Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Richard G Stearns
Case #: 1:23-cv-11803
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2023
Terminated:Sep 26, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Feb 04, 2024 4:30 AM EST
Defendant
Erik Allebest
Defendant
Chess.com
Defendant
Jon Haskel
Defendant
Andrew P. Hoy
Defendant
Massachusetts Chess Association
Defendant
US Chess Federation
Plaintiff
Dustin Liang
through and by his father and legal guardian Thomas Liang 7 Capen Hill Rd.
Sharon, MA 02067

GPO Sep 11 2023
Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson: ORDER entered. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Dustin Liang Recommendation: The Court recommends dismissing this matter without prejudice Objections to R&R due by 9/25/2023(Dumoulin, Rose)
GPO Sep 26 2023
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered adopting Report and Recommendations re 7 Report and Recommendations. The Clerk will enter Judgment of the defendant with prejudice and close the case. (Zierk, Marsha)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
10 10 misc Copy Mailed Tue 09/26 4:57 PM
Copy re9 Judgment,8 Order on Report and Recommendations,7 Report and Recommendations re1 Complaint filed by Dustin Liang, mailed to plaintiff on 9/26/2023. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Judgment Tue 09/26 4:48 PM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT entered for the defendants. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order On Report and Recommendations Tue 09/26 3:30 PM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered adopting Report and Recommendations re7 Report and Recommendations. The Clerk will enter Judgment of the defendant with prejudice and close the case. (Zierk, Marsha)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
7 7 5 pgs motion Report and Recommendations Mon 09/11 1:18 PM
Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson: ORDER entered. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint filed by Dustin Liang Recommendation: The Court recommends dismissing this matter without prejudice Objections to R&R due by 9/25/2023(Dumoulin, Rose)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Case Assignment Mon 09/11 12:44 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Reassignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Danieli, Chris)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order Mon 09/11 10:50 AM
Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Order Referring Case to District Judge(Dumoulin, Rose)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 08/08 10:56 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Cook, Savannah)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Tue 08/08 10:50 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded [LINK:here] . These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Phillips, Sophie)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Filing Fee/Payment Received Tue 08/08 10:29 AM
Filing fee/payment: $ 402.00, receipt number 100004279 for1 Complaint (Barbosa, Nilsa)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 08/08 10:25 AM
COMPLAINT against US Chess Federation, Massachusetts Chess Association, Jon Haskel, Andrew P. Hoy, Erik Allebest, Chess.com, filed by Dustin Liang.(Cook, Savannah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form,
Att: 3 Exhibit