California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando M Olguin
Referred: A Joel Richlin
Case #: 2:23-cv-06449
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2023
Terminated:Aug 01, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 04, 2024 1:19 AM PST
Defendant
Integral Artists Group LLC
Represented By
Scott S. Humphreys
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Brian S. S. Auerbach
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Lynn E. Rzonca
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Defendant
Integral Artists, LLC
Represented By
Scott S. Humphreys
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Brian S. S. Auerbach
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Lynn E. Rzonca
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Defendant
Nils Larsen
Represented By
Scott S. Humphreys
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Brian S. S. Auerbach
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Lynn E. Rzonca
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Integral Artists Inc.
Represented By
Timothy D Byron
Byron Raphael LLP
contact info
Jordan Philip Raphael
Byron Raphael LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
47 47 2 pgs order Order Tue 12/17 1:08 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION46 FOR WITH PREJUDICE DISMISSAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Joint Stipulation is GRANTED. The instant Civil Action is dismissed with prejudice. (iv)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
46 46 stip Dismiss Case Mon 12/16 6:54 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Final Terms of Settlement Requiring "With Prejudice" Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Integral Artists Inc..(Pampalone, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, October 11, 2024
45 45 2 pgs order Order Fri 10/11 11:20 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION44 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The deadline upon which to show good cause to re-open the action if settlement is not consummated, or else be deemed to have consented to dismissal of the action without prejudice, is hereby extended to 11/15/2024. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
44 44 stip Continue Thu 10/10 3:30 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Time Period To Re-Open Civil Action Pending Finalization of Settlement from October 15, 2024 to November 15, 2024 filed by Plaintiff Integral Artists Inc..(Pampalone, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, September 13, 2024
43 43 2 pgs order Order Fri 09/13 3:39 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION42 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RE-OPEN CIVIL ACTION PENDING FINALIZATION OF SETTLEMENT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
42 42 stip Continue Wed 09/11 3:24 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Time Period To Re-Open Civil Action Pending Finalization of Settlement from September 15, 2024 to October 15, 2024 Re: Order,, Terminated Case,40 filed by Plaintiff Integral Artists Inc..(Pampalone, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 01, 2024
41 41 misc Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120) Thu 08/01 4:15 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (lom)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order
40 40 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 08/01 4:08 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Having been advised by counsel that the above-entitled action has been settled, (Dkt. 39, Notice of Settlement in Principle), IT IS ORDERED that the above-captioned action is hereby dismissed without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown by no later than forty-five (45) days, to re-open the action if settlement is not consummated. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
39 39 notice Settlement Wed 07/31 8:21 PM
NOTICE of Settlement in Principle filed by Plaintiff Integral Artists Inc.. (Pampalone, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
38 38 2 pgs order Order Mon 05/06 1:17 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION37 FOR CONTINUANCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. All fact discovery shall be completed by 8/2/2024. The parties shall complete their settlement conference by 8/2/2024. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
37 37 stip Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date Fri 05/03 10:07 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to August 2, 2024 filed by Defendants Integral Artists Group LLC, Integral Artists, LLC, Nils Larsen.(Auerbach, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 11, 2024
36 36 order Substitute Attorney Fri 04/12 9:28 AM
ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY35 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The request of Integral Artists Inc. to substitute Connor Lynch as attorney of record instead of Jordan Phillip Raphael and Timothy Byron is GRANTED. (iv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
35 35 motion Substitute Attorney (G-01) Wed 04/10 2:41 PM
REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Connor Lynch in place of attorney Jordan Raphael, Tim Byron filed by Plaintiff Integral Artists Inc.. (Attorney Connor Lynch added to party Integral Artists Inc.(pty:pla)) (Lynch, Connor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 22, 2024
34 34 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/25 4:20 PM
ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Michael Pampalone III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Integral Artists Inc., designating Jordan Raphael as local counsel33 . (iv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
33 33 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 03/20 2:20 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael J. Pampalone III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Integral Artists Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37131863) filed by Plaintiff Integral Artists Inc.. (Raphael, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 18, 2023
32 32 order Protective Order Mon 12/18 10:17 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin re Stipulation for Protective Order31 . See document for further information. (es)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 16, 2023
31 31 stip Protective Order Sat 12/16 6:48 AM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Integral Artists Inc..(Raphael, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
30 30 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 12/01 3:49 PM
ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
Related: [-]
29 29 18 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 12/01 3:48 PM
SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. Jury Trial set for 12/17/2024 at 9:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See order for dates, deadlines and requirements imposed.* (vdr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
