Utah District Court
Judge:Dustin B Pead
Case #: 1:23-cv-00090
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2023
Terminated:Mar 05, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 04, 2024 2:43 AM MST
Defendant
John B. Bond
Represented By
Christopher Kim Crockett
Weber County Attorneys Office
contact info
Courtlan P. Erickson
Weber County Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
John Ulibarri
Represented By
Christopher Kim Crockett
Weber County Attorneys Office
contact info
Courtlan P. Erickson
Weber County Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Weber County
Represented By
Christopher Kim Crockett
Weber County Attorneys Office
contact info
Courtlan P. Erickson
Weber County Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Weber County Assesor
Represented By
Christopher Kim Crockett
Weber County Attorneys Office
contact info
Courtlan P. Erickson
Weber County Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Weber County Treasurer
Represented By
Christopher Kim Crockett
Weber County Attorneys Office
contact info
Courtlan P. Erickson
Weber County Attorneys Office
contact info
Plaintiff
James K. Tracy
1939 S 2650 W
WEST HAVEN, UT 84401

GPO Oct 19 2023
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 22 MOTION for Hearing re 16 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/19/2023. (alf)
GPO Mar 04 2024
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER finding as moot 32 Motion to Expedite; granting 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ; denying 27 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/4/2024. (alf)

Docket last updated: 79 minutes ago
Friday, June 21, 2024
39 39 appeal USCA Mandate Fri 06/21 12:32 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to 36 Notice of Appeal, filed by James K. Tracy According to the USCA the appeal is dismissed for lack of prosecution.(alf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mandate Letter
Monday, March 18, 2024
38 38 appeal USCA Case Number Mon 03/18 11:26 AM
USCA Case Number Case Appealed to Tenth Circuit Case Number 24-4028 for36 Notice of Appeal, filed by James K. Tracy. (jrj)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
37 37 appeal Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA Mon 03/11 1:27 PM
Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA re36 Notice of Appeal.(jrj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix
36 36 appeal Notice of Appeal Mon 03/11 1:21 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to34 Order on Motion to Expedite,, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, Memorandum Decision,35 Judgment filed by James K. Tracy. Appeals to the USCA for the 10th Circuit. Fee Status: Not Paid. Filing fee $ 605. (jrj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
35 35 order Judgment Tue 03/05 11:19 AM
JUDGMENT this action is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Case Closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/5/2024. (mh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
34 34 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Expedite Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Memorandum Decision Mon 03/04 4:42 PM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER finding as moot 32 Motion to Expedite; granting 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ; denying 27 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/4/2024. (alf)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
33 33 respm Response to Motion Mon 01/22 11:04 AM
Defendant's RESPONSE to Motion re32 MOTION to Expedite These Proceddings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1657(a) filed by Defendants John B. Bond, John Ulibarri, Weber County, Weber County Assesor, Weber County Treasurer. (Erickson, Courtlan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
32 32 motion Expedite Wed 01/17 3:57 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION to Expedite These Proceedings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1657(a) filed by Plaintiff James K. Tracy. (mh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
31 31 misc Request to Submit for Decision Wed 12/20 4:08 PM
SECOND REQUEST to Submit for Decision re27 MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James K. Tracy. (jwt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
30 30 misc Request to Submit for Decision Wed 12/06 1:54 PM
REQUEST to Submit for Decision re27 MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James K. Tracy. (alf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
29 29 respm Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion Tue 12/05 1:32 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re27 MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff James K. Tracy. (alf)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
28 28 respm Response to Motion Mon 11/27 3:36 PM
Defendant's RESPONSE to Motion re27 MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint,, filed by Defendants John B. Bond, John Ulibarri, Weber County, Weber County Assesor, Weber County Treasurer. (Erickson, Courtlan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
27 27 motion Amend/Correct Wed 11/15 8:53 AM
MOTION to Amend1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff James K. Tracy.(alf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit H,
Att: 10 Exhibit I,
Att: 11 Exhibit J
Thursday, October 19, 2023
26 26 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Hearing Memorandum Decision Thu 10/19 3:07 PM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 22 MOTION for Hearing re 16 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/19/2023. (alf)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
25 25 misc Request to Submit for Decision Mon 10/16 10:06 AM
REQUEST to Submit for Decision re22 MOTION for Hearing re16 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff James K. Tracy. (alf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
24 24 respm Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion Thu 10/12 10:50 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re22 MOTION for Hearing re16 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff James K. Tracy.(alf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
23 23 respm Response to Motion Wed 10/04 9:48 AM
Defendant's RESPONSE to Motion re22 MOTION for Hearing re16 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support re Motion Hearing filed by Defendants John B. Bond, John Ulibarri, Weber County, Weber County Assesor, Weber County Treasurer. (Erickson, Courtlan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
22 22 motion Hearing Wed 09/20 2:54 PM
MOTION for Hearing re16 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff James K. Tracy. (alf)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
21 21 respm Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion Mon 09/18 12:12 PM
Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re16 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants John B. Bond, John Ulibarri, Weber County, Weber County Assesor, Weber County Treasurer. (Erickson, Courtlan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
20 20 11 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Tue 09/05 4:10 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re16 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff James K. Tracy. (alf)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Tue 09/05 11:32 AM
NOTICE OF CONSENT Under DUCivR 72-4, returned Consent Forms from all relevant parties are now filed. The Magistrate Judge is presiding by consent. (mh)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment Tue 09/05 9:55 AM
NOTICE TO THE DEFENDANTS ONLY - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form and place Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Please do not e-file the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants John B. Bond, John Ulibarri, Weber County, Weber County Assesor, Weber County Treasurer. Form due by 9/26/2023. (mh)
Related: [-]
misc Received Consent /Reassignment Form Tue 09/05 11:28 AM
RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants John B. Bond, John Ulibarri, Weber County, Weber County Assesor and Weber County Treasurer. (mh)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
16 16 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 09/01 4:34 PM
Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support , Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants John B. Bond, John Ulibarri, Weber County, Weber County Assesor, Weber County Treasurer. Attorney Courtlan P. Erickson added to party John B. Bond(pty:dft), Attorney Courtlan P. Erickson added to party John Ulibarri(pty:dft), Attorney Courtlan P. Erickson added to party Weber County(pty:dft), Attorney Courtlan P. Erickson added to party Weber County Assesor(pty:dft), Attorney Courtlan P. Erickson added to party Weber County Treasurer(pty:dft)(Erickson, Courtlan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Email Filing and Notification Form Thu 08/17 9:52 AM
NOTICE of Email Filing and Notification Form by James K. Tracy. (alf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 08/21 11:10 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by James K. Tracy as to Weber County Treasurer served on 8/11/2023, answer due 9/1/2023. (alf)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 08/21 11:09 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by James K. Tracy as to Weber County Assesor served on 8/11/2023, answer due 9/1/2023. (alf)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 08/21 11:08 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by James K. Tracy as to Weber County served on 8/10/2023, answer due 8/31/2023. (alf)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 08/21 11:07 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by James K. Tracy as to John Ulibarri served on 8/11/2023, answer due 9/1/2023. (alf)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 08/21 11:06 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by James K. Tracy as to John B. Bond served on 8/11/2023, answer due 9/1/2023. (alf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
8 8 5 pgs order Order to Propose Schedule Wed 08/09 12:17 PM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/9/2023. (mh)
Related: [-]
misc Received Consent /Reassignment Form Wed 08/09 1:53 PM
RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff James K. Tracy. (mh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment Tue 08/08 1:54 PM
NOTICE TO THE PLAINTIFF - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form and place Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Please do not e-file the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff James K. Tracy. Form due by 8/29/2023. (mh)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 08/08 1:32 PM
Summons Issued as to Weber County. (haa)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 08/08 1:31 PM
Summons Issued as to Weber County Treasurer. (haa)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 08/08 1:31 PM
Summons Issued as to Weber County Assesor. (haa)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 08/08 1:30 PM
Summons Issued as to John Ulibarri. (haa)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 08/08 1:30 PM
Summons Issued as to John B. Bond. (haa)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Court) Tue 08/08 1:17 PM
COMPLAINT against John B. Bond, John Ulibarri, Weber County, Weber County Assesor, Weber County Treasurer (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 3137) (Fee Status: Paid) filed by James K. Tracy. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (haa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Warranty Deed,
Att: 2 Exhibit B QuitClaim Deed,
Att: 3 Exhibit C Bidding Docs.,
Att: 4 Exhibit D Delinquent Taxes,
Att: 5 Exhibit E Public Records Request,
Att: 6 Exhibit F Statement,
Att: 7 Exhibit G Tax Notice,
Att: 8 Exhibit H Tort Claim Notice,
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet