New York Southern District Court
Judge:Arun Subramanian
Case #: 1:23-cv-06961
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2023
Terminated:Sep 06, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Feb 04, 2024 4:24 AM EST
Defendant
Mark Augusti
Defendant
Carrie Bienkowski
Defendant
Conformis, Inc.
Defendant
Kenneth Fallon, III
Defendant
Gary P. Fischetti
Defendant
Philip W. Johnston
Defendant
Brad Langdale
Plaintiff
Jacob Wheeler
Represented By
Richard Adam Acocelli, Jr
Acocelli Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 09/06 11:25 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, and without costs against the defendant(s) Mark Augusti, Carrie Bienkowski, Conformis, Inc., Kenneth Fallon, III, Gary P. Fischetti, Philip W. Johnston, Brad Langdale. Document filed by Jacob Wheeler. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Acocelli, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
4 4 order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Wed 08/16 11:14 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Arun Subramanian. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 8/16/2023) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Tue 08/15 11:51 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Arun Subramanian. Judge Lewis J. Liman is no longer assigned to the case. (yv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 08/09 9:43 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 08/09 9:44 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar Wed 08/09 9:44 AM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Lewis J. Liman as possibly related to 23cv6536 (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Accepted as Related Wed 08/09 4:32 PM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:23-cv-06536-LJL. Notice of Assignment to follow. (sgz)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Wed 08/09 4:33 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sgz)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 08/09 4:33 PM
Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sgz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
3 3 misc Statement of Relatedness Tue 08/08 11:24 AM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:23-cv-06536. Document filed by Jacob Wheeler..(Acocelli, Richard)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 08/08 11:21 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Acocelli, Richard)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 08/08 11:20 AM
COMPLAINT against Mark Augusti, Carrie Bienkowski, Conformis, Inc., Kenneth Fallon, III, Gary P. Fischetti, Philip W. Johnston, Brad Langdale. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28116293)Document filed by Jacob Wheeler..(Acocelli, Richard)
Related: [-]