28 28 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 12/01 9:35 AM
ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Lynn Rzonca to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Integral Artists, LLC, et al., designating Scott Humphreys as local counsel25 . (iv)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 12/01 9:32 AM
ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Brian Auerbach to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Integral Artists, LLC, et al., designating Scott Humphreys as local counsel24 . (iv)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Miscellaneous Document Thu 11/30 11:31 AM
JOINT REQUEST FOR REMOTE ZOOM APPEARANCE ON SCHEDULING CONFERENCE re: Stipulation to Continue,21(Humphreys, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
25 25 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 11/29 5:42 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lynn E. Rzonca to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Integral Artists Group LLC, Integral Artists, LLC, Nils Larsen (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36488769) filed by Defendants Integral Artists Group LLC, Integral Artists, LLC, Nils Larsen. (Humphreys, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
24 24 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 11/29 5:35 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian S.S. Auerbach to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Integral Artists Group LLC, Integral Artists, LLC, Nils Larsen (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36488710) filed by Defendants Integral Artists Group LLC, Integral Artists, LLC, Nils Larsen. (Humphreys, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
23 23 misc Report Wed 11/15 7:09 PM
JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Plaintiff Integral Artists Inc.. (Raphael, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
22 22 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 11/03 4:42 PM
ORDER RE: STIPULATION21 TO CONTINUE NOVEMBER 30, 2023 SCHEDULING by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The scheduling conference is continued to December 7, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. (iv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
21 21 stip Continue Thu 11/02 1:08 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from November 30, 2023 to December 7, 2023 filed by Plaintiff Integral Artists Inc..(Raphael, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Raphael Decl ISO Joint Stipulation,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex 1 to Raphael Decl,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
20 20 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Tue 10/24 10:02 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
19 19 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 10/23 2:06 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Integral Artists Group LLC, Integral Artists, LLC, Nils Larsen, (Humphreys, Scott)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 10/23 2:00 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Integral Artists Group LLC, Integral Artists, LLC, Nils Larsen, (Humphreys, Scott)
Related: [-]
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 10/23 1:40 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Integral Artists Group LLC, Integral Artists, LLC, Nils Larsen.(Attorney Scott S. Humphreys added to party Integral Artists Group LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Scott S. Humphreys added to party Integral Artists, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Scott S. Humphreys added to party Nils Larsen(pty:dft))(Humphreys, Scott)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
16 16 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 08/23 2:54 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Integral Artists Inc.. upon Nils Larsen waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/23/2023, answer due 10/23/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Nils Larsen. (Raphael, Jordan)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 08/23 2:53 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Integral Artists Inc.. upon Integral Artists Group LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/23/2023, answer due 10/23/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Nils Larsen. (Raphael, Jordan)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 08/23 2:46 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Integral Artists Inc.. upon Integral Artists, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/23/2023, answer due 10/23/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Nils Larsen. (Raphael, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
13 13 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 08/16 10:48 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
12 12 service Summons Issued Fri 08/11 10:08 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Integral Artists Group LLC, Integral Artists, LLC, Nils Larsen. (iv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
11 11 notice Summons Request Thu 08/10 1:46 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Integral Artists Inc.. (Raphael, Jordan)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Deficiency in Summons Thu 08/10 1:14 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 08/10 11:13 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
8 8 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 08/10 11:12 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 08/10 11:12 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. (lh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
6 6 misc Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120) Tue 08/08 3:03 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Integral Artists Inc.. (Raphael, Jordan)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 08/08 3:00 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Integral Artists Inc. (Raphael, Jordan)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 08/08 2:58 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Integral Artists Inc., (Raphael, Jordan)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Tue 08/08 2:55 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Integral Artists Inc.. (Raphael, Jordan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 08/08 2:52 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Integral Artists Inc.. (Raphael, Jordan)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 08/08 2:50 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35816011 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Integral Artists Inc.. (Attorney Jordan Philip Raphael added to party Integral Artists Inc.(pty:pla))(Raphael, Jordan)
Related: [-]