Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Kai N Scott
Case #: 2:23-cv-03040
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2023
Terminated:Feb 11, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 04, 2024 4:34 AM EST
Defendant
KAOLIN MUSHROOM FARMS, INC.
649 West South Street
Kennett Square, PA 19348
Represented By
ANTHONY T. BOWSER
Krevsky Bowser
contact info
Plaintiff
MARK FIDANZA
939 Penn Green Road
Avondale, PA 19311
Represented By
BRIAN DEAN BOREMAN
Unruh, Turner, Burke & Frees, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 70 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
40 40 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Tue 02/11 2:43 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE, WITH EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS, PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT ON 2/11/25. 2/11/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
39 39 minutes Settlement Conference Tue 02/11 2:07 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEYin Courtroom 3-I Settlement Conference held on 2/11/25. (bw)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
38 38 minutes Settlement Conference Mon 02/03 11:40 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY. Settlement Status Telephone Conference held on 1/31/2025. (ahf)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing Mon 02/03 11:06 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/31/2025 04:00 PM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY.(llk)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
notice Notice of Hearing Mon 01/13 12:45 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/21/2025 09:00 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY.Plaintiff's counsel are responsible for initiating the call.(llk)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
37 37 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 12/20 12:37 PM
ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 2/11/2025 09:30 AM IN Judge's Chambers, ROOM 3038, BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 12/20/24. 12/20/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
36 36 order Scheduling Order Thu 12/19 10:24 AM
FOURTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER:A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/4/2025 10:00 AM IN Judge's Chambers BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT. ALL FACT DISCOVERY DUE BY 2/17/2025. MOTIONS DUE BY 3/18/2025. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 3/18/2025. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 8/28/2025. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 8/28/2025. TRIAL POOL SET FOR 9/11/2025.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT ON 12/18/24. 12/19/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
35 35 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 12/17 4:33 PM
NOTICE of RESCHEDULING of HEARING:THE STATUS CONFERENCE HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED FOR 12/18/2024 01:30 PM Via Telephone Conference BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT.(bw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
34 34 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 12/12 10:49 AM
NOTICE of HEARING:A STATUS CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 12/19/2024 10:00 AM Via Telephone Conference BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT.(bw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 STATUS REPORT FORM
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
33 33 misc Stipulation Wed 12/11 5:45 PM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Extension of Discovery by KAOLIN MUSHROOM FARMS, INC.. (BOWSER, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
32 32 order Scheduling Order Tue 10/15 10:07 AM
THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 6/17/2025 10:00 AM IN Judge's Chambers BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT. ALL FACT DISCOVERY DUE BY 12/18/2024. MOTIONS DUE BY 1/24/2025. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 1/24/2025. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 6/3/2025. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 6/3/2025. TRIAL POOL SET FOR 6/24/2025. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT ON 10/15/24. 10/15/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
31 31 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Thu 09/19 1:38 PM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY28 , AND THE REPRESENTATIONS MADE BY COUNSEL AT THE STATUS CONFERENCE HELD ON SEPTEMBER 12, 2024, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. THE MOTION AS TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORY NO. 2(C) IS GRANTED. NO LATER THAN SEPTEMBER 30, 2024, THE DEFENDANT SHALL PRODUCE INFORMATION REGARDING THE TRAINING OF EACH OF ITS FARM MANAGERS. THE MOTION AS TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORY NO. 4 AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION NOS. 23, 24 AND 25 IS GRANTED. NO LATER THAN SEPTEMBER 30, 2024, THE DEFENDANT SHALL PRODUCE, FOR CALENDAR YEARS 2017-2023, INFORMATION REGARDING THE GROSS REVENUE RECEIVED FROM CROP PRODUCTION AT EACH OF DEFENDANT'S FARMS; THE DIRECT AND INDIRECT COSTS ATTRIBUTED TO EACH FARM; AND THE NET REVENUE/PROFIT RECEIVED FROM THE CROP PRODUCTION AT EACH FARM. THE MOTION AS TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORY NO. 15(B) AND (E) IS GRANTED. NO LATER THAN SEPTEMBER 30, 2024, THE DEFENDANT SHALL PRODUCE, FOR CALENDAR YEARS 2017-2023, UNDERLYING DOCUMENTATION REGARDING DISEASES THAT AFFECTED CROPS ON EACH FARM. THE MOTION AS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORY NO. 19 IS GRANTED IN PART. NO LATER THAN SEPTEMBER 30, 2024, THE DEFENDANT SHALL PRODUCE INFORMATION REGARDING ANY LAWSUITS AND ADMINISTRATIVE ACTIONS COMMENCED AGAINST THE DEFENDANT PERTAINING TO THE DEFENDANT'S REDUCTION IN FORCE IN OR AROUND 2022-2023. THE MOTION AS TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION NOS. 4 AND 8 IS GRANTED. NO LATER THAN SEPTEMBER 30, 2024, THE DEFENDANT SHALL UPDATE ITS RESPONSES TO THESE REQUESTS AND SHALL WITHDRAW ITS OBJECTIONS TO THEM. THE MOTION AS TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION NO. 14 IS GRANTED. NO LATER THAN SEPTEMBER 30, 2024, THE DEFENDANT SHALL PRODUCE ALL DOCUMENTS THAT RELATE TO ISSUES OR CONCERNS THAT THE DEFENDANT HAD WITH COMPOST USED AT THE FARMS FROM 2021 THROUGH 2023. THE MOTION AS TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION NO. 34 IS DENIED AS OVERBROAD. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT ON 9/19/24.9/19/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
30 30 minutes Motion Hearing Thu 09/19 10:44 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT Motion Hearing held on 9/12/24 (bw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
29 29 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 08/29 8:42 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/12/2024 AT 11:30 AM VIA TELEPHONE BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT.(ahf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Status Report
Monday, August 26, 2024
28 28 motion Compel Mon 08/26 10:50 AM
MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by MARK FIDANZA.Brief and Certificate of Service.(BOREMAN, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B1,
Att: 4 Exhibit B2,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 8 Certificate of Service
Monday, August 05, 2024
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/05 12:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW KORENOSKI on behalf of MARK FIDANZA with Certificate of Service, Jury Trial Demanded(KORENOSKI, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
26 26 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 07/23 5:17 PM
ANSWER to25 Amended Complaint by KAOLIN MUSHROOM FARMS, INC..(BOWSER, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
25 25 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 07/09 4:11 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by MARK FIDANZA.(BOREMAN, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
24 24 order Scheduling Order Tue 06/25 10:36 AM
SECOND SCHEDULING ORDER: A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 3/11/2025 10:00 AM IN Judge's Chambers BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT. ALL FACT DISCOVERY DUE BY 9/18/2024. MOTIONS DUE BY 10/18/2024. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 10/18/2024. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 3/4/2025. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 3/4/2025. TRIAL POOL SET FOR 3/18/2025. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT ON 6/25/24. 6/25/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
23 23 minutes Status Conference Tue 06/25 9:16 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT Status Conference held on 6/24/24. (bw)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
22 22 misc Status Report Fri 06/21 2:59 PM
STATUS REPORT by MARK FIDANZA. (BOREMAN, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Status Report Fri 06/21 11:33 AM
STATUS REPORT for 6.24.24 Conference by KAOLIN MUSHROOM FARMS, INC.. (BOWSER, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 06/06 10:06 AM
NOTICE of HEARING:AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SET FOR 6/24/2024 01:30 PM Via Telephone Conference BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT.(bw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 STATUS REPORT FORM
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
19 19 misc Stipulation Tue 06/04 2:46 PM
STIPULATION (JOINT) FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINES IN THE APRIL 4, 2024 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER by MARK FIDANZA.(BOREMAN, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, May 17, 2024
18 18 minutes Settlement Conference Fri 05/17 11:43 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY Settlement Conference held on 5/17/24. (JL)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 05/06 11:28 AM
ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SET FOR 5/17/2024 09:30 AM Via Video Conference BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 5/6/24. 5/6/24 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice Re: Policies and Procedures
