moelis & Company LLC Related [+] Filed by Rucki Fee Review, LLC. (Borovinskaya, Shella)
|
1283
|
|
1283
misc
Examiner's Report
Fri 04/26 10:57 AM
Examiner's Report - Final Report Regarding Second Quarterly Fee Application of Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP Related [+] Filed by Prodigy Investments Holdings, Inc.. (Borovinskaya, Shella)
|
1282
|
|
1282
misc
Examiner's Report
Fri 04/26 10:55 AM
Examiner's Report - Final Report Regarding Second Quarterly Fee Application of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP Related [+] Filed by Prodigy Investments Holdings, Inc.. (Borovinskaya, Shella)
|
1281
|
|
1281
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Thu 04/25 4:40 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing Dates Filed by Steven Balasiano, in his capacity as the Distribution Trustee of the PTRA Distribution Trust. (Keilson, Brya)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A
|
1280
|
|
1280
misc
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required
Tue 04/23 3:17 PM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Regarding Application for Compensation (Sixth) and Reimbursement of Expenses of Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP for the period February 1, 2024 to February 29, 2024 Related [+] Filed by Prodigy Investments Holdings, Inc.. (Borovinskaya, Shella)
|