California Central District Court
Judge:Stephen V Wilson
Referred: Shashi H Kewalramani
Case #: 5:23-cv-01597
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:44 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2023
Terminated:Jul 16, 2024
Last checked: Monday Feb 05, 2024 12:23 AM PST
Counter Claimant
Steven R. Aguilar
Represented By
William R Cumming
Cumming And Associates Apc
contact info
Counter Claimant
MIB Shield LLC
Represented By
William R Cumming
Cumming And Associates Apc
contact info
Counter Defendant
The M.I.B. Group LLC
Represented By
Brian P Kinder
The Kinder Law Group
contact info
Orlando J Castano, Jr
Orlando Castano Jr Law Offices
contact info
Counter Defendant
Tyrone Wilkerson
an individual Law Offices of Orlando Castano Jr. 425 30th Street Suite 31
Newport Beach, CA 92663
Represented By
Brian P Kinder
The Kinder Law Group
contact info
Defendant
Steven R. Aguilar
Represented By
William R Cumming
Cumming And Associates Apc
contact info
Defendant
Does
Represented By
William R Cumming
Cumming And Associates Apc
contact info
Defendant
MIB Shield LLC
Represented By
William R Cumming
Cumming And Associates Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
The M.I.B. Group LLC
Represented By
Brian P Kinder
The Kinder Law Group
contact info
Orlando J Castano, Jr
Orlando Castano Jr Law Offices
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
The M.I.B. Group LLC
Represented By
Brian P Kinder
The Kinder Law Group
contact info
Orlando J Castano, Jr
Orlando Castano Jr Law Offices
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Tyrone Wilkerson
an individual Law Offices of Orlando Castano Jr. 425 30th Street Suite 31
Newport Beach, CA 92663
Represented By
Brian P Kinder
The Kinder Law Group
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Steven R. Aguilar
Represented By
William R Cumming
Cumming And Associates Apc
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
MIB Shield LLC
Represented By
Brian P Kinder
The Kinder Law Group
contact info
William R Cumming
Cumming And Associates Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 15, 2025
140 140 order For Order Thu 05/15 3:54 PM
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PROCESS SERVER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's request is hereby granted and DDS LEGAL SUPPORT is hereby appointed to serve any Writs of Attachment and Writs of Execution in this action, with the U.S. Marshals Office remaining as the Levying Officer.; granting138 APPLICATION for Order for Appointment of Process. Server. (aco)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
139 139 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Fri 05/09 10:53 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: APPLICATION for Order for Appointment of Process Server 138 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed order refers to Judge Stephen V. Wilson as a magistrate judge. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
138 138 1 pgs motion Order Thu 05/08 1:40 PM
APPLICATION for Order for Appointment of Process Server filed by Plaintiff The M.I.B. Group LLC. (Katz, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Appointment of Process Server