Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John M Gallagher
Case #: 5:23-cv-03060
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2023
Terminated:Dec 18, 2023
Last checked: Monday Feb 05, 2024 3:39 AM EST
Defendant
LEHIGH VALLEY EYE CENTER, P.C.
Represented By
JACQUELINE PROMISLO
Cozen And O'Connor
contact info
Michelle Amanda Michelson
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Plaintiff
ALEXZEE BARRY
Represented By
WILLIAM P. MANSOUR
Mansour Law, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, December 18, 2023
17 17 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Mon 12/18 10:59 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b), PURSUANT TO THE AGREEMENT OR COUNSEL WITHOUT COSTS. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 12/18/23. 12/18/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
16 16 order Scheduling Order Mon 11/27 4:10 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 7/17/2024 01:30 PM IN Cahn 4B BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER. STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/16/2024 01:30 PM IN Telephone Conference BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER. DISCOVERY DUE BY 4/15/2024. JURY SELECTION SET FOR 8/2/2024 09:00 AM IN Philadelphia BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER. MOTIONS DUE BY 4/29/2024. MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 6/26/2024. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 4/29/2024. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 6/21/2024. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 6/21/2024. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 8/5/2024 09:00 AM IN Cahn 4B BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 11/27/23. 11/27/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
15 15 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial 1 - Terminate Hearings Tue 11/14 3:38 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER: Pretrial Conference held on 11/14/23. Court Reporter: None. (er)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 10/04 9:57 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. TAKE NOTICE, that a Rule 16 Conference, in the above case has been set as follows: Lead counsel shall appear for a Rule 16 conference in the above-captioned matter on Tuesday, November 14, 2023 at 2:00 PM, at the United States District Court located at 504 West Hamilton Street, Suite 4701, Allentown, Pennsylvania. Counsel are required to meet and confer pursuant to Rule 26(f) and to complete and submit to the Court the Joint Rule 26(f) Report no later than Monday, November 6, 2023, ETC.(er)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
13 13 discov Disclosure Tue 10/03 10:33 AM
Disclosure with Certificate of Service by LEHIGH VALLEY EYE CENTER, P.C..(PROMISLO, JACQUELINE)
Related: [-]
12 12 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Tue 10/03 9:35 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by LEHIGH VALLEY EYE CENTER, P.C..(PROMISLO, JACQUELINE)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/03 9:19 AM
Defendant Lehigh Valley Eye Center P.C.'s ANSWER to Complaint With Affirmative Defenses by LEHIGH VALLEY EYE CENTER, P.C..(PROMISLO, JACQUELINE)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/03 9:12 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Amanda Michelson on behalf of LEHIGH VALLEY EYE CENTER, P.C. with Certificate of Service(Michelson, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
9 9 discov Disclosure Mon 09/11 6:23 PM
Disclosure with Certificate of Service by LEHIGH VALLEY EYE CENTER, P.C..(PROMISLO, JACQUELINE)
Related: [-]
8 8 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Mon 09/11 6:12 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by LEHIGH VALLEY EYE CENTER, P.C..(PROMISLO, JACQUELINE)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
7 7 order Stipulation and Order Fri 09/01 3:03 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT LEHIGH VALLEYEYE CENTER TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. DEFENDANT, LEHIGH VALLEY EYE CENTER, P.C., SHALL HAVE UNTIL OCTOBER 2, 2023 TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 9/1/23. 9/1/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order Fri 09/01 1:50 PM
ORDER THAT LEHIGH VALLEY EYE CENTER, P.C., HAS NOT FILED THE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT REQUIRED BY FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1 AT THE TIME OF FILING ITS FIRST APPEARANCE, LEHIGH VALLEY EYE CENTER, P.C., IS HEREBY ORDERED TO FILE ITS DISCLOSURE STATEMENT WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. THIS ORDER ALSO SERVES AS A REMINDER TO THE PARTIES OF THEIR CONTINUING OBLIGATION PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1(B)(2) TO "PROMPTLY FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT" OF ANY CHANGES TO THE INFORMATION REQUIRED BY FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1(A). SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 9/1/23. 9/1/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Stipulation Fri 09/01 11:57 AM
STIPULATION For Extension of Time for Defendant Lehigh Valley Eye Center to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by LEHIGH VALLEY EYE CENTER, P.C..(PROMISLO, JACQUELINE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/01 11:46 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JACQUELINE PROMISLO on behalf of LEHIGH VALLEY EYE CENTER, P.C. with Certificate of Service(PROMISLO, JACQUELINE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, August 21, 2023
3 3 service Affidavit of Service Mon 08/21 11:32 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Dennis Richman Services re: served Summons & Complaint upon Heather Buthrie (Person in Charge)) by Hand Delivery on 08/11/2023 (MANSOUR, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 08/10 1:13 PM
Summons Issued as to LEHIGH VALLEY EYE CENTER, P.C. Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/10/23. (er)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Wed 08/09 2:02 PM
COMPLAINT against LEHIGH VALLEY EYE CENTER, P.C. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16868096.), filed by Alexzee Barry.(MANSOUR, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Notice of Right to Sue,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Feb. 21 Email,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Mar. 13 Email,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Apr. 19 Email,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Apr. 29 Email