Monday, April 29, 2024
16 16 misc Stipulation Mon 04/29 9:39 PM
STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER by KAOLIN MUSHROOM FARMS, INC.. (BOWSER, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
15 15 minutes Status Conference Mon 04/08 9:43 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT Status Conference held on 4/3/24. Court Reporter: ESR. (bw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
14 14 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Scheduling Order Thu 04/04 10:05 AM
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY, SCHEDULING ORDER:( FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/3/2024 11:00 AM IN Judge's Chambers BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT., DISCOVERY DUE BY 6/18/2024., MOTIONS DUE BY 7/18/2024., MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 11/24/2024., MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 7/18/2024., PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 11/24/2024., DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 11/24/2024., TRIAL POOL SET FOR 12/10/2024.) SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT ON 4/4/24. 4/4/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 02/07 2:10 PM
NOTICE of HEARING: NOTICE THAT A STATUS CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SET FOR 4/3/2024 10:00 AM via Telephone Conference BEFORE HONORABLE KAI N. SCOTT.(bw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 STATUS REPORT FORM
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
12 12 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim Tue 02/06 9:31 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE KAI N. SCOTT. Re: A Rule 16 Conference was held on 1/18/24. (fdc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
11 11 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 02/05 1:23 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 9/19/2024 10:00 AM IN Judge's Chambers BEFORE HONORABLE KAI N. SCOTT., ASTATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/3/2024 10:00 AM IN Telephone Conference BEFORE HONORABLE KAI N. SCOTT., PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 9/12/2024., DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 9/12/2024., TRIAL POOL SET FOR 10/1/2024. AMENDED PLEADINGS DUE BY 7/20/2024. DISCOVERY DUE BY 4/18/2024. MOTIONS DUE BY 5/19/2024. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 5/19/2024. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAI N. SCOTT ON 2/5/24. 2/5/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/02 3:38 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by KAOLIN MUSHROOM FARMS, INC..(BOWSER, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 01/18 11:46 AM
ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANT'S PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS4 IS GRANTED IN PART. COUNT II OF THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE DEFENDANT SHALL FILE ITS ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 2/2/24. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 1/18/24.1/18/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
8 8 misc Report Of Thu 01/11 4:13 PM
Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting filed by MARK FIDANZA. (BOREMAN, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 01/03 12:46 PM
NOTICE of HEARING:AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SET FOR 1/18/2024 10:30 AM IN Judge's Chambers, ROOM 5614, BEFORE HONORABLE KAI N. SCOTT.(bw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 REPORT OF RULE 26(f) MEETING FORM
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
6 6 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 09/13 4:33 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MARK FIDANZA.(BOREMAN, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
5 5 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Wed 08/30 5:06 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including South Mill Mushrooms Holding Corporation; South Mill Champs Holding Corporation; South Mill Parent LLC by KAOLIN MUSHROOM FARMS, INC..(BOWSER, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 08/30 5:01 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by KAOLIN MUSHROOM FARMS, INC..Brief; Certificate of Service.(BOWSER, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Brief in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - EEOC Charge
Thursday, August 10, 2023
3 3 service Affidavit of Service Thu 08/10 3:07 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Michael J. O'Neill re: served Summons and Complaint upon Iris Ayala, HR Director of Kaolin Mushroom Farms, Inc. by Personal Service on 08/09/2023 (BOREMAN, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 08/09 6:46 AM
Summons Issued as to KAOLIN MUSHROOM FARMS, INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 8/9/23 (bw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Tue 08/08 11:24 AM
COMPLAINT against KAOLIN MUSHROOM FARMS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16864346.), filed by MARK FIDANZA.(BOREMAN, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form