Wisconsin Western District Court
Judge:William M Conley
Referred: Anita Marie Boor
Case #: 3:23-cv-00541
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Aug 07, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Feb 03, 2024 3:00 AM CST
Defendant
Deb Haaland
Represented By
Hillary Hoffman
Doj-Enrd
contact info
Samuel Gollis
Doj-Enrd
contact info
Defendant
Bryan Newland
Represented By
Hillary Hoffman
Doj-Enrd
contact info
Samuel Gollis
Doj-Enrd
contact info
Defendant
Tammie Poitra
Represented By
Hillary Hoffman
Doj-Enrd
contact info
Samuel Gollis
Doj-Enrd
contact info
Defendant
Bureau of Indian Affairs
Represented By
Hillary Hoffman
Doj-Enrd
contact info
Samuel Gollis
Doj-Enrd
contact info
Defendant
United States Department of the Interior
Represented By
Leslie K. Herje
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Hillary Hoffman
Doj-Enrd
contact info
Samuel Gollis
Doj-Enrd
contact info
Plaintiff
Town of Lac Du Flambeau
Represented By
Frank W. Kowalkowski
Von Briesen & Roper, S.C.
contact info
Derek John Waterstreet
Von Briesen & Roper
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
22 22 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 04/22 3:01 PM
Notice of Change of Address by Samuel Gollis (Gollis, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
21 21 order Text Only Order Tue 06/25 1:57 PM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Defendants' motion to dismiss, Dkt.10 , remains pending. Because the parties have agreed that the case schedule will commence upon the court's resolution of that motion, Dkt. 20 , the court will cancel the status conference set for June 26, 2024. The status conference is STRUCK and will be rescheduled, if needed, with the court's resolution of the motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor on 6/25/2024. (lam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 05/21 9:18 AM
Reset Hearings: Telephone Status Conference set for 6/26/2024 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor. Please call (669) 254-5252 and enter meeting ID 161 2455 6623 when prompted. Wait to be admitted into the conference. (nln/sp/ckl)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 05/13 1:46 PM
Reset Telephone Status Conference: Telephone Status Conference set for 5/22/2024 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor. Please call (669) 254-5252 and enter meeting ID 161 2455 6623 when prompted. Wait to be admitted into the conference. (nln)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 05/07 8:17 PM
Judge update in case. Case now assigned to Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor. Case no longer assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (sdl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
20 20 order Text Only Order Thu 01/25 3:25 PM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** At the January 25, 2024 telephonic preliminary pretrial conference, the court advised the parties that it was accepting their proposed format on how to resolve plaintiff's APA challenge. Because the schedule keys off of the court's decision on the pending motion to dismiss (dkt.10 ), we will reconvene telephonically (if necessary) on May 22, 2024 at 1:00 p.m. to set the dates and deadlines, anticipating a court ruling on the motion before then. The parties had no other matters to bring to the court's attention. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/25/2024. (rks)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference Thu 01/25 2:26 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 1/25/2024 [:10] (cak)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
19 19 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 01/22 5:09 PM
Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Waterstreet, Derek)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
18 18 respm Brief in Reply Fri 01/12 3:59 PM
Brief in Reply by Defendant United States Department of the Interior in Support of10 Motion to Dismiss, (Gollis, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
17 17 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 12/28 11:37 AM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time. Federal defendant's reply deadline is moved to January 12, 2024. The telephonic preliminary pretrial conference is moved to January 25, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/28/2023. (jef)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Extension of Time Thu 12/28 9:56 AM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by Defendants Bureau of Indian Affairs, Deb Haaland, Bryan Newland, Tammie Poitra, United States Department of the Interior. (Gollis, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
15 15 respm Declaration Thu 12/14 7:46 AM
Declaration of Derek J. Waterstreet filed by Plaintiff Town of Lac Du Flambeau re:10 Motion to Dismiss, (lak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - APAR,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - 2011-03-08 Letter from BIA,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - 2023-10-09 Assessment Letter from Carlson
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
14 14 respm Brief in Opposition Wed 12/13 10:03 PM
Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Town of Lac Du Flambeau re:10 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Deb Haaland, Tammie Poitra, Bryan Newland, United States Department of the Interior, Bureau of Indian Affairs (Waterstreet, Derek)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Derek J. Waterstreet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - APAR,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B - 2011-03-08 Letter from BIA,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C - 2023-10-09 Assessment Letter from Carlson
Friday, November 03, 2023
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 11/03 2:22 PM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** ORDER granting12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and to Reschedule Pretrial Conference. Brief in Opposition due 12/13/2023. Brief in Reply due 1/3/2024. Telephone Pretrial Conference reset for 1/9/2024 at 01:00 PM. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/3/2023. (jls)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extension of Time Fri 11/03 10:23 AM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and to Reschedule Pretrial Conference by Plaintiff Town of Lac Du Flambeau. (Kowalkowski, Frank)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
utility Set Pretrial or Status Conference Tue 10/24 9:53 AM
Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 11/30/2023 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [[LINK:Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference] attached] (jls)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
11 11 respm Brief in Support Mon 10/23 7:46 PM
Brief in Support of10 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Bureau of Indian Affairs, Deb Haaland, Bryan Newland, Tammie Poitra, United States Department of the Interior (Gollis, Samuel)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Dismiss Mon 10/23 7:43 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendants Bureau of Indian Affairs, Deb Haaland, Bryan Newland, Tammie Poitra, United States Department of the Interior. Brief in Opposition due 11/13/2023. Brief in Reply due 11/24/2023. (Gollis, Samuel)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/23 10:55 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Hillary Hoffman for Defendants Bureau of Indian Affairs, Deb Haaland, Bryan Newland, Tammie Poitra, United States Department of the Interior. (Hoffman, Hillary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
8 8 service Acknowledgment of Service Wed 09/13 12:21 PM
Acknowledgment of Service Executed as to6 Certificate of Service Certified Mail Return Receipts filed by Plaintiff Town of Lac Du Flambeau. (Kowalkowski, Frank)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/06 5:53 PM
Notice of Appearance of Counsel filed by Samuel Gollis for Defendant United States Department of the Interior. (Gollis, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
6 6 service Certificate of Service Tue 09/05 1:37 PM
Certificate of Service by Plaintiff Town of Lac Du Flambeau. (Kowalkowski, Frank)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 08/25 1:44 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Town of Lac Du Flambeau. (Kowalkowski, Frank)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 08/25 9:13 AM
Summons Issued as to Defendants. (lak)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 08/24 2:40 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Town of Lac Du Flambeau. (Kowalkowski, Frank)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
utility Add Judge for Shell Case Opening Tue 08/08 5:07 AM
Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Related cases 23cv135 and 23cv355 (lak)
Related: [-]
utility Standard Attachments Sent Tue 08/08 5:08 AM
Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service:[LINK:NORTC] ,[LINK:Corporate Disclosure Statement] . (lak)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/07 5:08 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Derek John Waterstreet for Plaintiff Town Of Lac Du Flambeau. (Waterstreet, Derek)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 08/07 5:02 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3285495.), filed by Town Of Lac Du Flambeau. (Kowalkowski, Frank)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Copy of Poitra's Letter,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Copy of Newland's Order