Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Jay C Zainey
Referred: Eva J Dossier
Case #: 2:23-cv-03264
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2023
Terminated:Jan 08, 2025
Last checked: Monday Feb 05, 2024 2:30 AM CST
Defendant
Allied Trust Insurance Company
Represented By
Rowan Whitehurst Stoehr
The Monson Law Firm. LLC
contact info
Matthew D. Monson
The Monson Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Lauren Alexis Lam
The Monson Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Erin W. Berggren
The Monson Law Firm, LLC
contact info
John D. Mineo, IV
The Monson Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Rachel L. Flarity
The Monson Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Kyle Clinton Matthias
The Monson Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Austin Tyler Welch, I
The Monson Law Firm, LLC
contact info
John Covington Henry
The Monson Law Firm
contact info
Interested Party
Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By
Francis Joseph Lobrano
Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux
contact info
Plaintiff
Clifford J Blanchard
Represented By
Dominique S. Badon
Robichaux, Mize, Wadsack, Richardson & Watson, LLC
contact info
Chinwe Onyenekwu
Galindo Law Firm
contact info
Mark Richard Ladd
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, January 10, 2025
26 26 21 pgs order Order Fri 01/10 11:30 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS: ORDER Regarding Settlement of Former MMA Cases. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/19/2024.(lag)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Case Wed 01/08 3:49 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion to Dismiss Case with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 11/8/2024. (mmm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
24 24 motion Dismiss Case Tue 01/07 4:37 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case with Prejudice by Allied Trust Insurance Company, Clifford J. Blanchard.(Berggren, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, August 30, 2024
23 23 order Scheduling Order Fri 08/30 9:56 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2025 11:00 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. Jury Trial set for 3/17/2025 08:30 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. All discovery must be completed by 2/4/2025. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey.(mmm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice Form
Friday, August 16, 2024
22 22 1 pgs order Order Set Hearings Fri 08/16 2:10 PM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 8/28/2024 at 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(jls)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 07/31 5:33 PM
ORDER GRANTING19 MOTION to Substitute Counsel. Attorneys Wilfred Derbigny Denis, III and Dory Tarver hereby substituted as lead counselors for Plaintiff. Attorney's Brian J. Houghtaling and Tucker H. McGill are enrolled as additional counsel for Clifford J Blanchard. Attorney Mark Richard Ladd is withdrawn. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 7/30/2024.(jls)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
20 20 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 07/31 1:48 PM
ORDER NO. 20 CERTIFYING CASES TO BE RETURNED TO THE DOCKET: Pursuant to Sections 3.D and E of CMO No. 1. in this matter, the undersigned hereby certifies that the parties in the case listed below have complied with the requirements of the Streamlined Settlement Program and have not resolved their respective cases. Accordingly, the stay in this matter is hereby lifted and the Clerk is directed to return the case to the docket of the presiding District Judge so that it can be set for a scheduling conference. The Clerk is further directed to notify the case manager of each affected District Judge of this filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 7/30/2024. (NEF: Section A)(cs)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
19 19 motion Enroll as Counsel of Record Mon 07/29 10:01 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Brian J. Houghtaling and Tucker H. McGill by Clifford J Blanchard.Attorney Dorothy L. Tarver added to party Clifford J Blanchard(pty:pla).(Tarver, Dorothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order Tue 06/18 4:08 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - ORDER re Motions to Compel and Payment of Mediation Fees. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 06/17/2024.(lag)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
17 17 30+ pgs order Order Transferring Case Mon 04/15 8:24 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Magistrate Judge Eva J. Dossier. Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 04/12/2024.(lag)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Fri 02/09 12:42 PM
ORDER GRANTING14 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Michal Jarrett Harris is hereby enrolled for Clifford J Blanchard in place of Attorney Chinwe Onyenekwu. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 2/8/2024. (jls)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
15 15 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Thu 02/08 10:20 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re14 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Mike Harris to be substituted in place of Chinwe N. Onyenekwu . Name of attorney who electronically filed this document does not match name of signatory attorney on pleading. The user log-in and password serve as the required signature for purposes of Rule 11 of the FRCP. No further action is necessary. (cs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
14 14 motion Substitute Attorney Wed 02/07 3:52 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Mike Harris to be substituted in place of Chinwe N. Onyenekwu by Clifford J Blanchard.(Ladd, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 15, 2023
13 13 30+ pgs order Order Fri 12/15 9:53 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Fourth Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/12/2023.(lag)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
12 12 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Wed 11/22 11:57 AM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Allied Trust Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allied Trust Holdings, LLC for Allied Trust Insurance Company (Mineo, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/06 4:10 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Allied Trust Insurance Company.Attorney John D. Mineo, IV added to party Allied Trust Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Mineo, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Wed 10/11 4:24 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Mark Richard Ladd,Chinwe Onyenekwu for Clifford J Blanchard. Attorney Dominique S. Badon terminated. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 10/11/2023. (am)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
9 9 motion Substitute Attorney Tue 10/10 4:53 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Mark Ladd and Chinwe Ndidi Onyenekwu to be substituted in place of Dominique S. Badon by Clifford J Blanchard.(Badon, Dominique)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, October 06, 2023
8 8 misc ADI event Fri 10/06 11:55 AM
Amended Exhibit A to Hurricane Ida Case Management Order. (lag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
7 7 30+ pgs order Order Thu 09/28 12:24 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Third Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/14/2023.(lag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
6 6 30+ pgs order Order Tue 09/19 10:07 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Second Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/12/2023.(lag)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
5 5 30+ pgs order Order Wed 08/09 3:28 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 WITH ADDENDUM. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/2022.(mmm)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 08/09 3:27 PM
Summons Issued as to Allied Trust Insurance Company. (mmm)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Wed 08/09 3:26 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re1 Complaint. ***Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Summons. ***When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. (mmm)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Wed 08/09 11:17 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (mb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/09 11:08 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Allied Trust Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10072957) filed by Clifford Blanchard.Attorney Dominique S. Badon added to party Clifford Blanchard(pty:selreq).(Badon, Dominique) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/9/2023) (mmm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons