New Jersey District Court
Judge:Esther Salas
Referred: Leda D Wettre
Case #: 2:23-cv-04235
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2023
Terminated:Oct 10, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Feb 04, 2024 4:35 AM EST
Defendant
BLOOMBERG L.P.
Represented By
MARIEL L. BELANGER
Walsh Pizzi O'Reilly Falanga LLP
contact info
FABIAN MARRIOTT
Walsh Pizzi O'Reilly Falanga LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GUY GREGROIRE
Represented By
COLIN M. PAGE
Colin M. Page & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Stipulation and Order Order of Dismissal Tue 10/10 9:47 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice. The Clerk of the Court shall CLOSE this matter. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 10/10/2023. (dam)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
11 11 1 pgs misc Stipulation Fri 10/06 2:08 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by BLOOMBERG L.P.. (BELANGER, MARIEL)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Fri 10/06 12:47 PM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ek)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
10 10 order Order Wed 10/04 10:32 AM
TEXT ORDER - The Court will address defendant's October 3, 2023 letter application (ECF No. 9) at the Rule 16 initial scheduling conference set for November 13, 2023, which will proceed as scheduled. The parties shall submit a joint discovery plan at least 3 business days prior to the conference as previously directed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/4/2023. (rn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
9 9 4 pgs misc Letter Tue 10/03 2:36 PM
Letter from Mariel L. Belanger to the Hon. Leda Dunn Wettre, U.S.M.J. providing motion status and requesting adjournment of the November 13, 2023 Scheduling Conference re7 Order, Set Hearings, Set/Clear Flags. (BELANGER, MARIEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
8 8 2 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 09/29 3:02 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by BLOOMBERG L.P.. (BELANGER, MARIEL)
Related: [-]
7 7 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Fri 09/29 11:50 AM
LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/13/2023 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/29/23. (LM, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 09/29 9:28 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to6 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 11/6/2023 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
6 6 2 pgs motion Dismiss Thu 09/28 1:54 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by BLOOMBERG L.P..(BELANGER, MARIEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 24 pgs Brief,
Att: 2 2 pgs Declaration of Mariel L. Belanger,
Att: 3 12 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 4 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Friday, September 08, 2023
5 5 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Fri 09/08 3:13 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (BELANGER, MARIEL)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/08 3:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by FABIAN MARRIOTT on behalf of BLOOMBERG L.P. (MARRIOTT, FABIAN)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/08 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARIEL L. BELANGER on behalf of BLOOMBERG L.P. (BELANGER, MARIEL)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Fri 09/08 5:53 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by BLOOMBERG L.P. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/28/2023. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 08/11 2:32 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to BLOOMBERG L.P.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 08/08 3:40 PM
COMPLAINT against BLOOMBERG L.P. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number BNJDC-14512010) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Guy Gregoire.(PAGE, COLIN)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 08/10 9:16 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, )
Related: [-]