Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Aleta A Trauger
Case #: 3:23-cv-00831
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal- Property Damage
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2023
Last checked: Monday Feb 05, 2024 2:47 AM CST
Defendant
Mercury Air Center-Nashville, LLC
Represented By
David A. Frank, II
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
William J. Katt
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Jamie K. Durrett
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew J. Clemente
Represented By
Dudley A. Cheadle
Office Of Tennessee Attorney General
contact info
John Roaten Cheadle, Jr.
Cheadle Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
22 22 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/25 1:52 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re20 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Matthew J. Clemente.(Cheadle, Dudley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment RESPONSE TO MATERIAL FACTS,
Att: 2 Attachment BRIEF
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
21 21 18 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Wed 04/02 2:00 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of20 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Mercury Air Center-Nashville, LLC . (Durrett, Jamie)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Partial Summary Judgment Wed 04/02 1:57 PM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Mercury Air Center-Nashville, LLC.(Durrett, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Employee Statements for N258PA,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B-Michael Shadowens Statement,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C-Nashville Airport Incident Report,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D-Matthew Clemente Deposition Transcript,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E-Plaintiffs Response to Def's First Rogs,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F-Plaintiffs Proof of Loss,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G-Air Appraisal Company Appraisal Report-10.6.2003,
Att: 8 Attachment Declaration of Aaron Wood,
Att: 9 Attachment Notice of Filing,
Att: 10 Attachment Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
Monday, March 03, 2025
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave Mon 03/03 3:53 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Leave to file Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/3/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Leave Mon 03/03 9:29 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re15 Case Management Order, by Mercury Air Center-Nashville, LLC. (Durrett, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
17 17 misc Joint Mediation Report Wed 10/30 2:11 PM
JOINT MEDIATION REPORT filed by Mercury Air Center-Nashville, LLC. (Durrett, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
16 16 2 pgs order Order Setting Case for Trial Tue 12/19 3:30 PM
ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial set for 8/5/2025 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Exhibit List due by 7/29/2025. Witness List due by 7/29/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 8/1/2025 01:30 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/29/2025. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/19/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (af)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
15 15 order Case Management Order Tue 12/19 9:01 AM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/15/2024. Discovery due by 10/15/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 4/2/2025. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/18/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
minutes Case Management Conference Mon 12/18 4:10 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger: Case Management Conference held on 12/18/2023. (Hearing lasted :10)(kb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
14 14 misc Proposed Case Management Order Tue 12/12 2:08 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Mercury Air Center-Nashville, LLC. (Frank, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 12/07 4:03 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Appear Telephonically. Only Attorney David A. Frank II may appear telephonically. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/7/2023. (kc)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 12/07 1:45 PM
MOTION Motion to Appear Telephonically by Mercury Air Center-Nashville, LLC.(Durrett, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Proposed Order Granting David A. Frank to Appear Telephonically
Friday, August 25, 2023
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/25 12:54 PM
Amended ANSWER to Complaint by Mercury Air Center-Nashville, LLC.(Durrett, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
10 10 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 08/15 8:37 PM
ORDER granting6 and7 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for William James Katt andDavid Alan Frank to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 08/15/2023. (lh)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
9 9 misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 08/11 10:50 AM
CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney filed by Mercury Air Center-Nashville, LLC. (Durrett, Jamie)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Certificate of Good Standing Fri 08/11 10:47 AM
CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney William Katt from the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota filed by Mercury Air Center-Nashville, LLC. (Durrett, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/10 8:18 AM
MOTION for attorney David Alan Frank to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3884870) by Mercury Air Center-Nashville, LLC.(Durrett, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit-Certificates of Good Standing
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/10 8:10 AM
MOTION for attorney William James Katt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3884857) by Mercury Air Center-Nashville, LLC.(Durrett, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit-Certificates of Good Standing
misc Annotation - Deficiency Notice Thu 08/10 2:25 PM
NOTICE TO FILER re DE#6 and7 : The Certificate of Good Standing must be from a United States District Court or a United States appellate court. The new certificate shall be filed within 10 days. (kc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Wed 08/09 4:45 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference is set for 12/18/2023 at 03:30 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (kc)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Wed 08/09 4:37 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Business Entity Disclosure Statement Wed 08/09 3:47 PM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mercury Air Center-Nashville, LLC. (Durrett, Jamie)
Related: [-]
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 08/09 3:45 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Mercury Air Center-Nashville, LLC.(Durrett, Jamie)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 08/09 3:38 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mercury Air Center-Nashville, LLC from Davidson County Circuit Court, case number 23C1518. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNMDC-3883940)(kc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 State Court Record,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Notice of State Court Removal,
Att: 3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Bar Status Wed 08/09 4:39 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for John Roaten Cheadle, Jr, Dudley A. Cheadle, Jamie K. Durrett admitted to this court . (kc)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Wed 08/09 4:42 PM
WI State Bar status verified as active for William J. Katt, David A. Frank, II not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured . (kc)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - PHV Wed 08/09 4:43 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL William J. Katt, David A. Frank, II: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 8/30/2023. (kc)
Related: [-]